Davis v. Sacramento County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Terrence L. Davis
Defendant: Sacramento County Jail, J. Hernandez, Sean Woodward, K. Farrell, McEntire, Satak, Roberts and Gomez
Case Number: 2:2011cv01027
Filed: April 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/11/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall file a stipulation of dismissal within 90 days of this order; and if the stipulation cannot be filed within 90 days, plaintiff shall file a request for an extension of time before the expiration of the deadline. (Dillon, M)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER and WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/28/13 ORDERING the custodian to produce Terrence Lamont Davis at 10/10/13 at 1:00 p.m. in courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD and CMK) (Plummer, M)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/24/13 vacating 96 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to file objections to the findings and recommendations 106 is denied as moot. Defendants are granted 21 days within which to file their pretrial statement. Plaintiff's requests for the appointment of counsel 99 , 103 are denied. (Plummer, M)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/29/13 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/02/13 ordering that plaintiff shall file and serve his pretrial statement and any motions necessary to obtain the witnesses at trial on or before 03/01/13. Defendants shall file their pretrial statement on or before 03/15/13. (Plummer, M)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying 88 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/19/12. (Plummer, M)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/13/12 DENYING 71 Motion to quash the subpoena served by counsel for defendants on June 27, 2012 upon the litigation coordinator at California State Prison, Corcoran. (Dillon, M)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 8/3/2012 ORDERING 68 that, upon reconsideration, the order of the magistrate judge # 62 is AFFIRMED; Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel is DENIED without prejudice. (Reader, L)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 6/25/12 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 5/7/12 57 are ADOPTED in full; Defendant Woodward's 4/2/12 MOTION to Dismiss 47 is DENIED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/29/12 denying 59 , 60 Motions to Appoint Counsel. (Plummer, M)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/7/2012 ORDERING the clerk to assign a district court judge to this case; and RECOMMENDING that defendant Woodward's 47 motion to dismiss be denied. Assigned and Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections due within 21 days. (Yin, K)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/19/12 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Terrence Lamont Davis via telephonic conferencing at 10:00 a.m. on 5/2/12 in Courtroom 26 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: IT Dept; faxed to CSP Coordinator) (Manzer, C)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/26/2012 DENYING plaintiff's 35 motion for leave to amend. (Yin, K)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/3/12 denying 27 Motion for Reconsideration. (Dillon, M)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Terrence L. Davis signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/20/11. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Sacramento County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence L. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McEntire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Satak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?