June 27, 2017 |
Filing
184
STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/27/17 ORDERING that the above-captioned case and all named and fictitious defendants thereto, including any and all individually-named defendants who were previously dismissed without prejudice, are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), each party to bear his/her own fees and costs. CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R)
|
March 20, 2017 |
Filing
182
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/17/17: Defendants Arnold Schwarzenegger, Edmund G. Brown, Jr., Matthew Cate, J Cerda, M Flesch, C Galanis, A Hoffmann, C Johnson, H Johnson, J. Lozano, R Munoz, A. Ogbodo, J Rey, S. M. Salinas, J. Silk, R Ullrich, C Wilson, W Womack, F Alonso and Jeffrey Beard are dismissed without prejudice. (Kaminski, H)
|
November 3, 2016 |
Filing
180
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/2/2016 ORDERING that the 05/08/2017 trial date is hereby VACATED; The Final Pre-trial Conference set for 03/09/2017 is hereby VACATED; All other trial related deadlines are hereby VACATED. (Butolph, J)
|
October 6, 2016 |
Filing
178
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/6/2016 ORDERING 164 that the motion is GRANTED on the grounds that Joanna McClelland lacks standing and has failed to appear and prosecute any claims in this action, and Plaintiff Joanna Alexander / Joanna McClelland, listed in the Third Amended Complaint 91 Jo'Anna McLeland, is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. (Reader, L)
|
September 12, 2016 |
Filing
166
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/9/2016 GRANTING 165 request to seal documents. (Zignago, K.)
|
September 2, 2016 |
Filing
162
ORDER granting service of publication of third amended complaint and motions on plaintiffs Amber Alexander and Joanna McClelland, signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/1/16. (Kastilahn, A)
|
June 1, 2016 |
Filing
156
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 05/31/16 ORDERING that, pursuant to 155 Stipulation and to the further mediation session scheduled by the parties for 08/16/16, all fact discovery is STAYED until 08/17/16, or until one day after the parties complete a further mediation session, whichever is earlier; the following dates and deadlines are CONTINUED as follows: Discovery cutoff is 10/10/16; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 10/24/16 with any supplemental designations due 11/07/16 and expert discovery cutoff 12/02/16; Dispositive Motions shall be heard by 12/22/16. Joint Pretrial Statement, Final Pretrial Conference and Trial dates REMAIN UNCHANGED. (Benson, A)
|
April 7, 2016 |
Filing
152
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/6/16 ORDERING that the dates and deadlines are CONTINUED as follows: Discovery cut-off CONTINUED from 6/2/16 to 9/12/2016; Initial Expert Witness Exchange Deadline Continued from 8/11/16 to 10/3/2016. Rebuttal Expert Exchange Deadline due by 10/21/2016. Expert Discovery Cut-off due by 11/14/16. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
March 17, 2016 |
Filing
150
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/15/2016 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs for travel to DVI by appointed pro bono counsel Jeff Dominic Price is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
|
February 16, 2016 |
Filing
149
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/12/2016 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs by appointed pro bono counsel Jeff Price is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
|
December 8, 2015 |
Filing
147
PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/8/2015. (Zignago, K.)
|
November 19, 2015 |
Filing
142
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/18/2015 ORDERING that the parties shall meet and confer regarding a stipulated protective order. If the parties cannot agree on the terms, plaintiffs shall submit their proposed version no la ter 12/2/2015. Defendants may file objections to plaintiffs' proposed protective order no later than 12/4/2015. The 128 motion to compel is GRANTED IN PART. Defendants' boilerplate objections are hereby STRICKEN. Prior to the filing of any further motion to compel, the parties shall engage in the informal procedures for the resolution of discovery disputes set forth on the undersigneds court website. (Zignago, K.)
