IconFind, Inc. v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff alleged that Defendant Google, Inc. infringed on U.S. Patent No. 7,181,459 B2 entitled "Method of Coding, Categorizing, and Retrieving Network Pages and Sites."

Plaintiff: IconFind, Inc.
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Google, Inc.
Counter_defendant: IconFind, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00319
Filed: February 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2013 Filing 113 Pursuant to 112 STIPULATION of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, this case is CLOSED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY). (Waggoner, D)
December 20, 2012 Filing 112 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal by IconFind, Inc.. (Baxter, Daniel)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT AND DISPOSITION signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/30/12 ORDERING that Plaintiff filed a "Notice of Settlement" on 11/29/12. Therefore, a dispositional document shall be filed within twenty-one days of the date the notice of settlement is filed absent good cause to extend the deadline). Failure to respond by this deadline may be construed as consent to dismissal of this action without prejudice, and a dismissal order could be filed. ("A failure to file dispositional papers on the date prescribed by the Court may be grounds for sanctions."). (Becknal, R)
November 29, 2012 Filing 110 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by IconFind, Inc.. (Baxter, Daniel)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/1/12. The parties shall file a further joint status report within 30 days of the date this order is filed addressing the filing of dispositive motions, and the timing of those motions; anticipated post-claim construction discovery; and, any other pretrial matters. (Meuleman, A)
October 26, 2012 Filing 108 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Timothy K. Chao on behalf of Google, Inc.. Attorney Chao, Timothy K. added. (Chao, Timothy)
September 28, 2012 Filing 107 NOTICE of Third Party Subpoenas of Ben Crowell by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Maikish, Kenneth)
August 9, 2012 Filing 106 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/30/12, before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr, filed by Court Reporter Kimberly Bennett, Phone number 916-442-8420 E-mail reporter.bennett@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 8/30/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2012. (Bennett, K)
July 30, 2012 Filing 105 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr: CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING held on 7/30/2012. Matter submitted. Plaintiffs Counsel Brian Haan, Thomas Redmon present. Defendants Counsel Michael Malecek, Kenneth Maikish present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Kimberly Bennett. (Furstenau, S)
July 17, 2012 Filing 104 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Re: Tutorial held on June 25th, 2012, before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr, filed by Court Reporter Cathie Bodene, Phone number 916-446-6360 E-mail cbodene@caed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Court Reporter Cathie Bodene or PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 8/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2012. (Bodene, C)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MINUTE ORDER: The Claim Construction Hearing, currently scheduled for 7/23/12, is rescheduled for 7/30/12, at 10:00 a.m. Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/26/12. (Furstenau, S)
June 25, 2012 Filing 102 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr: IN COURT HEARING held on 6/25/2012. Tutorial hearing held. Plaintiffs Counsel Thomas Redmon, Brian Haan present. Defendants Counsel Mike Malecek, Kenneth Maikish present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Kathy Bodene. (Furstenau, S)
June 12, 2012 Filing 101 RESPONSE by Google, Inc. to 94 Brief,. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kenneth M. Maikish, # 2 Exhibit 15 to Maikish Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 16 to Maikish Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 17 to Maikish Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 18 to Maikish Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 19 to Maikish Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 20 to Maikish Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 21 to Maikish Declaration)(Maikish, Kenneth)
June 12, 2012 Filing 100 RESPONSE by IconFind, Inc. to 98 Brief,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit C, Part 1, # 5 Exhibit C, Part 2, # 6 Exhibit C, Part 3, # 7 Exhibit C, Part 4, # 8 Exhibit C, Part 5, # 9 Exhibit D)(Haan, Brian)
May 25, 2012 Filing 99 NOTICE of withdrawal/Change of Designation of Counsel re Anna B. Folgers by IconFind, Inc. (Haan, Brian) Modified on 5/30/2012 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 22, 2012 Filing 98 BRIEF Google's Opening Claim Construction Brief by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Kenneth Maikish, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Maikish Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14)(Maikish, Kenneth) Modified on 5/23/2012 (Meuleman, A).
