Morgan Hill Concerned Parents Association v. California Department of Education

Plaintiff: Morgan Hill Concerned Parents Association
Defendant: California Department of Education
Case Number: 2:2011cv03471
Filed: December 29, 2011
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2018 373 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/22/18 ORDERING that Defendants shall forward the amount of $12,250 ($13,300-$1,050) to the Clerk of the Court within 30 days of this order. Upon receipt of the funds, the Clerk of the Court shall disburse the amount of $12,250 to Kivu Consulting Inc. at the following address: Kivu Consulting, Inc. Attn: Winston Krone, Esq. 44 Montgomery Street Suite 700 San Francisco, CA 94104. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the Court. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 2, 2018 372 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/1/18: The court ORDERS the Clerk of Court to destroy the objections beginning no sooner than 14 days after the filed date of this order. (Kaminski, H)
June 6, 2018 368 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/6/2018 TRANSFERRING this case to the Northern District of California. Immediately upon this matter being assigned a case number in the Northern District of California, the parties are INSTRUCTED to promptly file a Notice of Related Cases identifying this case and Emma C as related. Within 14 days, the Special Master will submit an invoice for any outstanding services rendered. Also within 14 days, the parties shall SHOW CAUSE, why the FERPA objections received should not be destroyed. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
June 5, 2018 367 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/5/2018 ORDERING that until the Court provides otherwise, the parties are to observe the procedures set out in the Eastern District of Californias Local Rule 230 when filing discovery motions in this action. (Hunt, G)
March 6, 2018 349 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/5/2018 ORDERING the parties to jointly file a status statement 7 days prior to the status conference and DENYING 346 Motion to Stay Discovery as MOOT. (Fabillaran, J)
November 21, 2017 339 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/21/2017. Parties shall show cause in writing, if any they have, why this action should not be stayed or, in the alternative, why this action should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (Andrews, P)
September 19, 2017 333 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/18/17, GRANTING Plaintiffs' 324 motion for discovery and to compel the production of documents withheld under the deliberative process privilege. Defendant's claims of deliberative p rocess privilege are OVERRULED and defendant is ORDERED to turn over all documents withheld solely on the basis of deliberative process privilege within 10 days of this order. Defendant is ORDERED to pay plaintiff $38,622.50 in attorney's fees within 10 days of the order. (Kastilahn, A)
August 10, 2017 325 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/10/17, ORDERING that Plaintiffs' request to seal the Annotated Privilege Log is:GRANTED in its entirety and shall be filed under seal pursuant to Local Rule 141(e)(2)(1). (Kastilahn, A)
July 27, 2017 318 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/26/2017 VACATING 299 Order requiring CDE to pay $10,937.50 in fees to the Special Master. The parties are directed to the 317 order detailing the newly instituted process for adjudicating the issue of Special Master fees. (Washington, S)
July 25, 2017 317 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 07/25/17 ORDERING that the court VACATES its 302 order requiring CDE to pay $2362.50 for those services. The Special Master is DIRECTED to submit a renewed preliminary invoice, as required by step (1) in the process outlined in this order, for the $2362.50 for services rendered between 11/11/15-12/22/15. After he does so, the remaining steps and deadlines outlined in the order will apply: the parties will have 14 days to file any objections; the Special Master will have 30 days to file a final invoice and a response to any objections; and the parties will have 14 days to file any objections to the final invoice. All filings should be made under seal as outlined in the order. (Benson, A)
July 21, 2017 316 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/20/2017 DENYING 236 , 239 , 240 Requests for Reconsideration. (Michel, G.)
June 15, 2017 313 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/14/2017 ORDERING CDE's Motion for Judgment on the pleadings is DENIED. Plaintiffs' motion for sanctions under Rule 16 is DENIED. This order resolves ECF Nos. 172 and 206 . (Reader, L)
June 9, 2017 312 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/08/17 ORDERING that the ruling on 304 Motion for Mandatory Fee and Costs Award is as follows: Plaintiffs are awarded $97,040.00, based on plaintiffs' reasonable hours expended in bringing their motion to compel (263.83 attorney hours and 62.66 paralegal hours) multiplied by the appropriate Sacramento attorney and paralegal rates ($350 for attorneys and $75 for paralegals). (Benson, A)
May 12, 2017 306 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/11/2017 ORDERING that defendants' 303 Request for Reconsideration is DENIED without prejudice to its renewal, as appropriate, in accordance with the provisions of this order. (Zignago, K.)
