Johnson v. Cate et al
Plaintiff: Paul Samuel Johnson
Defendant: Matthew Cate, Rick Hill, D. Viale, Kim Stocker, Mead and E. Ohyenelce
Case Number: 2:2011cv02749
Filed: October 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/6/2012 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 07/24/12 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/19/12 ordering plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. Plaintiff is granted 30 days within which to file an amended complaint identifying C. Mears as a defendant in this action. (Plummer, M)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/01/12 ordering the clerk of the court shall serve a copy of this order upon the Warden at California State Prison Solano. The Warden of California State Prison Solano shall permit plaintiff to examine his prisoner central file by no later than 06/10/12. The Warden shall inform the court by letter when plaintiff has been provided review of his file. (Plummer, M)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/21/12 ordering the clerk of the court shall serve a copy of this order upon the Warden of High Desert State Prison. The Warden of High Desert State Prison shall permit plaintiff to examine his prisoner central file by no later than 06/01/12. The Warden shall inform the court by letter when plaintiff has been provided review of his file. (Plummer, M)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/28/12 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 2/17/12 21 are ADOPTED in full; Defemdants Cate, Hill, Viale, Stocker and Ohyenelce are DISMISSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 27 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/19/12. (Plummer, M)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/22/12 DENYING 22 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 02/17/12 ORDERING service is appropriate for defendant Mead. The clerk of the court shall send plaintiff a USM-285 form, summons, instruction sheet and a copy of the 10/18/11 complaint to be completed and returned within 30 days. Plaintiff's 02/02/12 motion for the appointment of counsel 17 is denied. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants Cate, Hill, Viale, Stocker and Ohyenelce be dismissed. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 21 days.(Plummer, M)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/30/11 DENYING 10 MOTION to appoint counsel.(Dillon, M)
December 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/30/11 DENYING 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/05/11 ORDERING the clerk of court assign a district judge to this case. U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. randomly assigned to this case. Also, RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 21 days.(Plummer, M)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/27/2011 ORDERING pltf to submit, w/in 30 days, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed ifp, or the appropriate filing fee; and the clerk to send pltf a new ifp application.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Cate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Viale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Stocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Ohyenelce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Samuel Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?