May 22, 2012 Filing 97 [DISREGARD - Attorney to Re-File per Judge's Request] BRIEF Opening Claim Construction Brief by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Kenneth Maikish Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Maikish Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Maikish Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Maikish Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Maikish Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Maikish Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Maikish Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Maikish Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Maikish Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Maikish Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 10 to Maikish Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 11 to Maikish Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 12 to Maikish Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 13 to Maikish Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 14 to Maikish Declaration)(Maikish, Kenneth) Modified on 5/22/2012 (Michel, G).
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 05/21/12 ORDERING that Google's 95 Notice of Request to Seal Documents is DENIED. (Benson, A.)
May 15, 2012 Filing 95 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Google, Inc.. (Maikish, Kenneth)
May 15, 2012 Filing 94 BRIEF - MARKMAN - by IconFind, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C - part 1, # 4 Exhibit C - part 2, # 5 Exhibit C - part 3, # 6 Exhibit C - part 4, # 7 Exhibit C - part 5, # 8 Exhibit C - part 6, # 9 Exhibit D, # 10 Exhibit E, # 11 Exhibit F)(Folgers, Anna)
May 11, 2012 Filing 93 STATEMENT of Joint Claim Construction Chart by Plaintiff IconFind, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit B, Part 1, # 4 Exhibit B, Part 2, # 5 Exhibit B, Part 3, # 6 Exhibit B. Part 4, # 7 Exhibit B, Part 5)(Haan, Brian)
May 7, 2012 Filing 92 JOINT STATUS REPORT by IconFind, Inc.. (Haan, Brian)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 4/25/12 ORDERING that IconFind's request is DENIED. The parties shall meet and confer within ten days of the date of this order regarding IconFind's most recent issue with the sufficiency of Google's revised privilege log, after which they shall file a second status report advising the court whether a hearing is necessary. (Kastilahn, A)
April 19, 2012 Filing 90 JOINT STATUS REPORT re Discovery Disagreement by IconFind, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F) (Haan, Brian) Modified on 4/23/2012 (Marciel, M).
April 13, 2012 Filing 89 SEALED EVENT (Benson, A.)
April 12, 2012 Filing 88 JOINT STATEMENT Re Discovery Disagreement - Infringement Contentions by Defendant Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-1, # 2 Exhibit 1-2, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Maikish, Kenneth)
April 10, 2012 Filing 87 SEALED EVENT (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3, # 3 Part 4) (Donati, J)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 4/9/12 ORDERING that defendant Google's request to seal is GRANTED. The following pages of defendant Google's "Joint Discovery Statement re Discovery Disagreement - Infringement Contentions" are SEALED: The images embedded in pages 4, 5, 6, 7, and 8. Exhibit 1, pages 10, 13, 14, 17, 33, 36, 41, 42, 45, 51, 66,71, 82, 84, 88, 102, 106, 112, 114 and 118. The following page of plaintiff IconFind's "Joint Discovery Statement re Discovery Disagreement - Privilege Log and Document Production" is SEALED: the image of the Google Document entitled Creative Commons v. 1 Features" on page 7. Plaintiff IconFind's motion to compel is DENIED. The parties are ordered to meet and confer regarding Google's supplemental document production and revised privilege log within ten days of the date of this order, after which they shall file a status report advising the court whether a hearing is necessary. Defendant Google's motion to compel is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
April 5, 2012 Filing 85 MINUTES (Text Only) by CRD for MOTION HEARING proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 4/5/2012 re 80 and 81 Motions for Discovery. Plaintiffs Counsel Anna Folgers present. Defendants Counsel Michael Malecek present. Discussion regarding pending motions. Defendant submitted exhibit one in open court. Document marked as defendants exhibit one regarding discovery issue. Matter submitted. Court order to follow. Court Reporter/CD Number: 1 of 1. (Anderson, J) (Waggoner, D).
March 29, 2012 Filing 84 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Google, Inc.. (Maikish, Kenneth)
February 23, 2012 Filing 83 NOTICE OF HEARING re Discovery Disagreement by Google, Inc. (Maikish, Kenneth) Modified on 2/24/2012 (Michel, G).
