Rankin v. Suisun Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Juan Lorenzo Rankin
Defendant: Suisun Police Department and Department of California
Case Number: 2:2011cv00145
Filed: January 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/26/13 RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 48 ) be granted in part and denied in part, as follows: Defendants' motion for summary judgment be granted as to plaintiff's Fourth Amendment sexual harassment claim and Fourteenth Amendment equal protection claim; Defendants' motion for summary judgment be denied as to plaintiff's Fourth Amendment search and seizure claim and Fourth Amendment excessive force claim; and Defendant Sousa be dismissed from this action. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/4/13 ORDERING that Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment or a statement of non-opposition to the motion. Failure to file and serve either an opposition or a statement of non-opposition to the motion within fourteen days may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed pursuant FRCP 41(b); and The hearing date set for 3/7/13 on Defendants' MOTION for Summary judgment is VACATED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 1/7/13: Defendants' motion to compel 32 is DENIED. Defendants' requests for sanctions/expenses 30 & 32 associated with bringing their two motions to compel are DENIED.(Kaminski, H)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/30/12 CONTINUING Jury Trial to 2/10/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.; briefs due not later than 12/5/13; Final Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 12/19/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.; Joint Final Pretrial Statement due 11/28/13; any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed by 11/28/13; oppositions due 12/5/13; and any replies due by 12/12/13. The motions will be heard by the Court at the same time as the Final Pretrial Conference. All other due dates set forth in the Court's 28 Order are confirmed. (Meuleman, A)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 10/24/12 ORDERING that defendants' motion to compel is granted. Plaintiff shall submit responses to defendants' Special Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Production of Documents, Set One, on or before October 25, 2012. The court reserves ruling on defendants' motion for sanctions. (Matson, R)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/23/12 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Amend 20 is partially granted. This action will proceed on Plaintiff's 6/25/12 SAC as to defendants Arroyo, Sousa, and Martinez, incl uding Plaintiff's new sexual harassment / sexual assault claim as to Sousa. Police Department is DISMISSED from this action with prejudice. Defendant Suisin City Police ABAG Insurance Plan is DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. Defend ant Suisun The parties shall exchange lists of Expert Witnesses no later than 10/8/2012. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure shall be due on or before 11/12/12. Discovery shall be completed, and any Motions pertaining to Discovery shall be noticed so as to be heard on or before 1/7/2013. Dispositive Motions shall be noticed to be heard by 3/11/2013. The Pretrial Conference is SET for 5/16/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Pretrial Statement are due by 4/18/13. A Jury Trial is SET for 7/15/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. The parties shall file trial briefs pursuant to Local Rule 285. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by US MARSHAL without prepayment of costs signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/26/2012. Service is ordered for defendants Arroyo, Sousa, and Martinez. Clerk directed to forward following document to US Marshal for service: 3 copies of Summons, 4 copies of 5/9/2011 Amended Complaint, 3 copies of Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge form, and 3 copies of service process order. (Marciel, M)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 11/9/11 ORDERING that Service is appropriate for Defendants Arroyo, Sousa and Martinez. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff 3 USM-285 forms, one summons, an instruction sheet and a copy of the amended complaint filed 5/9/11. Within thirty days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall complete the attached Notice of Submission of Documents.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/18/11 ORDERING that Pltf's amended complaint is dismissed; Within 30 days from the date of this order, pltf shall complete and submit the Notice of Amendment and and an original and one copy o f the Second Amended Complaint; failure to file a second amended complaint, may result in the dismissal of this action. If plaintiff does not file an amended complaint w/i 30 days of the date of this order, this matter shall proceed on plaintiff's first amended complaint. (Becknal, R)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 4/7/11. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED; and plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rankin v. Suisun Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Lorenzo Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suisun Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?