Lintz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Deidra A. Lintz
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2011cv02837
Filed: October 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/7/19 ADOPTING 39 Findings and Recommendations, DENYING 33 Motion for Protective Order and 37 Motion to Stay. (Coll, A)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/10/2019 RECOMMENDING that 33 Amended Motion for Protective Order and 37 Motion to Stay be denied. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Huang, H)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/1/2017 RECOMMENDING: the 24 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted; 25 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment be denied; the matter remanded for further consideration; and the Clerk enter judgment in plaintiff's favor. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. Referred to District Judge William B. Shubb. (Donati, J)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/1/2016 ORDERING The clerk is directed to reopen this case. Plaintiff's request for entry of judgment is DENIED without prejudice. Within 60 days of the date of this order, the Commissioner shall file a certified administrative record. Within 45 days after being served with the administrative record, plaintiff shall file a motion for summary judgment and/or remand. Within 30 days after plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and/or rema nd is served, the Commissioner shall file an opposition or a statement of non-opposition to plaintiff's motion, as well as any cross-motions. Within 21 days thereafter, plaintiff shall file an opposition or a statement of non-opposition to any cross-motions filed by the Commissioner, as well as any reply in support of plaintiffs motion for summary judgment and/or remand. CASE REOPENED(Reader, L)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER and FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/6/2012 ORDERING the Clerk to randomly assign a United States District Judge to the case; RECOMMENDING that the 10 Defendant's Motion to Remand be granted and that the matter be remanded for further proceedings, including a de novo hearing. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 14 days. (Michel, G)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/2/2012 ORDERING 10 On or before 6/1/2012, plaintiff shall file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to defendant's motion to remand; within 21 days of plaintiff's filing, defendant may file a reply brief; and thereafter the matter will stand submitted for decision.(Reader, L)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/31/2011 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Clerk is directed to serve Judge Brennan's Scheduling Order in Social Security cases. Within 14 days from date of Order, plaintiff shall submit to US Marshal an original and 5 copies of completed Summons, 5 copies of Complaint and 5 copies of Scheduling Order. A Statement shall be file with Court that said documents have been submitted to US Marshal. (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lintz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deidra A. Lintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?