February 23, 2012 Filing 82 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING re Discovery Disagreement by IconFind, Inc. (Folgers, Anna) Modified on 2/24/2012 (Michel, G).
February 22, 2012 Filing 81 NOTICE of HEARING Re Discovery Disagreement by IconFind, Inc. (Folgers, Anna) Modified on 2/23/2012 (Michel, G).
February 21, 2012 Filing 80 NOTICE of HEARING re Discovery Disagreement by Google, Inc. (Maikish, Kenneth) Modified on 2/22/2012 (Michel, G).
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 1/18/2012 DENYING 73 Motion for Judgment on the pleadings. (Michel, G)
January 13, 2012 Filing 78 REPLY by Google, Inc. re 73 MOTION for JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OF INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,181,459. (Malecek, Michael)
January 9, 2012 Filing 77 OPPOSITION by IconFind, Inc. to 73 RENEWED MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Folgers, Anna) Modified on 1/10/2012 (Meuleman, A).
December 19, 2011 Filing 76 PROPOSED ORDER re Google's Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings re 74 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 75 Declaration, 73 MOTION for JUDGMENT RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OF INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,181,459. (Malecek, Michael)
December 19, 2011 Filing 75 DECLARATION of Kenneth Maikish in SUPPORT OF 73 MOTION for JUDGMENT RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OF INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,181,459. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Malecek, Michael)
December 19, 2011 Filing 74 MEMORANDUM by Google, Inc. in SUPPORT of 73 MOTION for JUDGMENT RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OF INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,181,459. (Malecek, Michael)
December 19, 2011 Filing 73 MOTION for JUDGMENT RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OF INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,181,459 by Google, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Malecek, Michael)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION and ORDER SETTING ADDITIONAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DEADLINES 71 signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 10/6/2011. (Zignago, K.)
October 5, 2011 Filing 71 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Additional Claim Construction Deadlines by IconFind, Inc.. (Baxter, Daniel)
September 1, 2011 Filing 70 TRANSCRIPT of Joint Discovery Disagreement Proceedings held on 07/28/11, before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 9/22/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/3/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/1/2011 filed by ECRO Jonathan Anderson, Phone number 916-930-4072 E-mail janderson@caed.uscourts.gov. (Anderson, J)
August 29, 2011 Filing 69 ANSWER to COUNTERCLAIM (Sedond Amended) by IconFind, Inc..(Folgers, Anna) Modified on 8/30/2011 (Kaminski, H).
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/18/2011: informing the parties on protective order procedures in this case. (Reader, L)
August 15, 2011 Filing 67 REQUEST for Entry of Protective Order by IconFind, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Folgers, Anna)
August 12, 2011 Filing 66 SECOND AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against IconFind, Inc. by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Appendix A, # 3 Appendix B, # 4 Appendix C, # 5 Appendix D, # 6 Appendix E, # 7 Appendix F, # 8 Appendix G, # 9 Appendix H, # 10 Appendix I, # 11 Appendix J, # 12 Appendix K)(Malecek, Michael)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/8/2011 ORDERING that the proposed order shall not include a prosecution bar and Plaintiff is granted leave to serve an additional fifty interrogatories. (Duong, D)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 8/2/11, GRANTING 35 Iconfind's motion to dismiss Google's second counterclaim and to strike Google's second affirmative defense. Google is GRANTED 10 days from the date on which this order is filed to amend the deficiencies in its pleading addressed in this Order.
