Weaver v. Rio Cosumnes Correctional Center
Plaintiff: Willie Weaver
Defendant: Rio Cosumnes Correctional Center
Case Number: 2:2011cv00179
Filed: January 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/20/2011 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed w/out prejudice. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 03/02/11 ordering plaintiff has 30 days from the date this order is served to submit the required trust account statement. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff a new form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. (Plummer, M)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/28/2010 ORDERING that pltf has 30 days to submit either the filing fee or an application to proceed ifp; the clerk to mail pltf an ifp form. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver v. Rio Cosumnes Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rio Cosumnes Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?