Overton v. Warden of CMF Vacaville
Petitioner: Michael L. Overton
Respondent: Warden of CMF Vacaville
Case Number: 2:2011cv01646
Filed: June 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Luis Obispo
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Nature of Suit: Mandamus and Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 5/7/12 ORDERING that 13 Findings and Recommendations are VACATED; RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 12/8/11 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 10/11/11 ORDERING that 9 Motion is DENIED; 10 Findings and Recommendations are VACATED; Plaintiff is granted one final period of 30 days from 10/10/11 in which to comply with this courts 7/29/11 order; and Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a copy of the 7/29/11 order with service of this order.(Dillon, M)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 09/13/11 RECOMMENDING that the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be dismissed w/o prejudice; Objections to these F&Rs due w/i 14 days; referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Benson, A.)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 7/28/11 ORDERING that plaintiff's 6/17/11 petition for order of mandamus is DENIED without prejudice; Plaintiff is granted 30 days to file a complaint that complies with the requirements; plaint iff shall also submit, within 30 days, the application to proceed IFP or the $350 filing fee; Clerk to send plaintiff the court's form for filing a civil rights action, and the IFP application; 6 Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Overton v. Warden of CMF Vacaville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of CMF Vacaville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael L. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?