July 28, 2011 Filing 63 MINUTES (Text Only) by CRD for DISCOVERY HEARING proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 7/28/2011. Plaintiffs Counsel Daniel L. Baxter and Anna B. Folgers present. Defendants Counsel Kenneth M. Maikish present. Oral arguements regarding discovery disputes. Matter is submitted. Court order to follow.Court Reporter/CD Number: 1 of 1. (Anderson, J)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER: The Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike, scheduled for hearing on 7/25/11, are submitted without oral argument. There will not be a hearing on 7/25/11, and no appearance is necessary. re 24 Notice - Other and (29) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/22/11. (Furstenau, S)
July 21, 2011 Filing 61 STATEMENT of Parties (Joint Statement) re Discovery Disagreement by Plaintiff IconFind, Inc. re 60 Notice - Other. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A and B, # 2 Exhibits C and D)(Baxter, Daniel)
June 20, 2011 Filing 60 NOTICE of hearing re Discovery Disagreement by IconFind, Inc. (Folgers, Anna) Modified on 6/22/2011 (Becknal, R).
June 10, 2011 Filing 59 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 26 before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. (Baxter, Daniel)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER: The Stipulation re: Discovery Disagreement, filed on 6/10/11, indicates a hearing date before Judge Burrell on 7/25/11. Pursuant to the Local Rules, Discovery Motions are referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge. Therefore, no hearing is scheduled on the discovery dispute on 7/25/11. The motion must be noticed for hearing before the assigned Magistrate Judge. re 56 Statement Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/10/11. (Furstenau, S)
June 10, 2011 Filing 57 PROPOSED ORDER re 56 Joint Statement re Discovery Disagreement by IconFind, Inc.. (Folgers, Anna) Modified on 6/13/2011 (Zignago, K.).
June 10, 2011 Filing 56 JOINT STATEMENT re Discovery Disagreement by Plaintiff IconFind, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Folgers, Anna) Modified on 6/13/2011 (Zignago, K.).
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 6/7/2011. If Google elects to refile its Motion for Invalidity of US Patent, Court will hear it on 1/23/2012. Tutorial Hearing set for 6/25/2012 at 9:00 AM and Claim Construction Hearing set for 7/23/2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB). (Marciel, M) Modified on 6/8/2011 (Marciel, M).
June 6, 2011 Filing 54 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/6/2011. Court will issue an order. Plaintiffs Counsel Raymond Niro, Thomas Redmon present. Defendants Counsel Mike Malecek present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Kathleen Skidgel. (Furstenau, S) Modified on 6/6/2011 (Furstenau, S).
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/3/11 ORDERING 29 Motion for Judgment is denied as premature.(Matson, R)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER: The pretrial scheduling conference, currently set for 5/23/11, is rescheduled for 6/6/11 at 11:00 a.m. Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 5/19/11. (Furstenau, S)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER: The Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike, currently scheduled for hearing on 5/16/11, are rescheduled for hearing on 7/25/11, at 9:00 a.m. re 24 Notice - Other, 29 Motion for Judgment, Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 5/11/11. (Furstenau, S)
May 9, 2011 Filing 50 REPLY by IconFind, Inc. to RESPONSE to 22 MOTION to DISMISS MOTION to STRIKE. (Baxter, Daniel)
May 9, 2011 Filing 49 REPLY by Google, Inc. re 29 MOTION for JUDGMENT on the pleadings of Invalidity of US Patent No. 7,181,459. (Malecek, Michael)
May 9, 2011 Filing 48 BRIEF DOCUMENT PRODUCTION AGREEMENT by Google, Inc.. (Malecek, Michael)
May 9, 2011 Filing 47 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Google, Inc.. (Malecek, Michael)
May 2, 2011 Filing 46 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by IconFind, Inc. in re 44 Opposition to Motion. (Baxter, Daniel)
May 2, 2011 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Anna B. Folgers in OPPOSITION TO 29 MOTION for JUDGMENT on the pleadings of Invalidity of US Patent No. 7,181,459. (Baxter, Daniel)
May 2, 2011 Filing 44 OPPOSITION by IconFind, Inc. to 29 MOTION for JUDGMENT on the pleadings of Invalidity of US Patent No. 7,181,459. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A", # 2 Exhibit "B", # 3 Exhibit "C")(Baxter, Daniel)
May 2, 2011 Filing 43 DECLARATION of JOHN LABARRE in SUPPORT OF 35 Motion to Dismiss, 29 Motion for Judgment on the pleadings of Invalidity of US Patent No. 7,181,459. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Malecek, Michael)
May 2, 2011 Filing 42 OPPOSITION by Google, Inc. to 29 MOTION for JUDGMENT on the pleadings of Invalidity of US Patent No. 7,181,459. (Malecek, Michael)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER declining to relate cases signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 4/21/11. (Manzer, C)
April 19, 2011 Filing 40 ANSWER to COUNTERCLAIM AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by IconFind, Inc..(Folgers, Anna)
April 19, 2011 Filing 39 EXHIBITS 3, 4, 5 to 32 Kenneth Maikish Declaration filed by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5)(Malecek, Michael) Modified on 4/19/2011 (Benson, A.).
