Woodson v. Sahota et al
Plaintiff: Maurice Woodson
Defendant: P. Sahota, A. Nangalama, A. Deems, V. Duc, S. Sumas, Ali and Kim Sarver
Case Number: 2:2011cv01589
Filed: June 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/13/18 RECOMMENDING that the joint motion to approve the settlement agreement be granted. Motion 81 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 04/12/18 ORDERING ( Settlement Conference set for 7/10/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman.) The guardian ad litem shall be available by telephone. Wi thin thirty days from the date of this order, plaintiffs counsel shall advise the court whether or not he wishes plaintiff to appear at the settlement conference, either by phone or by videoconference. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on plaintiffs guardian ad litem, Mauriceana Woodson, 1700 East Date Street, Apt. 1020, San Bernardino, CA 92404. (Plummer, M)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/23/2018 APPOINTING Joshua Kaizuka as limited purpose counsel on behalf of plaintiff's guardian ad litem. Joshua Kaizuka's appointment will terminate 15 days after completion of the settlement conference, or any continuation of the settlement conference. (Yin, K)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER adopting 68 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/20/17: This action is temporarily stayed pending re-evaluation of plaintiff's competency for trial in his pending criminal case. (Kaminski, H)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/21/17 recommending that this action be temporarily stayed pending re-evaluation of plaintiff's competency for trial in his pending criminal case. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/28/17 ordering the Custodian to produce Maurice Woodson on 6/14/17 at 9:30 a.m. in courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD)(Plummer, M)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/23/17 granting 60 motion to file information under seal. The 5 pages of plaintiff's next of kin information shall be filed under seal. (Plummer, M)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/8/2017 PARTIALLY GRANTING plaintiff's 55 motion for appointment of counsel; within 14 days, counsel for defendant shall provide the court with the names, addresses and contact information for plaintiff's next of kin. (cc: ADR) (Yin, K)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/5/16 adopting 47 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Kaminski, H)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 02/26/16 recommending that defendants' motion for summary judgment 39 be denied with respect to the claim that defendant failed to prescribe pain medication that adequately managed plaintiff's chronic pain. In all other respects, defendant's motion should be granted. MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 39 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/20/15 ordering plaintiff's motion to compel 29 is denied as moot. Plaintiff's motion to extend the discovery deadline 30 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's request fo r a copy of his deposition transcript 32 is denied. Plaintiff's request for an extension of time in which to correct his deposition testimony 32 is denied without prejudice. Defendant's motion to extend the pretrial motions deadline 36 is granted. The pretrial motions deadline is extended to 8/10/15, and defendant's motion for summary judgment 39 is deemed timely filed. (Plummer, M)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/20/15 ORDERING that Defendants April 16, 2015 Request for Leave to Renotice Plaintiffs Deposition is withdrawn.(Dillon, M)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/5/2013 VACATING the 12 findings and recommendations; GRANTING plaintiff's 13 motion for an extension of time; plaintiff has 30 days to file an amended complaint; and no further extensions of time will be granted. (Yin, K)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/16/2013 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Maurice Woodson signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/22/2012. CDC is to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodson v. Sahota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Woodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Sahota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Nangalama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Deems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Duc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Sumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Sarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?