Dunmore v. Dunmore
Plaintiff: Steven G. Dunmore
Defendant: Canyon Falls Group, LLC, Sidney D. Dunmore, GSJ Company, LP, Chady Evette Dunmore, Claude F. Parcon, Kelly Houghton, Mary R. Neilson, Shelli R. Donald, L. Tremain, Financial Title Company, Inc., Sidney B. Dunmore, Kathleen Dunmore, Maximillion Capital, LLC, Anthony J. Garcia, GSJ Company, LLC and Jeremy A. Dunmore
Case Number: 2:2011cv02867
Filed: October 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/4/14 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 10/9/13 156 are ADOPTED in full; Jeremy A. Dunmore's 8/2/13, MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, 138 is GRANTED IN PART; Pla intiff's RICO claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; The Court DECLINES to excercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's remaining state law claims; This matter is REMANDED to the Placer County Superior Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; and the Clerk is directed to close the case. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED; (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/8/2013 RECOMMENDING that Jeremy A. Dunmore's 138 motion for judgment on the pleadings be granted in part. Plaintiff's RICO claims be dismissed without leave to amend. The court decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's remaining state law claims. This matter be remanded to the Placer County Superior Court for lack of federal jurisdiction. Motion referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/24/2013 DENYING defendant's 6/4/2013 124 Motion to Compel and plaintiff's 135 Cross-Motion to Strike. (Marciel, M)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/6/2013. Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference is SET for 6/12/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC). (Marciel, M)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/12/2013 ORDERING that the 109 Findings and Recommendations are ADOPTED IN FULL. Plaintiff's 67 Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff's motion to strike is DENIED as to Sidney B.'s denials for lack of personal knowledge. The motion is GRANTED in all other respects. Defendants are GRANTED leave to amend their counterclaims. (Zignago, K.)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/7/13 ORDERING that the parties are granted until 4/2/2013 to file a statement in accordance with Local Rule 270. If the parties do not file a stipulation by that date, the court will set a scheduling conference in this case. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/7/2013 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 67 motion to dismiss and/or strike be granted in part; Plaintiff's motion to strike should be denied as to Sidney B.'s denials for lack of personal knowledge. The motion should be granted in all other respects. Defendant be granted leave to amend his counterclaims. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these F & R's. (Reader, L)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/24/2012 ORDERING that the 10/4/2012 hearing on the 67 motion to strike and dismiss, filed 8/29/2012, is VACATED. The motion is submitted on the record. (Zignago, K.)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/20/12 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION for leave to serve Defendants Jeremy A. Dunmore, Sidney D. Dunmore, Chady Evette Dunmore, Kelly Houghton, Mary Neilson, Shelli R. Donald, Kathleen L . Dunmore, GSJ Company, LLC; GSJ Company, LP; Maximillion Capital, LLC; Acquisition Venice, LP; Acquisition Phoenix-Miami, LP; Acquisition West Hatcher, LP; and Amberwood Investments, LLC, with process by publication, filed 7/6/12 44 is GRANTED; Defendants Jeremy A. Dunmore, Sidney D. Dunmore, Chady Evette Dunmore, Kelly Houghton, Mary Neilson, Shelli R. Donald, Kathleen L. Dunmore, GSJ Company, LLC; GSJ Company, LP; Maximillion Capital, LLC; Acquisition Venice, LP; Acquisition Phoenix-M iami, LP; Acquisition West Hatcher, LP; and Amberwood Investments, LLC, shall be served by publication. Within seven (7) days of this order, plaintiff shall make arrangements to publish summons for defendants Jeremy A. Dunmore, Sidney D. Dunmore, Chady Evette Dunmore, Kelly Houghton, Mary Neilson, Shelli R. Donald, Kathleen L. Dunmore, GSJ Company, LLC; GSJ Company, LP; Maximillion Capital, LLC; Acquisition Venice, LP; Acquisition Phoenix-Miami, LP; Acquisition West Hatcher, LP; and Amber wood Investments, LLC, in the Sacramento Bee newspaper once a week for four successive weeks, and shall file a declaration indicating when the notices will be published. Service will be deemed complete as provided in Cal. Govt Code § 6064. Wi thin seven (7) days of this order, plaintiff shall send copies of the summons, operative complaint, and this order for publication to defendants Jeremy A. Dunmore, Sidney D. Dunmore, Chady Evette Dunmore, Kelly Houghton, Mary Neilson, Shelli R. Do nald, Kathleen L. Dunmore, GSJ Company, LLC; GSJ Company, LP; Maximillion Capital, LLC; Acquisition Venice, LP; Acquisition Phoenix-Miami, LP; Acquisition West Hatcher, LP; and Amberwood Investments, LLC, via mail at all of their known mailing add resses. Furthermore, a copy of the summons, the second