April 19, 2017 302 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/19/17 ORDERING that Defendants shall promptly forward the amount of $2362.50 to the Clerk of the Court; Upon receipt of the funds, the Clerk of the Court shall disburse the amoun t of $2362.50 to the Special Master at the following address:Kivu Consulting, Inc., Attn: Winston Krone, Esq., 44 Montgomery Street, Suite 700, San Francisco, CA 94104; The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the Court; The order docketed as ECF No. 301 is VACATED. (cc Financial Department) (Becknal, R)
April 18, 2017 300 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/18/17 ORDERING that plaintiffs' 288 request for reconsideration of the magistrate judge's 2/2/2017 order is DENIED. Regarding the parties' prior requests for reconsideratio n of the magistrate judge's 8/17/2016 order, see ECF Nos. 236 , 239 , 240 , the court will address these requests separately with one exception here. Plaintiffs' prior request asked for reconsideration of the magistrate judge' s adoption of Sacramento rates in calculating sanctions at that time under Rule 37(a)(5). ECF No. 236 at 6, 2223. The court finds the magistrate judge's determination in that 2016 order was not clearly erroneous or contrary to law, and so DENIES that portion of plaintiffs' request. The court will fully resolve the remaining portions of ECF No. 236 in an order to follow. (Kastilahn, A)
April 14, 2017 298 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/14/17 ORDERING that the 4/19/17 hearing of plaintiff's 291 motion for attorneys' fees is VACATED. Plaintiff shall re-notice the motion for hearing before the undersigned within 30 days of the resolution of plaintiff's motions for reconsideration. (ECF Nos. 236 & 288 .) (Kastilahn, A)
February 2, 2017 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/1/17 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' motion to compel 273 is GRANTED, as follows: Within 30 days, CDE shall produce all ESI in native format with all metadata attached. Any ESI that has alr eady been produced in another format shall be reproduced in native format with all metadata attached, within 30 days; and Within 30 days, CDE shall produce (i) all documents withheld under its privilege logs, or (ii) legally sufficient privilege logs to cover those documents; Plaintiffs' request for attorneys' fees 273 is DENIED without prejudice to its renewal, within 30 days, using Sacramento rates. Defendants' motion for a protective order 272 is DENIED, as follows: Defendant's request for a protective order is DENIED; and Defendant's request for attorneys' fees is DENIED. (Becknal, R)
November 7, 2016 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/4/16 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel (ECF No. 265 ), is VACATED without prejudice to renewal pursuant to Local Rule 230. Plaintiffs shall not renew the motion until they have met and conferred with defendants re the privilege log issues discussed at the discovery conference, and plaintiffs determine whether or not to bring a motion to compel production of discovery withheld pursuant to claims(s) of privilege; All moti ons relating to a particular production or set of productions shall be brought together in a single motion if possible, shall comply with Local Rule 230 (without regard to Local Rule 251), and shall be noticed for the same hearing date; The production stay imposed by ECF No. 266 is CONFIRMED, and will continue until ordered otherwise. (Becknal, R)
October 31, 2016 266 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/31/2016 ORDERING that the production due on 11/4/2016 is temporarily STAYED. The parties shall be prepared to discuss the matter at the 11/4/2016 discovery conference. (Zignago, K.)
October 24, 2016 264 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/21/2016 ORDERING that this matter is set for a further Discovery Status Conference on 11/4/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Zignago, K.)
September 12, 2016 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/12/16 ORDERING that the Court approves the Special Master's request to meet with plaintiff's counsel and her e-Discovery consultant prior to the upcoming joint meeting of the parties with the Special Master. Defendant's objection is noted and overruled. (Kastilahn, A)
August 29, 2016 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/29/16 ORDERING Plaintiffs shall invite defendant's counsel and expert(s) to attend the meeting plaintiffs wishes to have with the Special Master regarding "load files"; Within 45 days from the date of this order, defendant shall revise its June 17, 2016 and July 15, 2016 productions of emails, to include a metadata field entitled "Search Results," as described in the August 15, 2016 cover letter. Revised cover lett ers should be included and provided to the court; Within 45 days of the date of this order, defendant shall revise all the email privilege logs. The privilege logs must comply with Rule 26(b)(5)(A). Plaintiffs shall promptly notify the court when i ts secure environment has been certified by the Special Master. Upon receipt of the certification, the undersigned will provide an opportunity for defendant to review the certification and file confidential objections, if any, while preserving the confidentiality of the certification and the underlying environment. (Becknal, R)
August 17, 2016 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/17/2016 DENYING 195 Motion for Protective Order; AWARDING the plaintiffs $10,425.00 in attorneys' fees under F.R.Cv.P. Rules 26(c)(3) and 37(a)(5)(A); GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART 196 Motion to Compel; AWARDING the defendant $6,800.00 in attorneys' fees under F.R.Cv.P. Rule 37(a)(5)(C); GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART 206 Motion for Sanctions; AWARDING the plaintiffs $77,814.48 in attorneys' fees under F.R.Cv.P. Rule 37(a)(5)(C) only; DENYING 216 Motion to Strike; REFERRING 206 Motion for Sanctions under Rule 16 (ECF No. 206-1 at 22) to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, wihout recommendation. (Michel, G.)
