April 25, 2017 |
Filing
137
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/25/17 ordering the clerk of the court shall send plaintiff 1 USM-285 form, 1 summons, instruction sheet and a copy of the 2/01/16 amended complaint to be completed and returned with the notice of submission of documents within 30 days from the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
|
April 18, 2017 |
Filing
136
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 04/18/17 ordering that within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition to the motion for summary judgment or statement of non-opposition. (Plummer, M)
|
December 2, 2016 |
Filing
134
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/1/16 ORDERING that Defendants' motion to compel (ECF No. 133 ) is granted; and Plaintiff is ordered to provide responses to Defendant Foster's Interrogatories, Set One; Defendant Foster's Requests for Production of Documents, Set One, and Defendant Gray's Interrogatories, Set One within ten (10) days from the date this Order is signed.(Becknal, R)
|
September 30, 2016 |
Filing
132
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/30/2016 GRANTING defendants' 130 motion to compel. Plaintiff is ORDERED to provide responses to defendants' Interrogatories, Set One and Request for Production of Documents, Set One within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
January 6, 2016 |
Filing
109
ORDER; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/6/16 ORDERING that 108 Motion for Extension is DENIED; it is RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Dillon, M)
|
October 6, 2015 |
Filing
103
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/6/15 RECOMMEDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
|
June 4, 2015 |
Filing
94
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/04/15 ordering that plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff's motion for medical records 88 is denied as premature. (Plummer, M)
|
May 26, 2015 |
Filing
90
AMENDED ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/26/2015 ORDERING that by 4 p.m. on 5/27/2015, defendants' counsel shall contact Judge Newman's chambers to SHOW GOOD CAUSE why the settlement conference should not go forward as planned. Failure to comply with this order may result in sanctions. (cc: KJN, ADR) (Yin, K)
|
March 26, 2015 |
Filing
87
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/26/15. ordering plaintiff's motion 86 is granted, and the deadline for filing an amended complaint 82 is hereby vacated. (Plummer, M)
|
March 13, 2015 |
Filing
85
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/12/15 ordering the custodian to produce Sammy R. Quair on 06/02/15 at 1:00 p.m. in courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD and KJN) (Plummer, M)
|
February 6, 2015 |
Filing
80
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 02/06/15 ordering that the parties shall within 30 days from the date of this order, so inform the court's Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) division, in writing if they believe a settle ment conference would be beneficial, at the following address, fax number, or email address: ADR Division, Attention: Sujean Park, U.S. District Court, 501 I Street, Suite 4-200, Sacramento, CA, 95814, Fax: 916-491-3912, Email: spark@caed.uscourts.gov. (cc: ADR Director)(Plummer, M)
|
February 4, 2015 |
Filing
79
ORDER denying 78 Motion for leave to back discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 02/03/15. (Plummer, M)
|
January 6, 2015 |
Filing
77
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/06/15 granting 76 Motion to Amend the Complaint. No later than 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint in Case No. 2:11-cv-2293 JAM CKD P. (Plummer, M)
|
November 20, 2014 |
Filing
74
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/20/14 ORDERING that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint in this case no later than 30 days from the date of this order. (Kastilahn, A)
|
November 3, 2014 |
Filing
73
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/3/2014. The actions 2:11-CV-2293 JAM CKD P and 2:11-CV-2294 KJM KJN P are CONSOLIDATED. Clerk shall file a copy of this Order in both cases for sake of notification. Upon filing this Order, Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE 2:11-CV-2294 KJM KJN P and all future filing shall be submitted in 2:11-CV-2293 JAM CKD P. (Marciel, M)
|
May 10, 2013 |
Filing
60
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/10/13 ORDERING that plaintiff is granted 14 days after service of this order to file objections to the March 8, 2013 findings and recommendations. No further extensions will be granted; and Plaintiffs motion for various relief 59 is otherwise denied.(Dillon, M)
|
March 8, 2013 |
Filing
55
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/08/13 recommending that defendant's motion for summary judgment 44 be granted; and this case be closed. MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 44 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
March 1, 2013 |
Filing
54
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/01/13 vacating 52 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 53 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Plummer, M)
|
February 1, 2013 |
Filing
52
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/1/2013 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
|
October 30, 2012 |
Filing
47
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/30/12: Within thirty days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to the motion for summary judgment. (Kaminski, H)
|
September 18, 2012 |
Filing
45
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/18/12 ordering that plaintiff has now received the notice required unders Woods v. Carey. (Plummer, M)
|
April 24, 2012 |
Filing
39
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/24/2012 ORDERING that plaintiff's 38 motion for issuance of subpoenas is DENIED; and all requests for discovery pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 31, 33, 34 or 36 shall not be served later than 14 days after service of this order. (Yin, K)
|
December 28, 2011 |
Filing
26
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/28/2011 ORDERING that # 25 plaintiff's request for the appointment of counsel is DENIED. (Reader, L)
|
October 28, 2011 |
Filing
21
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/28/11 ORDERING the Sheriff of Butte County to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Sammy R. Quair, Sr. to the clerk until the balance of 6;350 is paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Butte County. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial). (Dillon, M)
|
October 5, 2011 |
Filing
19
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/05/11 ordering plaintiff's 09/23/11 motion to stop all court proceedings 10 is denied; however, plaintiff may file a motion to voluntarily dismiss this action at any time. Plaintiff's 09/27/11 motion to stay 14 is denied as inapposite. Plaintiff's motion for ordering the U.S. Marshal to transport prisoner to a safe environment 18 is denied. (Plummer, M)
|
September 23, 2011 |
Filing
9
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/23/11 ordering plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint and the certification require on the application form. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff a new application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. (Plummer, M)
|
September 6, 2011 |
Filing
5
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/2/2011 ORDERING that Pltf's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk to send Pltf a new IFP application. Pltf shall submit, within 30 days, a completed IFP. (Zignago, K.)
|