Singh v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A., d/b/a Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: Balbir Singh
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A., d/b/a Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp. and Provident Savings Bank, F.S.B.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00401
Filed: February 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ADOPTING 34 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/9/11 GRANTING in part 12 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING without prejudice 14 Motion for More Definite Statement and REMANDING CASE to San Joaquin County Superior Court. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED. (Manzer, C)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 5/26/11 VACATING the 8/4/11 hearing and the 9/8/11 initial scheduling conference. It is hereby RECOMMENDED that: 12 Motion to Dismiss be partially granted; the 14 Motion for more definite statement be denied without prejudice to its renewal in state court; and this matter be remanded to the San Joaquin County Superior Court for further proceedings. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommmendations. (Donati, J)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 5/3/2011 ORDERING that Plaintiff's request for appointment of expert is DENIED; Motion Hearing RESET for 7/14/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 26 before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds, Initial Scheduling Conference RESET for 9/8/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 26 before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. (Waggoner, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A., d/b/a Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Balbir Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A., d/b/a Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Dean A. Christopherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Savings Bank, F.S.B.
Represented By: John Almon Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?