Quinlan et al v. CitiMortgage, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bob Betzler and Karen Quinlan
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc., GC Services Limited Partnership, Allied International Credit Corp. and Nationwide Credit Recovery
Case Number: 2:2011cv00986
Filed: April 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/22/2014 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(l)(A)(ii). CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/9/14. Settlement Conference set for 6/11/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Confidential settlement conference statements due 7 days prior to conference. (Manzer, C)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/22/14: Jury Trial RESET for 1/12/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr., trial briefs due 10/23/14; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.; joint final pretrial conference statement due 10/23/14; Evidentiary or procedural motions due 10/23/2014, oppositions due 10/30/14, replies due 11/6/14. (Meuleman, A)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER ON STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 3/7/14. (Kastilahn, A)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/26/2014 GRANTING Defendants request to file documents under seal in support of their motion for summary judgment or in the alternative motions for partial summary judgment; Documents attached to the Declaration of Tom McCausland for Allied International Credit Corp.; the aforementioned documents shall remain under seal pending this Court's determination of whether they should remain permanently sealed. (Reader, L)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 AMENDED ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/27/2013 ORDERING that the 56 , 57 Motions to Dismiss brought on behalf of Defendants Allied International Credit Corp. and Pentagroup Financial LLC are GRANTED WITH PREJUDICE. The Fifth and Sixth Claims for relief against said Defendants (erroneously described as the Sixth and Seventh Claims for relief in the Courts prior 77 Order) are accordingly DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE. (Zignago, K.)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/21/2013 GRANTING defendants' 72 Request for Telephonic Appearance at Show Cause Hearing set for 8/22/2013 at 2:00 PM. (Marciel, M)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/7/2013 ORDERING that Defendant Nationwide Credit, Inc.'s 69 Ex Parte Application to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all of Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Nationwide Credit, Inc. in this lawsuit are DISMISSED with prejudice in their entirety. (Zignago, K.)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/1/2013 ORDERING 49 Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' FDCPA and Rosenthal Act claims against it is GRANTED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' invasion of privacy claim is GRANTED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. (Reader, L)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/19/13 ORDERING that defendant Pentagroup Financial, LLC, has an extension of time, up to and including 5/15/13 within which to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Meuleman, A)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION and ORDER 44 for extension of time signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/14/2013. Defendant Pentagroup Financial has up to and including 4/15/2013 within which to respond to plaintiff's 1 Complaint. (Marciel, M)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/23/12 ORDERING that the CITI Defendants' response to the Third Amended Complaint shall be filed by July 27, 2012. (Becknal, R)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER 35 for extension of time signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/6/2012. CITI defendants' response to 25 Third Amended Complaint shall be filed by 7/20/2012. (Marciel, M)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/21/2012 ORDERING that CITIBANK Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint is DENIED in its entirety. (Reader, L)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER 26 signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 12/5/11 ORDERING that CMI has until and including 12/6/11 to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Kastilahn, A)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/2/2011 GRANTING 17 CMI's Motion to Dismiss, with leave to amend, as to the Second, Third, Fifth and Seventh Claims for Relief. CMI's Motion to Dismiss the Fourth Claim fo r Relief, for breach of contract, is DENIED as to Pltf Quinlan but GRANTED as to pltf Betzler, without leave to amend. Pltfs may file a Second Amended Complaint, should they choose to do so, not later than 10 days following the date this Memorandum and Order is filed. (Reader, L)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/15/11 ORDERING that plaintiff's claims against GC Services Limited Partnership are dismissed without leave to amend. (Becknal, R)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/20/11: Defendant GC Services' Motion to Dismiss 5 is granted with leave to amend. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint not later than twenty (20) days after the date this Memorandum and Order is filed electronically. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinlan et al v. CitiMortgage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob Betzler
Represented By: Philip J. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Quinlan
Represented By: Philip J. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GC Services Limited Partnership
Represented By: David Ian Dalby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied International Credit Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Credit Recovery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?