February 10, 2017 |
Filing
108
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/10/2017 DECLINING to revoke the plaintiff's in forma pauperis status on appeal. (cc: Ninth Circuit) (Michel, G.)
|
February 2, 2017 |
Filing
105
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/1/2017 ORDERING 103 Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to file a notice of appeal regarding the court's 12/6/2016 denial of plaintiff's motion to vacate judgment under FRCP 60(b) is hereby GRANTED. (Reader, L)
|
December 6, 2016 |
Filing
102
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/05/16 ORDERING that plaintiff's 101 Motion to Vacate Judgment is DENIED. (Benson, A)
|
June 22, 2016 |
Filing
99
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/21/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 4/13/16 Request for dismissal 95 is GRANTED; Plaintiff's remaining Eighth Amendment claim against defendant Granadoz is DISMISSED without prejudice; And This CASE is CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
May 13, 2016 |
Filing
98
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/12/2016 LIFTING the stay imposed in this action on 2/25/2016; ADOPTING IN FULL 84 Findings and Recommendations; GRANTING 68 Motion to Dismiss with respect to the remaining First Amendment claims against Defendants Granadoz, Barnett and the remaining Eight Amendment claim against Defendant Barnett; DENYING 68 Motion to Dismiss with respect to the remaining Eight Amendment claim against Defendant Granadoz; ORDERING the plaintiff to inform th e court, within 21 days, whether he wishes to withdraw his 95 Request for Dismissal; CAUTIONING the plaintiff that if he fails to withdraw said request within 21 days, his remaining claim against Defendant Granadoz will be dismissed without prejudice. (Michel, G.)
|
February 25, 2016 |
Filing
92
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/25/16 ORDERING that all proceedings in this court are STAYED pending remand from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
January 28, 2016 |
Filing
89
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/27/16 denying 85 request for leave to serve further discovery requests. Plaintiff's request that the court vacate the findings and recommendations issued 1/08/16 is denied. (Plummer, M)
|
January 8, 2016 |
Filing
84
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/8/2016 RECOMMENDING that defendants', 68 motion for summary judgment be granted in part and denied in part as follows: (1) Granted with respect to plaintiff� 39;s remaining claims arising under the First Amendment; (2) Granted with respect to plaintiff's remaining Eighth Amendment claim against defendant Barnett resulting in defendant Barnett's dismissal from this action; and (3) Denied with respect to plaintiff's remaining Eighth Amendment claim against defendant Granadoz. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
September 8, 2015 |
Filing
81
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/8/2015 VACATING the 8/25/2015 findings and recommendations 78 ; and defendants may file a reply brief concerning their motion for summary judgment within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
August 25, 2015 |
Filing
78
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/25/15 recommending that this action be dismissed pursuant to FRCP 41(b). MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 68 referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
May 19, 2015 |
Filing
73
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/19/15 ordering that within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition to the motion for summary judgment or a statement of non-opposition. (Plummer, M)
|
December 22, 2014 |
Filing
65
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/22/14 granting 64 Motion to modify the scheduling order. The dispositive motion deadline shall be moved to 02/02/15. (Plummer, M)
|
September 26, 2013 |
Filing
45
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/26/13 ORDERING that 43 Motion to Amend the Complaint is GRANTED; Within 30 days, plaintiff may amend his original complaint by substituting the name M. Barnett for John Doe 1. Plaintiffs original complaint is dismissed. All discovery deadlines concerning plaintiffs claims against defendant Granadoz remain in effect. Plaintiff will be permitted time to conduct discovery with respect to any claims against defendant Barnett which survive the screening process.(Dillon, M)
|
August 7, 2013 |
Filing
42
ORDER denying 41 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/07/13. (Plummer, M)
|
June 18, 2013 |
Filing
39
AMENDED SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/18/2013 GRANTING plaintiff's 38 motion for case scheduling order and the 4/27/2012 discovery and scheduling order is hereby VACATED; Discovery due by 10/15/2013; Pretrial Motions, except motions to compel discovery due on or before 1/15/2014; pretrial conference and trial dates will be set as appropriate. (Yin, K)
|
May 2, 2013 |
Filing
32
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/02/13 ordering the deadline for dispositive motions in this case is extended to 05/30/13. (Plummer, M)
|
April 23, 2013 |
Filing
31
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/19/2013 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 28 are ADOPTED in PART, as to the outcome, for the reasons discused herein; and Defendant's 18 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. (Reader, L)
|
February 21, 2013 |
Filing
28
AMENDED FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 02/20/13 recommending that defendant's motion to dismiss 18 be denied. Motion to Dismiss 18 referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M) Modified on 2/21/2013 (Plummer, M).
|
January 8, 2013 |
Filing
24
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/07/13 denying 20 Motion for protective order. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendant's motion to dismiss 18 be granted. Plaintiff's claims brought under the First and Eighth Amendment be dismissed without prejudice; and the clerk be directed to close this case. Motion 18 referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
July 12, 2012 |
Filing
19
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 07/11/12 ORDERING that plaintiff's opposition to defendant's 18 Motion to Dismiss is due 08/10/12. Failure to file an opposition by 08/10/12 will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. Any reply to plaintiff's opposition shall be due no later than 14 days after service of the opposition. (Benson, A.)
|
December 9, 2011 |
Filing
11
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/9/11 ORDERING the director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Guillermo Chavez to the clerk until the balance of $350 is paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Director of the CDC. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial, CDC Prisoner Payment Orders ). (Dillon, M)
|