January 21, 2014 |
Filing
76
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/21/14 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Dillon, M)
|
July 9, 2013 |
Filing
73
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/8/13 ORDERING that dispositional documents shall be filed no later than January 14, 2014.(Dillon, M)
|
June 12, 2013 |
Filing
68
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/12/13 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Ricky L. Brown via telephonic conferencing at 9:30 am on 6/21/13 before Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: IT Dept)(Dillon, M)
|
June 10, 2013 |
Filing
65
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/7/13 DENYING 64 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
|
April 22, 2013 |
Filing
61
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/19/13 ordering the Custodian to produce Ricky L. Brown at 06/21/13 at 9:30 a.m. in courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: CKD and OTCD) (Plummer, M)
|
March 14, 2013 |
Filing
56
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/13/2013 ORDERING that defendants' 43 motion for summary judgment is DENIED; within 21 days, each party shall inform the court in writing as to whether they wish to proceed with the settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd and waive any disqualification or if they wish to be referred to another Magistrate Judge; and the Clerk shall send each party the consent form for settlement conferences. (Yin, K)
|
January 31, 2013 |
Filing
54
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/30/13 ordering that any hearing dates currently set before the undersigned are vacated. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd for all further proceedings; the case number is 2:11-cv-0389 DAD (PC). (Plummer, M) Modified on 1/31/2013 (Plummer, M).
|
July 31, 2012 |
Filing
51
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 07/30/12 granting 50 Motion for supplemental briefing. Within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff may file a supplemental opposition to defendants' 03/30/12 motion for summary judgment. Defendants are granted 15 days from the date of service of any supplemental opposition to file a supplemental reply brief. (Plummer, M) Modified on 7/31/2012 (Plummer, M).
|
March 19, 2012 |
Filing
41
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 03/16/12 denying 36 Motion to Compel and denying 39 Motion for Extension of time. (Plummer, M)
|
October 4, 2011 |
Filing
29
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/3/2011 DENYING pltf's 26 motion for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
|
September 28, 2011 |
Filing
28
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 9/27/2011 ADOPTING 19 Findings and Recommendations in full. Pltf's 15 motion for an order requiring that he be transferred and for other injunctive relief is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
|
August 8, 2011 |
Filing
19
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/5/11 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to assign a District Judge to this action; RECOMMENDING that 15 MOTION for an order requiring that he be transferred and for other injunctive relief be denied; referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
|
April 21, 2011 |
Filing
11
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Ricky L. Brown Jr. signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/21/11. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
|
March 24, 2011 |
Filing
8
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/24/11 ORDERING that 5 Motion to Proceed IFP is DISMISSED without prejudice; Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner; and plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis.(Dillon, M)
|
February 22, 2011 |
Filing
3
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/18/2011 ORDERING pltf to submit, w/in 30 days, either the $350.00 filing fee or a properly completed ifp application; the clerk to send pltf an ifp application. (Yin, K)
|