August 1, 2016 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/1/16 ORDERING that CDE's 211 reply brief is STRICKEN. The CDE may file an amended reply that complies with this court's standing order within seven days. (Kastilahn, A)
July 18, 2016 209 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/18/2016 DENYING 207 Request for Leave to File Invoices In Camera. (Zignago, K.)
June 3, 2016 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/3/2016 re: Discovery Deadlines. (Donati, J)
May 12, 2016 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/12/16 ORDERING Defendants shall file, no later than 14 days from the date of this order, a letter (not to exceed two pages in length), stating (a) the date they will complete the initial email s earches using their own seven search terms, as referred to in their Discovery Status Report, ECF No. 176 at 2, (b) when the emails will be produced to plaintiffs, and (c) the reasons that production cannot be accomplished sooner; Plaintiffs may file a response, not to exceed two pages in length, no later than two days later; the court will issue a scheduling order upon consideration of the submissions ordered herein. (Becknal, R)
April 14, 2016 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/13/2016 CONTINUING the hearing on 172 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings to 7/29/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Michel, G.)
April 5, 2016 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/5/2016 SETTING a Discovery Status Conference for 5/11/2016 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire; ORDERING counsel for all parties to be present at said conference ; CAUTIONING all parties that telephone participation will not be permitted; ORDERING that no party file a discovery motion until after the Discovery Status Conference; ORDERING the parties to serve and file separate Status Reports by 4/27/2016 at 04:30 PM. (Michel, G.)
April 4, 2016 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 04/04/16 ORDERING that the Discovery Protocol remains in force, and will not be modified except by an order of court after a showing of good cause; counsel shall work toward the completion of disc overy in this case in good faith; the parties and the Special Master will continue to work toward the production of email and network files as specified in the Discovery Protocol. In all other respects, the court has determined the parties will not b enefit from further direct coordination with the Special Master. The parties are directed to restrict their communications with him to discussions about the production of email and network files. The Special Master will continue to fulfill his role, but at this point by assisting as an independent technical expert, including by assisting the assigned Magistrate Judge in any discovery matter she deems requires his assistance. Any end runs around the orderly procedure for reimbursement of the Spec ial Master shall be addressed through appropriate sanctions. To clarify the Special Master's role as a surrogate of the court, the procedure for payment of his reasonable expenses is hereby modified to provide that upon approval of his expenses by the Magistrate Judge, the party owing payment shall promptly forward the funds due to the Clerk of the Court, who is directed to establish an account for this purpose. The Clerk will then disburse the funds to the Special Master as approved by the Magistrate Judge. The court expressly reserves the right to further modify the procedure for payment of the Special Master if future circumstances call for such modification (cc: Financial). (Benson, A)
March 1, 2016 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/1/2016 MODIFYING the E-discovery Protocol previously approved by the court on 11/3/2015 with respect to the CALPADS database to remove Option 1 and provide that Option 2 will apply to any discov ery with respect to that database. The Special Master is DIRECTED to meet with the parties within 30 days and review the method of implementation of CALPADS Option 2. The Special Master shall review with the parties any deadlines previously set and w ithin 14 days propose extended deadlines for any tasks that require completion at this time. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to preserve objections in sealed boxes store in a secure room until further order of the court. Objections will be lodged under seal instead of filed as previously ordered. (Donati, J)
February 22, 2016 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 02/21/16 ORDERING that a Status Conference is SET for 2/26/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Parties shall file separate statements which may be in the form of sworn declarations with attachments by 02/24/16. (Benson, A)
January 25, 2016 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/22/16 ORDERING that payment of the Special Master commencing with his invoice dated January 9, 2016 and going forward shall be made in accordance with the provisions of this order. (Becknal, R)
January 14, 2016 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/13/2016 ORDERING that within 14 days of the date this order is filed the California Department of Education shall remit $23,678.88 to Special Master Winston Krone. (Reader, L)
