Luciano v. United States of America, et al.,
Plaintiff: Robert A Luciano, Jr.
Defendant: United States of America, United States Department of Agriculture, Tom Vilsack, United States Forest Service, Tom Tidwell, Randy Moore, Alice B Carlton and Deb Bumpus
Case Number: 2:2011cv01831
Filed: July 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/6/14 ORDERING that Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment 38 is GRANTED and Plaintiff's MOTION 33 is DENIED. The Clerk is ordered to close this case. CASE CLOSED (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/15/2013 ORDERING The express statutory language and abundance of case law reviewing land exchange proposals necessitate the conclusion that Plaintiffs APA claims are judicially reviewable. Accordingly, this Court finds there IS subject matter jurisdiction.(Waggoner, D)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 3/28/13 ORDERING that a briefing is required and scheduled for 5/6/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.; each party shall file a brief no later than 4/15/13; replies due no later than 4/22/13; hearing as to 33 Motion for Summary Judgment and 38 Motion for Summary Judgment reset for 8/12/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Manzer, C)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 3/19/13 ORDERING that the United States' deadline for filing a reply to Plaintiff's opposition to 38 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT is EXTENDED to 3/25/13. (Meuleman, A)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 12/19/12 ORDERING 27 Motion is stricken and 28 Ex Parte Motion is denied. (Matson, R)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 9/12/2012 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed no later than 1/14/2013. Defendants' Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed no later than 2/4/2013. Plaintiff's Reply and Opposition shall be filed no later than 2/25/2013. Defendants' Reply shall be filed no later than 3/18/2013. The hearing on the cross-motions for summary judgment shall be noticed for 4/8/2013, at 9:00 a.m. In the event the referenced cross-motions for summary judgment do not dispose of the case in its entirety, a further status conference is scheduled to commence at 9:00 a.m. on 6/24/2013. (Zignago, K.)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/19/12: Plaintiff shall file a motion for an order authorizing discovery and/or to augment the administrative record no later than August 13, 2012. Status Conference RESET for 9/17/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/7/12 CONTINUING Status Conference set to 4/23/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. A joint status report shall be filed 14 days prior to the hearing; ORDERING the United States to file and serve, if necessary, any additions to the Administrative Record on or before 4/16/12 and CONTINUING Motion Hearing re: 10 , 11 , and 12 Motions to 5/14/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Meuleman, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luciano v. United States of America, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice B Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Bumpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A Luciano, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Harry Hart, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?