Gooden v. Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., et al.,
Plaintiff: Sheila Gooden
Defendant: Suntrust Mortgage, Inc. and Suntrust Banks, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv02595
Filed: September 30, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/20/15 ORDERING that Plaintiffs Michelle Hall and Sheila Gooden and all of their claims are hereby DISMISSED from this action with prejudice. Each party shall bear their/its own attorneys' fees and costs. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/24/14 ORDERING that the Court EXTENDS the stay in this case until 10/30/2014. By 10/23/2014, the parties are to submit a statement informing the Court that the parties have successfully completed settlement, requesting a further stay, or propose a schedule to proceed with litigation. (Kastilahn, A)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/15/14: The Court hereby extends the stay in this case until September 30, 2014. (Kaminski, H)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/2/2014: Pursuant to the stipulation and request of the parties, the Court extends the stay in this case until September 19, 2014. By September 12, 2014, the parties are to submit a statement informing the Court that the parties have successfully completed settlement, requesting a further stay, or propose a schedule to proceed with litigation. (Owen, K)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/22/14 ORDERING Pursuant to the stipulation and request of the parties, and for good cause shown, the Court hereby extends the stay in this case until September 5, 2014. By August 29, 2014, the parties are to submit a statement informing the Court that the parties have successfully completed settlement, requesting a further stay, or propose a schedule to proceed with litigation. (Becknal, R)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/25/14 ORDERING Pursuant to the stipulation and request of the parties, and for good cause shown, the Court hereby extends the stay in this case until August 29, 2014. By August 22, 2014, the parties are to submit a statement informing the Court that the parties have successfully completed settlement, requesting a further stay, or propose a schedule to proceed with litigation. (Becknal, R)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/1/2014 VACATING all pending deadlines in this action; STAYING all proceedings for a period of thitry (30) days, up to, and including, 7/27/2014; ORDERING the parties to submit a joint status report by 7/25/2014. (Michel, G)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 FURTHER STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/29/14 ORDERING that the deadline to file any dispositive motions in this case shall be EXTENDED from 5/30/14 to 6/30/14, subject to Court order with any hearings on such motions to be heard by 8/20/14 at 9:30 a.m. All other deadlines in this case will remain as previously ordered.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/25/2014 ORDERING all parties to file dispositive motions by 5/30/2014; ORDERING that said motions be noticed with a hearing date of 7/9/2014. (Michel, G)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/12/14 re: 116 , 115 , AMENDING Expert Disclosure deadline. (Meuleman, A)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/16/2013 ORDERING the deadline for expert witness disclosures is extended to 1/13/2014 and the deadline for supplemental/rebuttal expert disclosures is extended to 2/12/2014. (Donati, J)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/11/2013 DENYING in its entirety 80 Motion for Class Certification. (Michel, G)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/2/2013 ORDERING that Defendant's 66 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in its entirety without leave to amend. (Zignago, K.) Modified on 10/3/2013 (Zignago, K.).
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/16/2013 ORDERING 74 Request to Seal Document(s) filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc. is GRANTED; Documents (detailed in this Order) are SEALED pursuant to Local Rule 141 and shall be accessed only by the Court, by the Court authorized personnel, and by parties in this action and their counsel until such time as a motion is granted unsealing such documents and portions of documents. (Waggoner, D)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/9/2013 GRANTING 70 REQUEST to Conditionally Seal Documents. (Donati, J)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/16/13 AMENDING class certification briefing schedule. Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification to be filed by 8/16/13; defendant's opposition due 10/17/13; plaintiffs' reply due 11/1/13; Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 11/6/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Meuleman, A)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/19/13 GRANTING 50 Motion to Amend the Complaint. The 50 proposed amended complaint attached as Exhibit A to Eric J. Bueschers declaration (Doc. #50-1) is deemed filed as of the date of this Order. Defendant is ORDERED to file its responsive pleading to the Amended Complaint within 20 days of this Order. (Meuleman, A)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER 53 for modification of Briefing Scheduling and Pre-Trial Scheduling Order signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/3/2013. Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification to filed by 6/28/2013. Defendant's Opposition to Motion shall be submitted by 8/30/2013. Plaintiff's Reply in support of Motion is now due by 9/20/2013. Hearing on Motion to be set for 10/9/2013 at 9:30 AM. Expert Witness Disclosures shall be filed by 12/18/2013. Supplemental / Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due 1/17/2014. Completion of Discovery now set for 2/19/2013. Final Pretrial Conference is RE-SET for 6/6/2014 at 10:00 AM and Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 7/14/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM). (Marciel, M)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION and ORDER 47 amending Class Certification Motion Briefing Schedule signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/8/2013. Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification to be filed by 4/5/2013. Defendant's Opposition due by 5/10/2013. Plaintiff's Reply in support of Motion to be filed by 6/7/2013. Hearing on Motion to set for 6/19/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM). (Marciel, M)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION and ORDER re the production of electronically stored information signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/14/13. (Kaminski, H)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/4/2013. Plaintiff's 41 Motion to Compel is GRANTED subject to Protective Order already in place except as to redacted account number which may remain redacted. Defendant shall have 10 days from date of service of Order to produce Discovery responses at issue. Plaintiff's Request for Sanctions is DENIED. (Marciel, M)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/7/2012 GRANTING 39 Stipulated Protective Order and Confidentiality.(Reader, L)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ADOPTING 32 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/19/12. The 25 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED; Discovery and the filing of any motion is STAYED pending the ruling by the Bankruptcy Court on the motion to approve settlement; notice of decision to be filed immediately upon a decision being rendered by the Bankruptcy Court; amended joint rule 26(f) conference report due within 14 days of the notice. (Manzer, C)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/8/12 RECOMMENDING that 25 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER be granted; discovery and the filing of any motion be stayed pending the ruling by the Bankruptcy Court on the motion t o approve settlement set for hearing in that court on 7/3/12; the parties be directed to file a notice of decision immediately upon a decision being rendered by the Bankruptcy Court; and the parties be directed to file an Amended Joint Rule 26(f) Con ference Report, taking into account for length of time discovery is stayed, within 14 days of the filing of the notice of the Bankruptcy Courts decision with this court. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due 7 days after these findings and recommendations are filed. (Meuleman, A)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/29/12: The hearing on SunTrust's motion for protective order is to be set for June 8, 2012, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom No. 27 before the undersigned. Plaintiff's opposition is to be filed by June 1. (Kaminski, H)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/22/2012. Defendants' 11 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED with prejudice in terms of Suntrust Banks, Inc. and DENIED as to Suntrust Mortgages, Inc.. A responsive pleading from Suntrust Mortgate is due 20 days from date of Order. (Marciel, M)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/18/11 ORDERING that Defendants have up to and including December 19, 2011 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gooden v. Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Philip Barilovits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Banks, Inc.
Represented By: Philip Barilovits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Gooden
Represented By: Eric James Buescher
Represented By: Niall P. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?