|
October 16, 2015 |
Filing
134
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/16/2015 ORDERING the 128 Motion to Compel Hearing CONTINUED to 11/18/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. No later than 10/23/2015 Defendants shall provide documents responsive to plaintiff's requests for production of documents. No later than 10/30/15, the parties are DIRECTED to meet and confer in a face-to-face conference. Joint Statement shall be filed no later than 11/6/2015. (Donati, J)
|
December 24, 2014 |
Filing
112
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/23/14 ORDERING for the foregoing reasons, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint (ECF No. 94 is DENIED. It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendants Cate and Salinas sh all answer Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint within twenty (20) days from the date of this order; and IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within twenty days from the date of this order Plaintiff shall show cause in writing as to why Defendant Schwarzenegger should not be dismissed from this action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). (Becknal, R)
|
July 30, 2014 |
Filing
103
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/30/14 GRANTING Mr. Price's request for expenditure in the amount of $620.00 (Kastilahn, A)
|
July 23, 2014 |
Filing
102
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/21/14 ORDERING that Mr. Price's ex parte request for pre-approval of expenditures is DENIED without prejudice. Counsel for Plaintiffs is free to resubmit his request to address the Court's concerns. If the information in the request contains privileged or purportedly confidential information, then counsel for Plaintiffs should so state. (Kastilahn, A)
|
April 30, 2014 |
Filing
90
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/29/2014 re: 89 Stipulation and Proposed Order; IT IS ORDERED, that the Plaintiffs may file a Third Amended Complaint by 5/5/2014, and that the 5/8/2014, hearing on the Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint is VACATED. (Waggoner, D)
|
February 19, 2014 |
Filing
83
ORDER on STIPULATION 81 signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/19/2014 ORDERING the time for filing the Second Amended Complaint is enlarged by four (4) days to 2/18/2014. (Krueger, M)
|
February 5, 2014 |
Filing
80
ORDER re 79 signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/4/14 GRANTING LEAVE to file a Second Amended Complaint and shall be filed by 2/14/14. Counsel for Defendants M. Cate, J. Rey, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, M. Flesc h, S.M. Salinas, C. Galanis, J. Cerda, F. Alonso, A. Ogbodo, R. Ullrich, H. Johnson, J. Silk, C. Wilson, R. Munoz, J. Cerda, C. Johnson and J. Reyshall accept service of the Second Amended Complaint by mail, and that a responsive pleading shall be du e from Defendants M. Cate, J. Rey, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, M. Flesch, S.M. Salinas, C. Galanis, J. Cerda, F. Alonso, A. Ogbodo, R. Ullrich, H. Johnson, J. Silk, C. Wilson, R. Munoz, J. Cerda, C. Johnson and J. Rey within 21 days of the service of the Second Amended Complaint. (Meuleman, A)
|
September 16, 2013 |
Filing
53
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/13/13 GRANTING request to appear telephonically for the 9/19/13 hearing at 2:00 p.m. (cc: IT) (Manzer, C)
|
September 12, 2013 |
Filing
50
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/10/2013 APPOINTING Attorney Jeff Dominic Price for Amber Dawn Alexander, Jonathan Nicholas Alexander; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve a copy of this order upon Attorneys David Springfield and J eff Dominic Price; ORDERING Mr. Springfield to provide to Mr. Price, as soon as possible, all client files and materials related to this action; ORDERING Mr. Price to appear at the In Court Hearing set for 9/19/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Michel, G)
|
April 27, 2012 |
Filing
42
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/27/12; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: David Springfield is appointed as counsel in the above entitled matter. Appointed counsel shall notify Sujean Park at (916) 930-4278, or via email at spark� 64;caed.uscourts.gov if he has any questions related to the appointment. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order upon David Springfield, The Springfield Law Firm, 12896 Rices Crossing Road, Post Office Box 660, Oregon House, California 95962. This matter is referred back to the District Judge assigned to this action. The status conference set before the undersigned on June 6, 2012 is vacated; Henceforth the caption on documents filed in this action shall be CIV S-11-640 MCE CKD.(Matson, R)
|
April 25, 2012 |
Filing
41
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/25/12 ORDERING that no later than 5/30/12, plaintiffs shall obtain counsel and file a substitution of attorneys. Failure to obtain counsel will result in a recommendation this action be dismiss ed without prejudice; No later than 5/23/12, plaintiffs shall show cause why the sibling referenced in the complaint should not be joined as a party plaintiff; No later than 5/23/12, plaintiffs shall file a status report. In the status report, plaintiffs shall specifically outline what steps have been taken to effectuate service of summons in this action. (Becknal, R)
|
April 23, 2012 |
Filing
37
ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 04/20/12 ORDERING that Thornton L. Davidson's 27 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is GRANTED and he is RELIEVED as counsel of record for Plaintiffs effective upon the filing of proof of service of this signed order on Plaintiffs at their last known addresses: 1114 Orange #2, Redding, CA 96001. (Benson, A.)
|
March 27, 2012 |
Filing
35
ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/27/12 GRANTING 31 Request to Appear Telephonically at hearing scheduled for 4/19/12 at 2:00 p.m. on 27 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. The courtroom deputy clerk will initiate the telephone call 5-10 minutes prior to the scheduled hearing by calling counsel at 559-256-9800 ext. 230. (cc:IT). (Meuleman, A)
|
February 16, 2012 |
Filing
26
MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 2/16/12 ORDERING that Counsel's 19 Motion to Withdraw is DENIED without prejudice. Unless Counsel renews his motion in the interim, not later than 30 days following the date this Order is electronically filed, Plaintiffs are ordered to file a Joint Status Report advising this Court as to the status of this case. (Kastilahn, A)
|
December 21, 2011 |
Filing
24
ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/15/2011 ORDERING that counsel Thornton Davidson's 22 request to appear telephonically at the hearing of his Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record is hereby GRANTED. (Duong, D)
|
December 9, 2011 |
Filing
17
ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/8/11 ORDERING that Counsel Thornton Davidson's Request to appear telephonically at the hearing of his Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record 16 is GRANTED. The courtroom deputy clerk will initiate the telephone call 5-10 minutes prior to the scheduled hearing by calling counsel at 559-256-9800 ext. 230. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
March 21, 2011 |
Filing
9
ORDER granting 3 Motion to Appoint ad Litem, signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 3/18/11. Jonathan Nicholas Alexander is hereby APPOINTED Guardian ad Litem for Amber Dawn Alexander. (Kastilahn, A)
|