January 25, 2013 |
Filing
50
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/24/13 ORDERING that by and between Plaintiff Ken Montgomery and Respondent Sgt. Brooks that the plaintiff voluntarily dismisses this action without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Dillon, M)
|
November 29, 2012 |
Filing
40
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/28/2012 GRANTING the 39 stipulation and proposed order; Discovery is continued to 2/26/2013; Pretrial Motions shall be filed by 5/9/2013; the remainder of the 8/22/12 scheduling order remains in effect. (Yin, K)
|
July 17, 2012 |
Filing
36
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/16/12 ORDERING that defendant Brooks respond to the amended complaint within 21 days of the filing date of this order, if he is not otherwise dismissed by plaintiff.(Dillon, M)
|
July 12, 2012 |
Filing
33
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 07/11/12 ordering that within 7 days of the filing date of this order, defendants Shaw and McDonald respond to the court's 04/18/12 order regarding consent or request for reassignment 18 . (Plummer, M)
|
June 29, 2012 |
Filing
30
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/28/12 ORDERING that this action remains stayed against defendant Officer Parker so long as the automatic stay is in place in defendant Parkers chapter 7 case, see 11 U.S.C. § 362(c)(2); t he action shall proceed against the remaining defendants; the order to show cause, filed May 11, 2012, is discharged; the hearing scheduled for July 19, 2012 shall proceed as scheduled, at which time the court shall consider the motions to dismiss fi led by defendants on April 27, 2012 19 and June 6, 2012 29 ; and Plaintiffs response(s) to the defendants motions to dismiss remains due under the scheduled established by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this courts Local Rules. (Dillon, M)
|
May 11, 2012 |
Filing
21
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/11/12 ORDERING that this action is stayed against defendant Officer Parker. The hearing on defendants motion to dismiss, currently scheduled for June 7, 2012, is VACATED. Within 14 days of the filing date of this order, the non-debtor parties shall show cause why this action should not be stayed against all remaining defendants. (Dillon, M)
|
April 19, 2012 |
Filing
16
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 04/19/12 ordering the hearing scheduled for 04/26/12 is vacated. Defendants' motion to dismiss filed 03/14/12 12 is vacated. The clerk of the court shall issue and send to plaintiff 7 su mmons for defendants Brooks, Parker, Shaw, McDonald, High Desert State Prison, the California Department of Corrections and the State of California. The clerk shall also send plaintiff 8 copies of the form "Consent to Proceed Before United Stat es Magistrate Judge" with this order. Plaintiff shall complete service of process on the defendants within 60 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order and a copy of the form "Consent to Proceed Before M agistrate Judge" on each defendant at the time the summons and complaint are served. Within 21 days after service of the summons, defendants shall file either 1) a motion to dismiss the first amended complaint; or 2. an answer to the first amended complaint. (A copy of this order, 7 issued summons and 8 copies of the consent to proceed before magistrate judge form sent to the attorney for plaintiff by mail). (Plummer, M)
|
February 8, 2012 |
Filing
7
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 02/07/12 ordering the clerk of the court is directed to issue and send plaintiff 2 summonses, for defendants Sergeant Brooks and Correctional Officer Parker. The clerk shall also send plaintiff 3 copies of the form "Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge with this order. Plaintiff shall complete service of process on defendants within 60 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of the form "Consent to P roceed Before United States Magistrate Judge" on each defendant at the time the summons and complaint are served. Plaintiff's status report shall be filed within 90 days from the date of this order. Defendants' status report shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. (A copy of this order, 2 summonses and 3 copies of the consent to proceed before magistrate judge form mailed to the attorney for plaintiff at the address of record)(Plummer, M)
|