Segalman v. Southwest Airlines Co.
Plaintiff: Robert Segalman
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Case Number: 2:2011cv01800
Filed: July 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/4/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff's third claim for negligence is DISMISSEd with prejudice, and Southwest Airlines Co. is awarded costs in the amount of $2038.59. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/23/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION 62 is DENIED. Plaintiff is free to either file a renewed motion seeking dismissal with prejudice or to proceed with litigation in this Court.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/27/16: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 10/7/2016. Discovery due by 9/9/2016. Last day to hear Dispositive Motions 2/10/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/13/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. Jury Trial set for 6/5/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/11/16 ORDERING that Defendant's MOTION to DISMISS ECF No. 51 is DENIED to the extent it requests that the Court strike various portions of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (TAC). However, Defendant's Motion is GRANTED to the extent it seeks dismissal of the first, second, and fourth causes of action in the TAC. The dismissal of the first cause of action is without leave to amend, and the dismissal of second and fourth causes of action is with leave to amend. Not later than twenty (20) days following the date this Memorandum and Order is electronically filed, Plaintiff may, but is not required to, file a Fourth Amended Complaint. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/10/2015 ORDERING that Plaintiff's request to file a Third Amended Complaint is hereby GRANTED. Southwest shall have until 9/18/2015 to file a motion to dismiss the Third Amended Complaint or otherwise respond to the complaint. (Zignago, K.)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/23/2012 defendant's 30 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Because the Court believes that deficiencies of Complaint cannot be cured through amendment, no leave to amend will be accorded. Clerk directed to CLOSE this file. (Marciel, M)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/19/12: Plaintiff's Motion to Amend (ECF No. 17) is GRANTED, and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 16) is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff shall file his Second Amended Complaint not later than five (5) days following the date this Memorandum and Order is electronically filed. (Kaminski, H)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/5/12 GRANTING 11 Motion to Amend the Complaint; First Amended Complaint due not later than 3 days following the date this Order is electronically filed. (Manzer, C)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 2/13/12, ORDERING that plaintiff's request for telephone appearance is GRANTED; counsel may appear telephonically. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Segalman v. Southwest Airlines Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Segalman
Represented By: Theodore Arthur Pinnock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?