Johnson v. Cheechov et al
Plaintiff: Scott N. Johnson
Defendant: Linda Cheechov, Benjamin F. Randall and Vera Roberta Randall
Case Number: 2:2011cv02776
Filed: October 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/17/12 GRANTING request for extension of time; dispositional documents due no later than 11/5/12. (Manzer, C)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/14/2012. Since counsel has file a 23 Notice of Settlement, Court now orders dispositional documents to be filed no later 30 days from effective date of Order. All Hearing dates set in matter are VACATED. (Marciel, M)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/30/12; A status conference was held in chambers on April 30, 2012. Upon conferring, plaintiff is granted 45 days to amend his complaint and serve new parties. A further status conference is set for September 24, 2012 at 1:30 p.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Matson, R)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/1/2012 GRANTING 14 Stipulation and Proposed Order filed by Scott N. Johnson, 11 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Linda Cheechov is SET ASIDE. (Waggoner, D)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/25/2012 GRANTING plaintiff's 12 Request for Dismissal. Defendants Benjamin F. Randall and Vera Roberta Randall are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. This case shall stay open with remaining defendant Linda Cheechov. (Marciel, M)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/9/2012 GRANTING 9 Request for Continuance of Status Conference; CONTINUING the Status Conference until 4/30/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Status Report due 14 days prior to the Status Conference. (Michel, G)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Cheechov et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Cheechov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin F. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vera Roberta Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott N. Johnson
Represented By: Scott N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?