Hooker v. Kimura-Yip et al
Plaintiff: Donald Oliver Hooker
Defendant: McDonald, Swingle, Nepomuceno and T. Kimura-Yip
Case Number: 2:2011cv00899
Filed: April 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/16/14 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 10/28/14 56 are ADOPTED in full; and the Second Amended Complaint 54 is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/27/14 recommending that the second amended complaint 54 be dismissed; and the clerk of the court close this case. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/23/14 recommending that this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/9/2014 ORDERING 46 Plaintiff's Motion for leave to expand the second amended complaint is DENIED; and plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days from the date of this order in which to file a Second Amended Complaint. (Reader, L)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/4/2013 ORDERING that the 28 Findings and Recommendations are ADOPTED IN PART. The 27 First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Plaintiff is GRANTED thirty days from the date of this order in which to file a Second Amended Complaint. This matter is REFERRED back to the assigned magistrate judge for further proceedings. (Zignago, K.)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/26/13 ORDERING that Petitioner's 39 motion to vacate is GRANTED, and the Order 35 and Judgment 36 of 2/14/2013 are hereby VACATED. Petitioner is granted 60 days from the date of this order to file objections to the Magistrate Judge's 28 Findings and Recommendations. (Kastilahn, A)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/13/12 RECOMMENDING that 27 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint be dismissed with prejudice. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections to F&R due within 21 days.(Dillon, M)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/22/2012 ORDERING that the 16 recommendation that this action be dismissed is VACATED; and plaintiff has until 3/16/2012, to file an amended complaint. (Yin, K)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/31/12 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Donald Oliver Hooker signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/22/2011. CDC is to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance and forward to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 4/19/2011 ORDERING that within thirty days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete the attached Notice of Submission and submit the following documents to the court: a complete Applicat ion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner, and a certified copy of plaintiff's prison trust account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice.(Duong, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooker v. Kimura-Yip et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nepomuceno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Kimura-Yip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Oliver Hooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?