June 23, 2016 |
Filing
120
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/23/2016 ORDERING that the action against defendants City of Elk Grove and Paul Beckham is DISMISSED with prejudice. All parties to bear its/their own attorneys' fees and costs. (Zignago, K.)
|
May 2, 2016 |
Filing
118
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/2/2016 re 109 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting New Trial, or in the alternative, Request to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal: IT IS ORDERED that (1) Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's March 9, 2016 Order be, and the same hereby is, DENIED; (2) Defendant's Motion For Certification for Interlocutory Appeal of the Court's Grant of a New Trial be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED; and (3) 115 Plaintiff's Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal of the Court's Denial of His Renewed Motion for Judgment As a Matter of Law be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. (Kirksey Smith, K)
|
March 16, 2016 |
Filing
111
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/16/16 ORDERING that Defendant's request to appear telephonically at the March 28, 2016, Scheduling Conference, is granted. (Becknal, R)
|
March 9, 2016 |
Filing
108
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/9/2016 re 99 Plaintiff's MOTION for NEW TRIAL: IT IS ORDERED that 99 Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for a Judgment as a Matter of Law be, and the same hereby is, DENIED; and [9 9] Plaintiffs Motion for a New Trial be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. The Clerk is instructed to vacate the 94 Judgment of 11/18/2015 and this matter is set for a Status Conference on 3/28/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb to set a new trial date. cc: Sac Ops Supvsr. (Kirksey Smith, K)
|
January 21, 2016 |
Filing
106
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/21/2016 ORDERING 99 Hearing on Motion for New Trial CONTINUED to 3/7/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Reader, L)
|
January 19, 2016 |
Filing
104
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/19/2016 DENYING 103 Defendant's Request to Appear by Telephone: Because defense counsel represents that he has a conflict on the date the motion is presently set for hearing, the hearing will be continued to a date when counsel for both sides can appear. Counsel shall accordingly contact the courtroom deputy clerk to arrange to have the matter reset for hearing on a mutually available date. (Kirksey Smith, K)
|
November 30, 2015 |
Filing
94
JUDGMENT dated *11/18/2015* signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/24/2015, in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff, pursuant to jury verdict. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
|
September 11, 2015 |
Filing
49
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/11/2015 GRANTING 48 Plaintiff's Counsel Dale K. Galipo's Request to appear by telephone at the Pretrial Conference on 9/14/2015 at 2:00 p.m. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
|
January 13, 2015 |
Filing
42
ORDER continuing 3/30/2015 Jury Trial to 11/9/2015 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 7. 2/5/2015 Final Pretrial Conference vacated and continued to 9/17/2015 at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 7. Signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/13/2015. (Deutsch, S)
|
March 26, 2014 |
Filing
40
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/25/2014 CONTINUING the Jury Trial to 3/30/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; ORDERING the parties to file trial briefs by 1/22/2015; CONTINUING the Final Pretrial Conference to 2/5/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; ORDERING the parties to file a joint final pretrial conference statement by 1/15/2015; ORDERING the parties to file evidentiary or procedural motions by 1/15/2015; ORDERING the parties to file oppositions by 1/22/2015; ORDERING the parties to file replies by 1/29/2015. (Michel, G)
|
February 6, 2014 |
Filing
39
ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/5/2014 ORDERING that the jury trial is VACATED and CONTINUED to 9/8/2014, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7. The parties shall file trial briefs not later than 6/26/2014. The 3/20/2 014 Final Pretrial Conference is VACATED and CONTINUED to 7/10/2014, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 7. The Joint Final Pretrial Statement is due not later than 6/19/2014. Any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed by 6/19/2014. Oppositions must be filed by 6/26/2014 and any reply must be filed by 7/3/2014. The motions will be heard by the Court at the same time as the Final Pretrial Conference. (Zignago, K.)
|
January 6, 2014 |
Filing
28
ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 1/6/14 ORDERING the Jury Trial CONTINUED to 5/12/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. Trial briefs shall be filed not later than 1/9/2014. The Final Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED to 3/20/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. (Kastilahn, A)
|
July 24, 2013 |
Filing
19
STIPULATION and ORDER to modify 16 Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/23/2013. Expert Witness Disclosure cut-off date is MOVED to 8/16/2013. (Marciel, M)
|
August 31, 2012 |
Filing
15
STIPULATION and ORDER 14 signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/31/12; The non-expert discovery cut-off date currently set for October 19, 2012, be moved to January 22, 2013; The expert witness disclosure cut-off date currently set for Decem ber 19, 2012 be moved to March 19, 2013; The Dispositive Motion cut-off date currently set for April 18, 2013 be moved to July 18, 2013; The Joint Pretrial Statement currently due June 6, 2013 be due to September 6, 2013; The Final Pretrial Conferenc e currently set for June 27, 2013 at 2:00pm be moved to September 26, 2013; The deadline to file any trial briefs, currently set for June 13, 2013, be moved to September 13, 2013; The deadline to file any evidentiary or procedural motions, currently set for June 6, 2013, be moved to September 6, 2013; The deadline to file an opposition to any evidentiary or procedural motion, currently set for June 13, 2013, be moved to September 13, 2013; The deadline to file any reply in support of an evidentiary or procedural motion, currently set for June 20, 2013, be moved to September 20, 2013; and the Trial currently set for August 19, 2013 at 9:00am, be moved to December 2, 2013.(Matson, R)
|
January 19, 2012 |
Filing
13
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/18/12: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 12/19/2012. Discovery due by 10/19/2012. Dispositive Motions filed by 4/18/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. Jury Trial set for 8/19/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
|