United States of America v. Real property located at 105 Three Hills Road, Hayfork, California, APN: 019-530-23-00 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real property located at 105 Three Hills Road, Hayfork, California, APN: 019-530-23-00, Real property located at 1150 Chrome Mine Road, Hayfork, California, APN: 019-530-24-00, Real property located at 241 Three Hills Road, Hayfork, California, APN: 019-530-26-00, Real property located at 1180 Chrome Mine Road, Hayfork, California, APN: 019-530-27-00 and Real property located at 1210 Chrome Mine Road, Hayfork, California, APN: 019-530-28-00
Claimant: Lapoe Smith and Katherine Renee Smith
Case Number: 2:2011cv02738
Filed: October 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 12/16/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION and ORDER 44 for further stay signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 10/1/2015. This matter is STAYED until 1/15/2016. For good cause shown, any party to Stipulation may seek relief from this stay prior to Jan1/15/2016. On or before that date, parties will advise Court whether further stay is necessary. (Marciel, M)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 07/06/15 ORDERING that this matter is STAYED until 10/16/15. For good cause shown, any party to the above stipulation may seek relief from this stay prior to 10/16/15. On or before that date, the parties will advise the Court whether a further stay is necessary. (Benson, A)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 4/3/15 ORDERING this matter is stayed until 7/6/15. For good cause shown, any party to the above stipulation may seek relief from this stay prior to 7/6/15. On or before that date, the parties will advise the Court whether a further stay is necessary. (Becknal, R)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 1/5/15 ORDERING that this matter is stayed until April 6, 2015. Any party to the this stipulation may seek relief from this stay prior to April 6, 2015. On or before that date, the parties will advise the Court whether a further stay is necessary. (Kastilahn, A)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 10/3/2014 STAYING this matter until 1/5/2015; ALLOWING any party to this stipulation to seek relief from this stay prior to 1/5/2015; ORDERING the parties to advise the court whether a further stay is necessary by 1/5/2015. (Michel, G)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 4/3/14 ORDERING that this matter is STAYED until 10/6/2014. On or before that date, the parties will advise the Court whether a further stay is necessary.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 10/1/13 ORDERING this matter is stayed until 4/4/14. On or before that date, the parties will advise the Court whether a further stay is necessary. (Becknal, R)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 4/8/13 VACATING pretrial conference and trial dates and SETTING Status Conference for 10/28/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. A joint status report shall be filed 14 days prior to the hearing. (Meuleman, A)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 12/11/12 ORDERING that the expert witness and rebuttal expert witness disclosure dates are continued to 2/12/13 and 2/28/13. (Manzer, C)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/27/12: Designation of Expert Witnesses continued to 12/20/2012. (Kaminski, H)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/29/12 ORDERING that the defendant properties be sold pursuant to the terms set forth above in the Stipulation for Interlocutory Sale; the net proceeds from the sale of the defendant pr operties shall be deposited into the U.S. Department of theTreasury Suspense Account, substituted as the res herein, and held pending further order of the Court; and the forfeiture action pending shall proceed against the substitute res in lieu of the defendant properties sold pursuant to this Stipulation. (Meuleman, A)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/19/11. (Manzer, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real property located at 105 Three Hills Road, Hayfork, California, APN: 019-530-23-00 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real property located at 105 Three Hills Road, Hayfork, California, APN: 019-530-23-00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real property located at 1150 Chrome Mine Road, Hayfork, California, APN: 019-530-24-00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real property located at 241 Three Hills Road, Hayfork, California, APN: 019-530-26-00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real property located at 1180 Chrome Mine Road, Hayfork, California, APN: 019-530-27-00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real property located at 1210 Chrome Mine Road, Hayfork, California, APN: 019-530-28-00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lapoe Smith
Represented By: David Martin Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Katherine Renee Smith
Represented By: David Martin Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?