amended complaint, and this order for publication shall be forthwith sent to defendants Jeremy A. Dunmore, Sidney D. Dunmore, Chady Evette Dunmore, Kelly Houghton, Mary Neilson, Shelli R. Donal d, Kathleen L. Dunmore, GSJ Company, LLC; GSJ Company, LP; Maximillion Capital, LLC; Acquisition Venice, LP; Acquisition Phoenix-Miami, LP; Acquisition West Hatcher, LP; and Amberwood Investments, LLC, at any additional addresses ascertained before expiration of the time prescribed for publication of the summons. Pursuant to Plaintiff's request, filed 8/14/12 65 defendant Financial Title Company is DISMISSED with prejudice from this Action. (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/8/12: Defendant Canyon Falls Group LLC's proposed substitution of attorney 47 is stricken. Defendant Garcia's proposed substitution of attorney 48 is approved. Defendant Garcia is substituted in pro per. Defendant Tremain's proposed substitution of attorney 54 is approved. Defendant Tremain is substituted in pro per. (Kaminski, H)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/10/12 DENYING Defendants 34 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike and DENYING plaintiffs 38 Motion to Strike as unnecessary; moving defendants shall file an answer within 28 days. (Manzer, C)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/18/2012 ORDERING the hearing on 34 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike, and 38 Motion to Strike is VACATED; Motions are SUBMITTED on the record; within 28 days of this order, plaintiff shall file a renewed motion to serve by publication as intructed herein. (Waggoner, D)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/10/2012 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 27 ex parte application for order allowing service of summons by publication and by other means, filed 4/16/2012, is DENIED without prejudice. (Zignago, K.)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 04/03/12 ORDERING that plaintiff's 23 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED; all provisions of the Magistrate Judge's 19 Order remain in effect, except that plaintiff's deadline for filing an amended complaint is EXTENDED to 10 days following the date this Order is filed. (Benson, A.)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/6/12 DENYING 21 Motion to Recuse. (Meuleman, A)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/13/2012 ORDERING that Defendant Sidney B. Dunmore's 9 motion to dismiss and/or to strike, filed 12/8/2011, is VACATED without prejudice from the court's 1/19/2012 calendar. Plaintif f's amended complaint is dismissed. Plaintiff is GRANTED twenty-eight days from the date of service of this order to file and serve a second amended complaint that complies with the requirements of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Lo cal Rules, and does not exceed fifty pages; the second amended complaint must bear the docket number assigned this case and must be labeled "Second Amended Complaint;" plaintiff must file an original and two copies of the second amended com plaint; failure to file a second amended complaint in accordance with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. Defendants shall file a responsive pleading within twenty-eight days of being served with the second amended complaint. (Zignago, K.)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/10/12; Defendant Dunmore's motion to dismiss and to strike presently is calendared for hearing on January 19, 2012. The notice of removal has attached only five pages of a first amended co mplaint alleged to be 66 or 84 pages long. (Mot. at 3.) The court cannot determine if a hearing is necessary without reviewing the entirety of the first amended complaint. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that: Defendant Dunsmore shall file a copy of the complete first amended complaint forthwith. Upon review of this pleading the court will determine whether the January 19, 2012 hearing is necessary.(Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunmore v. Dunmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canyon Falls Group, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer N. Wenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney D. Dunmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSJ Company, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chady Evette Dunmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claude F. Parcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary R. Neilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelli R. Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Tremain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Title Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney B. Dunmore
Represented By: Gary William Gorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Dunmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maximillion Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Garcia
Represented By: Jennifer N. Wenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSJ Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy A. Dunmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven G. Dunmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?