April 19, 2011 Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION: DISREGARD 37 Exhibit; Counsel to refile with proper title page attached. (Benson, A.)
April 18, 2011 Filing 37 [DISREGARD - COUNSEL TO RE-FILE WITH PROPER TITLE PAGE] EXHIBITS 3, 4, 5 to 32 Declaration of Kenneth Maikish by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4, # 2 Exhibit 5)(Malecek, Michael) Modified on 4/19/2011 (Benson, A.).
April 18, 2011 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM by IconFind, Inc. in support of 35 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Proposed Order)(Folgers, Anna) Modified on 4/20/2011 (Becknal, R).
April 18, 2011 Filing 35 MOTION to DISMISS, MOTION to STRIKE; Motion Hearing set for 05/16/11 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. by IconFind, Inc. (Folgers, Anna)
April 15, 2011 Filing 34 EXHIBITS to Declaration of Kenneth Maikish re 29 MOTION for JUDGMENT on the pleadings of Invalidity of US Patent No. 7,181,459 filed by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2DISREGARD - Exhibit 3, # 3DISREGARD - Exhibit 4, # 4DISREGARD - Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 7)(Malecek, Michael) Modified on 4/18/2011 (Duong, D).
April 15, 2011 Filing 33 PROPOSED ORDER re 29 MOTION for JUDGMENT on the pleadings of Invalidity of US Patent No. 7,181,459. (Malecek, Michael) Modified on 4/18/2011 (Duong, D).
April 15, 2011 Filing 32 DECLARATION of KENNETH MAIKISH in SUPPORT OF 29 MOTION for JUDGMENT on the pleadings of Invalidity of US Patent No. 7,181,459. (Malecek, Michael) Modified on 4/18/2011 (Duong, D).
April 15, 2011 Filing 31 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Google, Inc. in re 30 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 29 Motion for Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-1, # 2 Exhibit 1-2, # 3 Exhibit 1-3)(Malecek, Michael) Modified on 4/18/2011 (Duong, D).
April 15, 2011 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM by Google, Inc. in SUPPORT of 29 MOTION for JUDGMENT on the pleadings of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No . 7,181,459. 7,181,459. (Malecek, Michael) Modified on 4/18/2011 (Duong, D).
April 15, 2011 Filing 29 MOTION for JUDGMENT on the pleadings of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No . 7,181,459 by Google, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Malecek, Michael) Modified on 4/18/2011 (Duong, D).
