Frazier v. Redding Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Lucas Frazier
Defendant: Redding Police Department, Jason Rhoads, Rebecca Zufall, Peggy Porter and Will Williams
Case Number: 2:2011cv01351
Filed: May 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/19/2015 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs by appointed pro bono counsel S. Ashar Ahmed is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER and WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/25/14 ORDERING the Custodian, Warden Carl Wofford, to produce Matthew Lucas Frazier for trial on 1/12/15 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 26 before Judge All ison Claire, and on each day thereafter until the completion of this proceeding or as otherwise ordered by the Court. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any change in the custody of Plaintiff, and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk (cc: OTCD). (Kastilahn, A)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/29/2014 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs by appointed pro bono counsel S. Ashar Ahmed is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/26/2014 ORDERING the Final Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 8/27/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire and the Jury Trial CONTINUED to 10/20/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. A Joint pretrial statement is due no later than 8/20/2014.(Donati, J)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/17/14 granting 126 Motion for Extension of time. The filing of the joint Pre-Trial Statement will now be due on June 30, 2014 and the pre-trial conference will be held on July 2, 2014.(Dillon, M)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/9/14 ORDERING that the current deadline of April 11, 2014 to file discovery obligations has been vacated and continued to May 2, 2014.(Dillon, M)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/04/14 ordering ( Pretrial Conference continued to 3/12/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Jury Trial continued to 8/18/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire.) (Plummer, M)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 01/21/14 ordering S. Ashar Ahmed and Kurt W. Melchior are appointed as counsel in the above entitled matter. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order upon S. Ashar Ahmed and Kurt W. Melchior, Nossaman LLP, 50 California Street, 34th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94111. The 01/20/14 pretrial conference on the papers is hereby vacated. ( Status Conference set for 2/5/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire.)(Plummer, M)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/05/13 ordering the parties to this action shall each, no later than 21 days from the date of this order, submit confidential settlement conference statements as described below. The confidential settlement statements shall not be served on the opposing party or filed with the court, but instead be delivered by mail, fax, email or personal delivery to the court's Alternative Dispute Resolution Division. (See order for details). (cc: ADR Director)(Plummer, M)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/30/13 ordering that defendants' motion for summary judgment 96 is granted as to defendants Zufall and the Redding Police Department (City of Redding) and denied as to defendant Rhoads. (Plummer, M)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/24/13 disregarding 107 Motion for TRO/preliminary injunctive relief. (Plummer, M)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/07/13 ordering that upon reconsideration, this court's order of 1/09/12 88 is affirmed. (Plummer, M)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/08/13 ordering the U.S. Marshal provide personal service of plaintiff's subpoena duces tecum upon the Shasta County Public Defender's Office within 14 days. A copy of this order is to b e served upon the U.S. Marshal's office along with plaintiff's subpoena duces tecum directed to the Shasta County Public Defender's Office. Plaintiff's request for service of the remaining 3 subpoenas duces tecum upon non-parties without pre-payment of the Marshal's costs of service is denied. The clerk of the court is to return the 3 unserved subpoenas to plaintiff with this order. (Plummer, M)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/5/12 ORDERING that Plaintiffs motions, filed on November 15, 2012 67 and 71 , are denied as moot. Plaintiffs November 16, 2012 72 motion for a protective order and/or further extension of time regarding filing his opposition to the now-vacated summary judgment motion is denied without prejudice for the reasons stated above. (Dillon, M)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/19/12 ORDERING that Plaintiffs motion for reconsideration, filed on May 4, 2012 (docket # 55 ), of the order filed on April 23, 2012 (docket # 45 ), is denied as moot. Plaintiffs motion fo r reconsideration, filed on May 14, 2012 (docket # 60 ), of the order filed on May 1, 2012 (docket # 54 ), is denied as moot. Plaintiffs motion for the court to provide subpoenas duces tecum to serve nonparties, filed on April 23, 2012 (docket # 47 ), is granted, and the Clerk of the Court is to provide blank subpoenas to plaintiff, which are signed in conformance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(a)(3); Plaintiffs three motions to compel discovery, filed on May 9, 2012 (docket # 57 , docket # 58 & docket # 59 ) are denied in part and granted in part as set forth above; Plaintiffs motion to compel production, filed on May 14, 2012 (docket # 61 ), is denied in part and granted in part, as set forth above; Defendants must file any p rotective order with respect to the redacted production granted within 14 days, following the issuance of which, defendants must produce any such records of defendants within 21 days thereafter; Defendants motion for summary judgment, filed on September 10, 2012 (docket # 64 ), is vacated from the courts calendar. (Dillon, M)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/30/12 ORDERING that plaintiffs 41 motion compel discovery responses from defendants is DENIED as moot; and plaintiffs motion for an extension of time of the discovery deadline 50 is DENIED. (Dillon, M)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/27/12 ORDERING that plaintiffs April 23, 2012 48 , motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED; and Plaintiffs motion for a stay of discovery, i.e., that his deposition be postponed or continued, filed on April 23, 2012 51 , is denied and plaintiff must appear for his deposition on May 3, 2012; failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action. (Dillon, M)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/23/2012 ORDERING that plaintiff's 34 motion to compel defendants to answer deposition questions is DENIED; plaintiff's 37 motion for an order compelling discovery is DENIED; and plaintiff's 33 request for appointment of counsel and 36 amended motion to appoint counsel are DENIED. (Yin, K)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/10/2012 ORDERING that PVSP Warden P.D. Brazelton has DISCHARGED the 2/15/12 and 3/15/12 court orders and has never been in contempt of court with regards to these orders; and plaintiff is to inform the court, within 14 days, whether his ability to prosecute this case is significantly obstructed due to a lack of writing paper or envelopes adequate to serve his discovery requests and responses upon defendants.(Yin, K)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/14/12 ORDERING that Within 21 days, Acting Warden Brazelton or his designee must show cause for his failure to respond to an order of this court in this matter and why he should n ot be sanctioned for contempt, in doing so, he must also provide the information sought by the February 15, 2012, order; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order by U.S. mail upon Acting Warden P.D. Brazelton, Pleasant Valley State Prison, P. O. Box 8500, Coalingua, CA 93210.(Dillon, M)
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/15/12 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 30 Motion for TRO. Plaintiffs motion for a TRO/preliminary injunctive relief, filed on 2/10/12, is construed as a motion for a protective order and as so construed is GRANTED to the extent that the warden of Pleasant Valley State Prison or his designee must inform this court, within 21 days, if plaintiff has been denied access to his legal property and the prison law library; if so, the court mu st be informed of accommodations being made to permit plaintiff to prosecute this action. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to provide plaintiff with two blank subpoena forms in response to plaintiffs request filed on 2/10/12; the request is otherwise DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this order by U.S. mail upon Acting Warden P.D. Brazelton, Pleasant Valley State Prison, P. O. Box 8500, Coalingua, CA 93210. (Meuleman, A)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/1/2011 ORDERING that plaintiff's 17 request for the appointment of counsel is DENIED; and plaintiff's 15 request for a subpoena form is GRANTED and the clerk to provide plaintiff with a blank subpoena form. (Yin, K)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/12/11 GRANTING 11 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiff is granted 28 days to file a second amended complaint. (Dillon, M)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Matthew Lucas Frazier signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/5/11: The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit on Director of CDC. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier v. Redding Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Lucas Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redding Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Zufall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?