Ortega v. Unknown
Plaintiff: Lazarus D Ortega
Defendant: Unknown
Case Number: 2:2011cv02735
Filed: October 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/19/2013 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/23/13 GRANTING 20 Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee for this action within 14 days. Failure to pay the filing fee within 14 days will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Meuleman, A)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/20/12 ORDERING that within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition to defendants motion to revoke plaintiffs in forma pauperis status or a statement of non-opposition. (Dillon, M)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/22/12 ORDERING that 5 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED; Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with 30 days to file an amended complaint.(Dillon, M)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/24/2011 ORDERING that pltf's 2 application to proceed IFP is DISMISSED w/out prejudice; the clerk to send pltf a new ifp application; and pltf to submit, w/in 30 days, a completed application to proceed ifp. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortega v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lazarus D Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?