Newton v. Clearwire Corporation
Plaintiff: Sharon Newton
Defendant: Clearwire Corporation
Case Number: 2:2011cv00783
Filed: March 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION and ORDER 56 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/6/13 ORDERING this case DISMISSED with prejudice and without award of costs to either party. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/7/13 ORDERING that this matter is STAYED until 2/5/2014. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than 2/5/14. The Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 2/18/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/14/2013 52 staying the action until 8/5/2013. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than 8/5/2013. The Scheduling Conference is reset for 8/19/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 10/26/12 STAYS this matter until 1/21/13. A Scheduling Conference is SET for 2/19/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 2/4/13. (Meuleman, A)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION and ORDER continuing stay of action until 10/18/2012 48 signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 4/12/2012. (Kirksey Smith, K)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re 46 Status Report signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 3/16/2012 ORDERING this matter STAYED until 3/28/2012. At the expiration of that time the parties shall submit a joint status report describing how they propose that this matter will proceed.(Kirksey Smith, K)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 03/01/12 ORDERING that this matter is STAYED until 03/14/12. At the expiration of that time the parties shall submit a joint status report describing how they propose that this matter will proceed. (Benson, A.)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 2/21/2012 STAYING case until 2/28/2012. At the expiration of that time, the parties shall submit a joint status report describing how they propose that this matter will proceed. (Michel, G)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 1/13/2012 ORDERING 40 The Court APPROVES the parties; stipulation and STAYS this matter until 2/12/2012. The parties shall submit a joint status report describing how they propose that this matter will proceed on or before 2/13/2012. (Reader, L)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 12/12/2011 ORDERING that the Court approves the parties' stipulation and VACATES the 12/19/2011, 2:00 p.m. hearing on Clearwire's Motion to Compel Arbitration. This matter is STAYED until 1/12/2012. At the expiration of that time the parties shall submit a joint status report describing how they propose that this matter will proceed. CASE STAYED. (Zignago, K.)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/7/2011. (Zignago, K.)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 11/1/2011 re 31 ORDERING that the Court approves the parties' stipulation regarding discovery and amends the briefing schedule on Clearwire's 18 Motion to Compel arbitration as follows: Plaintiff's response shall be due no later than November 4, 2011 and Defendant's reply shall be due no later than December 1, 2011. (Duong, D)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/22/2011 GRANTIN IN PART and DENYING IN PART Pltf's 25 Motion to Compel. Dft shall provide Pltf's counsel supplemental responses to Pltf's interrogatories within 30 days. (Zignago, K.)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 7/8/2011 re 22 ORDERING that the Court amends the schedule. The parties shall adhere to the schedule above. Any motions to compel discovery shall be noticed for hearing before the assigned Magistrate Judge in accordance with Local Rule 302(c)(1). The Court strikes the August 29, 2011, hearing date on Clearwire's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Claims, to be reset by further order of the Court.(Duong, D)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 5/13/2011 ORDERING that the Court lifts the stay. The parties shall adhere to the following schedule: Defendant's motion to compel arbitration shall be due no later than June 9, 2011, and shall be set for hearing on August 29, 2011, at 2:00 p.m. Plaintiff's response shall be due no later than July 8, 2011 and Defendant's reply shall be due no later than July 22, 2011.(Duong, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newton v. Clearwire Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearwire Corporation
Represented By: Stephen M Rummage, PHV
Represented By: Kenneth Payson, PHV
Represented By: Rochelle L. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Newton
Represented By: Michael McShane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?