April 15, 2011 Filing 28 WITHDRAWAL of 22 MOTION to DISMISS MOTION to STRIKE by IconFind, Inc.. (Haan, Brian)
April 11, 2011 Filing 27 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Google Inc.(Malecek, Michael) Modified on 4/12/2011 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 8, 2011 Filing 26 ANSWER to COUNTERCLAIM 18 by IconFind, Inc.(Haan, Brian) Modified on 4/12/2011 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 4, 2011 Filing 25 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kenneth Morefield Maikish on behalf of Google, Inc.. Attorney Maikish, Kenneth Morefield added. (Maikish, Kenneth)
April 1, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE of 22 MOTION to DISMISS, MOTION to STRIKE by IconFind, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Haan, Brian)
April 1, 2011 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM by IconFind, Inc. in SUPPORT of 22 MOTION to DISMISS MOTION to STRIKE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Proposed Order)(Haan, Brian)
April 1, 2011 Filing 22 MOTION to DISMISS, MOTION to STRIKE ; Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. by IconFind, Inc. (Haan, Brian)
March 25, 2011 Filing 21 Plaintiff's Statement re Defendant Google, Inc.'s Notice of Related Case by Plaintiff IconFind, Inc. Attorney Redmon, Thomas G added. (Redmon, Thomas) Modified on 3/25/2011 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 24, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:09-CV-00109 by Google, Inc.. (Malecek, Michael)
March 24, 2011 Filing 19 GOOGLE INC.'S Corporate disclosure STATEMENT. (Malecek, Michael) Modified on 3/25/2011 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 24, 2011 Filing 18 ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against IconFind, Inc. by Google, Inc..(Malecek, Michael)
March 22, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael J. Malecek on behalf of Google, Inc.. Attorney Malecek, Michael J. added. (Malecek, Michael)
February 22, 2011 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by IconFind, Inc.. (Baxter, Daniel)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 02/17/11 adding attorney 7 Raymond P. Niro, PHV for IconFind, Inc., (Benson, A.)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/17/2011 re 8 ; Added attorney Raymond P. Niro, Jr. PHV for IconFind, Inc. (Duong, D) Modified on 2/18/2011 (Benson, A.).
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/17/11 re 10 ; Added attorney Brian E. Haan, PHV for IconFind, Inc.(Duong, D)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/17/2011 re 9 . Added attorney Anna B Folgers, PHV for IconFind, Inc. (Duong, D)
February 16, 2011 Filing 10 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by IconFind, Inc. for attorney Brian E. Haan to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Baxter, Daniel)
February 16, 2011 Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by IconFind, Inc. for attorney Anna B. Folgers to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Baxter, Daniel)
February 16, 2011 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by IconFind, Inc. for attorney Raymond P. Niro, Jr. to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Baxter, Daniel)
February 16, 2011 Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by IconFind, Inc. for attorney Raymond P. Niro to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Baxter, Daniel)
February 16, 2011 RECEIPT number CAE200033340 for $720.00 for Pro Hac Appls for Raymond Niro, Raymond Niro, Jr, Anna Folgers and Brian Haan from Daniel L. Baxter. (Kastilahn, A)
February 13, 2011 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: IconFind, Inc. served on 2/4/2011. (Baxter, Daniel) Modified on 2/14/2011 (Williams, D).
February 3, 2011 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 VDRP Form) (Williams, D)
February 3, 2011 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Google, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel Lawrence Baxter* *400 Capitol Mall* *22nd Floor* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Williams, D)
February 3, 2011 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by IconFind, Inc. (Baxter, Daniel)
February 3, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Google, Inc by IconFind, Inc. Attorney Baxter, Daniel Lawrence added.(Baxter, Daniel) Modified on 2/3/2011 (Williams, D).
February 3, 2011 RECEIPT number #CAE200032966 $350.00 fbo IconFind, Inc. by Daniel L Baxter on 2/3/2011. (Williams, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IconFind, Inc. v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IconFind, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Baxter
Represented By: Anna B Folgers, PHV
Represented By: Brian E. Haan, PHV
Represented By: Raymond P. Niro, PHV
Represented By: Raymond P. Niro, Jr., PHV
Represented By: Thomas G Redmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Morefield Maikish
Represented By: Michael J. Malecek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Malecek
Represented By: Kenneth Morefield Maikish
Represented By: Michael J. Malecek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: IconFind, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Baxter
Represented By: Anna B Folgers, PHV
Represented By: Brian E. Haan, PHV
Represented By: Raymond P. Niro, PHV
Represented By: Raymond P. Niro, Jr., PHV
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Baxter
Represented By: Anna B Folgers, PHV
Represented By: Brian E. Haan, PHV
Represented By: Raymond P. Niro, PHV
Represented By: Raymond P. Niro, Jr., PHV
Represented By: Thomas G Redmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?