April 30, 2013 |
Filing
81
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/29/13 ORDERING that this action shall be STAYED pending final approval of the settlement. The attorney filing this document confirms that all other signatories listed, and on whose behalf the filing is submitted, concur in the filing's content and have authorized the filing. (Becknal, R) Modified on 4/30/2013 (Krueger, M).
|
March 15, 2013 |
Filing
77
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/15/13. The hearing as to 71 MOTION for CLASS CERTIFICATION is RESET for 6/17/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Opposition due on or before 6/3/13. Reply to opposition due on or before 6/10/13. (Manzer, C)
|
October 30, 2012 |
Filing
65
ORDER granting 62 plaintiff's motion for leave to file a third amended complaint, signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/29/12. The motion hearing currently set for 11/5/12 is VACATED. Plaintiff's third amended complaint SHALL be filed and served on Defendants within seven days of entry of this order. (Kastilahn, A)
|
September 5, 2012 |
Filing
61
STIPULATION AND ORDER ON PROTOCOL FOR PRODUCTION OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION, signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/5/12. (Kastilahn, A)
|
August 17, 2012 |
Filing
58
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/13/12. (Benson, A.)
|
May 4, 2012 |
Filing
51
ORDER denying 26 Motion to Dismiss signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/3/12. (Matson, R)
|
February 23, 2012 |
Filing
39
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/22/2012 ORDERING 37 Initial Scheduling Conference Reset for 6/25/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Hearing CONTINUED to 4/23/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. 26 (Reader, L)
|
February 21, 2012 |
Filing
36
ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/21/12, ORDERING that 26 the Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint is CONTINUED to 3/12/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Kastilahn, A)
|
February 3, 2012 |
Filing
33
STIPULATION and ORDER 32 signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/3/12: Defendants' 26 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint is RESET to 2/27/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. The Initial Pretrial Status Conference is CONTINUED to 3/26/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Kastilahn, A)
|
November 23, 2011 |
Filing
28
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/23/2011 re: 27 Stipulation and Proposed Order ORDERING plaintiff shall file any opposition brief to defendants Motion to Dismiss on or before 12/23/2011; defendants reply due 1/24/2012; defendant's motion hearing SET for 2/13/2012 at 10:00 a.m.; Initial Pretrial Status Conference SET for 2/27/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Waggoner, D)
|
September 27, 2011 |
Filing
21
STIPULATION and ORDER 20 signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/26/11; Plaintiff will file her Second Amended Complaint on 10/24/11; The hearing currently set for 11/7/11, on defendants' Motion to Dismiss is taken off calendar; and the Initial Scheduling Conference is continued to 12/19/2011 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Matson, R)
|
August 19, 2011 |
Filing
17
JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/18/11 ORDERING that defendants file their Motion to Dismiss on 8/24/11; opposition brief due 10/3/11; reply brief due 10/24/11; motion hearing to be set for 11/7/11 at 10:00 a.m. Initial Scheduling Conference RESET for 12/5/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. The parties shall file status reports fourteen (14) days prior to the status conference. (Meuleman, A)
|
July 15, 2011 |
Filing
9
STIPULATION and ORDER 8 re filing of Amended Complaint and for extension of time signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/14/2011. Defendants need not responde to initial Complaint. Plaintiff shall file First Amended Complaint on 7/25/2011 to add claim for damages in CLRA cause of action. Defendants, w/out waiving any defenses or submitting to jurisdiction of Court, shall have through and including 8/24/2011 to respond. (Marciel, M)
|