Donalson v. Fakhoury
Petitioner: Joseph R. Donalson
Respondent: Aref Fakhoury
Case Number: 2:2011cv03429
Filed: December 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Bernardino
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 07/21/14 recommending that the petition for writ of habeas corpus be denied. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/26/2014 ORDERING that respondent shall make the necessary arrangements, pursuant to this court's Order filed June 25, 2014 (ECF No. 25 ) to provide the court with unredacted trans cripts of all Marsden proceedings conducted in the course of petitioner's trial and omitted from the lodged trial transcripts, including the proceedings of May 25, 2006; August 11, 2006; August 30, 2006; August 31, 2006; September 12, 2006; September 13, 2006; October 27, 2006; November 29, 2006; and March 2,2007.(Yin, K)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/23/14 ordering that respondent is hereby ordered to submit the missing portion of the transcript for lodging under seal, adn to file a request to Seal pursuant to Local Rule 141, within 7 days. Respondent shall also provide a courtesy copy of Marsden hearing transcript to the chambers of the undersigned within 7 days. (Plummer, M)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 12/30/2011 ORDERING petitioner to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee; and the clerk to send petitioner an ifp form.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donalson v. Fakhoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph R. Donalson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Aref Fakhoury
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Firestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?