Vogan et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al
Plaintiff: Billi Vogan and Harold Traupel
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA, U.S. Bankcorp and First American Trustee Servicing Solucions, LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv02098
Filed: August 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 FINAL JUDGMENT dated *5/8/13* signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/7/13. (Kastilahn, A)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/8/2013 ORDERING that this matter is REFERRED back to the District Judge assigned to this action. All dates pending before the undersigned are VACATED. Henceforth the caption on documents filed in this action shall be 2:11-cv-2098 JAM AC. (Zignago, K.)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/25/2012 ORDERING that the deadline for expert witness disclosures is CONTINUED to 11/6/2012. The deadline for supplemental disclosures and disclosure of rebuttal experts is hereby CONTINUED to 11/20/2012. All other deadlines set forth in this Court's scheduling order of 3/5/2012, shall remain in full force and effect. (Zignago, K.)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/11/2012 DENYING 35 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order; GRANTING 38 Request for Judicial Notice. (Michel, G)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/16/11 ORDERING that defendant's 10 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: Plaintiffs' claim for negligence against Defendants is DISMISSED with prejudice; Plaintiffs& #039; claims for declaratory relief and an accounting against Defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice; and the Court's previous Order dismissing with prejudice all remaining claims against First American is REAFFIRMED; Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' remaining claims is DENIED. Defendants shall file their answers to Plaintiffs' Complaint within twenty (20) days of this Order. (Benson, A.)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/24/11 ORDERING that Moving Defendants' request to appear telephonically is granted. (Becknal, R)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/22/2011 ACCEPTING Plaintiff's 13 Notice of Errata. (Michel, G)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vogan et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bankcorp
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Trustee Servicing Solucions, LLC
Represented By: Nicole K. Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billi Vogan
Represented By: Deborah Pauline Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Traupel
Represented By: Deborah Pauline Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?