September 11, 2014 |
Filing
56
DEFAULT JUDGMENT against defendant Humberto Leon Sanchez, Jr.. (Marciel, M)
|
August 15, 2014 |
Filing
52
ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/14/14 ORDERING that the 8/20/14 hearing on Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment is VACATED. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's Renewed MOTION For Defau lt Judgment 50 be granted; The court enter judgment against defendant on Plaintiff's claims brought pursuant to 47 U.S.C. § 605 (a); The court award statutory damages in an amount of $5,000.00 to Plaintiff; and This case be closed. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Objections to these Findings and Recommendations are due within fourteen days.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
June 30, 2014 |
Filing
49
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/27/2014 ORDERING 43 that the 7/2/2014 hearing on plaintiff's motion for default judgment is VACATED; and plaintiff's motion for default judgment is DENIED without prejudice to its renewal with supporting documents consistent with the allegations in the pleading. (Reader, L)
|
May 2, 2014 |
Filing
47
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 5/1/14 ORDERING that the Status Conference is CONTINUED to 9/15/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. A status report shall be filed 14 days prior to the status conference in which Plaintiff is required to explain the status of the default proceedings. (Kastilahn, A)
|
April 16, 2014 |
Filing
42
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 4/16/2014 ORDERING the plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing by 4/28/2014 as to why sanctions should not be imposed against it and/or its counsel for failure to prosecute and/or failure to f ollow court orders; ORDERING that the response to the Order to Show Cause state whether the plaintiff or its counsel is at fault and whether a hearing on the Order to Show Cause is requested; CONTINUING the Status Conference to 5/12/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; ORDERING that a Status Report be filed fourteen (14) days prior to the Status Conference; WARNING the plaintiff that failure to timely respond to this Order to Show Cause could result in sanctions, including dismissal. (Michel, G)
|
December 5, 2013 |
Filing
40
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 12/4/13, ORDERING that Defendant's Answer is stricken and default be entered by the Clerk. Further, the 1/13/2014 final pretrial conference and the 2/25/2014 trial are VACATED. Further, a Status Conference is SET for 4/28/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. A status report shall be filed 14 days prior to the status conference. (Kastilahn, A)
|
November 20, 2013 |
Filing
39
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE and CONTINUING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/19/13: Show Cause Response in writing due by 12/2/2013. If a hearing is requested, it will be held on 12/10/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 ( GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. Defendant is warned that the failure to timely respond to this order and/or other court orders could result in sanctions, including the striking of Defendant's Answer filed 4/4/12, and the entry of defa ult by the Clerk of the Court. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 1/13/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. A joint final pretrial statement shall be filed no later than 7 days prior to the conference. (Meuleman, A)
|
November 8, 2012 |
Filing
34
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/08/12 ORDERING that no later than 11/16/2012, Defendant shall provide to Plaintiff's counsel a phone number at which defendant can be reached so that settlement discussions may be facilitated. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
October 3, 2012 |
Filing
29
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/3/12 ORDERING The dates set forth in the 5/9/12 scheduling order 23 are confirmed. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of the scheduling order on the defendant proceeding pro se. This matter is set for status conference before the undersigned on 11/7/12 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom no. 26. The parties shall file a joint status report one week prior to the conference and shall set forth therein the position of the parties with respect to whether a settlement conference should be set in this matter and whether the parties will waive disqualification of the undersigned for presiding over said settlement conference. (Matson, R)
|
May 29, 2012 |
Filing
24
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 05/25/12 ORDERING that plaintiff's 18 Motion to Strike is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART: defendant's first, second, third,fourth, sixth, seventh, eighth, ninth, tenth, eleventh, twelft h, thirteenth, fourteenth, fifteenth, sixteenth, seventeenth, eighteenth, and nineteenth affirmative defenses are STRICKEN. Defendant is granted 14 days to file an amended answer addressing the deficiencies in any stricken affirmative defense. (Benson, A.)
|
February 13, 2012 |
Filing
15
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 2/10/2012 CONTINUING the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference until 5/21/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 14 days prior to the Status Conference. (Michel, G)
|
December 6, 2011 |
Filing
7
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 12/6/11: Initial Scheduling Conference RESET for 2/27/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
|