November 19, 2012 |
Filing
92
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/16/12 ORDERING that plaintiffs June 29, 2012 motion 84 is denied; and it is RECOMMENDED that Defendants June 27, 2012 motion for summary judgment 82 be granted; Plaintiffs June 7, 2012 motion for summary judgment 81 be denied; and this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Dillon, M)
|
July 25, 2012 |
Filing
89
ORDER AND RAND NOTICE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/24/12 ORDERING that Plaintiff is hereby informed of the following requirements for opposing a motion for summary judgment; Plaintiff is granted thirty days from the date of this order in which to file either a supplemental opposition, or a statement that he opts to rely on his July 16, 2012 opposition. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed within seven days thereafter. (Becknal, R)
|
July 2, 2012 |
Filing
85
ORDER adopting 80 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/29/12: Plaintiff's April 26, 2012 motion for preliminary injunction is denied 76 .(Kaminski, H)
|
June 1, 2012 |
Filing
80
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/1/2012 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 76 motion for preliminary injunction be denied. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
April 23, 2012 |
Filing
75
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/23/12; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiff's March 16, 2012 motion to compel (dkt. no. 68) is denied; Plaintiff's March 22, 2012 motion for summary judgment (dkt. no. 69) is denied without prejudice to its renewal as set forth above; and Defendants' March 27, 2012 motion to postpone briefing (dkt. no. 70) is denied. (Matson, R)
|
March 6, 2012 |
Filing
67
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/05/12 ordering this action is proceeding on plaintiff's 04/29/11 amended complaint 8 as to defendants Traquina, Austin and Mefford. Defendant Huffman is dismissed without prejudice. The discovery deadline is briefly extended to 05/31/12. The deadline for filing all pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, is extended to 07/31/12. (Plummer, M)
|
February 22, 2012 |
Filing
65
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/21/2012 ORDERING that defendant Huffman's 49 motion to dismiss is PARTIALLY GRANTED; plaintff's amended complaint is DISMISSED; within 30 days, plaintiff shall complete and return the Notice of Amendment with the required documents. (Yin, K)
|
February 17, 2012 |
Filing
64
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/16/12 DENYING without prejudice 60 Motion. (Dillon, M)
|
February 8, 2012 |
Filing
63
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 02/07/12 ordering the 01/12/12 order to show cause is discharged. Plaintiff's 12/05/11 motion to compel 41 is denied without prejudice. (Plummer, M)
|
February 1, 2012 |
Filing
62
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/1/12 ORDERING that 58 Motion is PARTIALLY GRANTED; and the January 27, 2012 discovery deadline and the March 30, 2012 dispositive motions deadline are vacated. (Dillon, M)
|
January 19, 2012 |
Filing
57
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 01/18/12 ordering within 14 days from the date of this order defendant Huffman shall pay to the U.S. Marshal the sum of $160.60, unless within that time defendant Huffman files a written statement showing good cause for his failure to waive service. The court does not intend to extend the 14 day period. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal. (Plummer, M)
|
January 12, 2012 |
Filing
54
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/11/12 ORDERING that within twenty-one days from the date of this order, defendants Austin, Traquina and Mefford shall show cause, if any they may have, why plaintiffs December 5, 2011 motion to compel should not be granted.(Dillon, M)
|
December 27, 2011 |
Filing
50
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/23/11 denying 46 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff's 12/19/11 request for entry of default 48 is denied. Plaintiff's 12/09/11 motion for jury trial 42 is disregarded. Plaintiff's 12/09/11 motion 43 is disregarded. (Plummer, M)
|
December 5, 2011 |
Filing
40
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/2/2011 DENYING plaintiff's 39 motion. (Yin, K)
|
November 22, 2011 |
Filing
38
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 11/22/11 ORDERING that upon reconsideration, the order of the magistrate judge filed 10/31/11, is AFFIRMED.(Kastilahn, A)
|
October 31, 2011 |
Filing
36
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/31/11 DENYING 34 Motion for Entry of Default. (Dillon, M)
|
October 14, 2011 |
Filing
33
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/13/2011 DENYING pltf's 32 motion for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
|
October 4, 2011 |
Filing
31
DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/3/11: Discovery due by 1/27/2012. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/30/2012. Pretrial conference and trial dates will be set, as appropriate, following adjudication of any dispositive motion, or the expiration of time for filing such a motion. (Kaminski, H)
|
September 9, 2011 |
Filing
29
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONSsigned by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/8/11 Recommending that the 8/5/11 MOTION to DISMISS 20 be denied; Defendants' MOTION to DIMISS on Eleventh Amendment ground be granted only to the extent t hat Plaintiff seeks damages against defendants in their official capacity; And Defendants Traquina, Austin and Mefford be directed to file an answer within twenty-one days of any order adopting these Findings and Recommendations. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. Objections due within twenty-one days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations.. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
August 9, 2011 |
Filing
21
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/9/11 DENYING 16 Motion for Entry of Default. (Dillon, M)
|
June 22, 2011 |
Filing
15
ORDER denying 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/21/11. (Plummer, M)
|
April 21, 2011 |
Filing
6
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/20/11 ORDERING the director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Mario A. Williams to the clerk until the balance of $350 is paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Director of the CDC. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial, CDC Prisoner Payment Orders )(Dillon, M)
|