January 5, 2016 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/4/16 ORDERING that Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration ECF No. 142 , is GRANTED in part, inasmuch as Defendant's Motion will be DENIED for its violation of Local Rule 251, rather than Local Rule 230; Defendant's Motion for Protective Order ECF No. 138 , is DENIED without prejudice to its renewal in proper form under Local Rule 251, and the 1/13/16, 2016 hearing on the motion is VACATED; Defendant's Motion for Protective Order ECF No. 138 is ordered STRICKEN from the docket. Plaintiff's Motion To Compel ECF No. 129 , is unaffected by this order, and remains scheduled for hearing on 1/13/16. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 18, 2015 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Federal Rules of Evidence signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/17/15. (Kaminski, H)
December 2, 2015 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/1/2015 GRANTING defendant's 130 Motion for 60-Day Extension of Time. The hearing on plaintiff's 129 Motion to Compel Further Responses is CONTINUED to 1/13/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtr oom 26 (AC). Parties shall file a Joint Statement fully complying with Local Rule 251 (including its meet and confer requirements), no later than 1/6/2016 at 3:30 PM. Going forward, no person or party shall file a Discovery Motion under Rules 26 - 37 and 45, until it has first met and conferred with affected person or party. The Motion shall contain a certification that movant has in good faith conferred or attempted to confer with other affected persons or parties in an effort to resolve dispute without court action. (Marciel, M)
December 1, 2015 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/1/2015 ORDERING by previous order, 116 the court appointed Winston Krone discovery Special Master in this case; the court also concluded the CA Department of Education should bear the responsibility f or special master's fees at this stage of the case; the court clarified it would issue a separate order on the method of payment; THIS IS THAT SEPARATE ORDER the itemized invoice will be forwarded by email to both parties; No later than 14 days after the date this order is filed, the CDE may object to any item in that invoice in an in camera filing submitted to kjmorders@caed.uscourts.gov and served on plaintiffs' counsel; the court may then request a response from plaintiffs' counsel if necessary. (cc: Invoice to Winston Krone, CDE)(Reader, L)
September 14, 2015 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/14/15 (nunc pro tunc to 09/11/15) ORDERING that the deadline for the jointly agreed proposed discovery protocoal is EXTENDED until 09/18/15. (Benson, A)
May 15, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/14/15. A further Status Conference is set for 6/25/2015 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Joint Status Report with Joint Proposal(s) defining the Special Master's role due 7 days prior to conference. (Manzer, C)
March 30, 2015 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/30/2015 FINDING that it's appropriate to appoint a special master for the limited purpose, at least initially, of assisting the parties in developing methods of propounding and responding to request s for electronic discovery materials; DIRECTING the parties to submit at least three (3) days prior to the Status Conference set for 4/30/2015, a joint report identifying at least three (3) and no more than five (5) candidates for the position of special master. (Michel, G.)
February 10, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/9/2015 ORDERING the parties to meet in person at least twice in the next twenty-one (21) days to develop a new joint report; ORDERING that said report be filed within thirty (30) days; ORDERING the parties to refrain from filing or proceeding on any discovery motions before the magistrate judge until this court approves a new fact discovery schedule. (Michel, G.)
December 17, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/16/14: Plaintiffs' motion to compel production of documents (ECF 64) is denied without prejudice. Plaintiffs' motion to continue the discovery cut-off date (ECF 77) is DENIED as moot. (Kaminski, H)
October 16, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/15/14 ORDERING that the hearing on Plaintiffs' 64 Motion to Compel Defendant to Produce Further Documents is CONTINUED to 11/19/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Kastilahn, A)
May 5, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/2/14 re 58 . The Parties in this matter shall be bound by the terms of this Stipulated Protective Order. (Meuleman, A)
May 1, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 52 Order to Show Cause signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/30/2014 SANCTIONING each party $250.00; ORDERING that counsel not relay this cost to their clients; ORDERING counsel to remit payment and to file a declaration so stating within seven (7) days; WARNING counsel that a failure to comply will result in additional sanctions. (Michel, G)
April 2, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/2/2014 ORDERING counsel for plaintiffs and defendant to SHOW CAUSE why they should not be monetarily sanctioned, in the amount of $250.00 each, for failure to meet and confer about the protective order. Counsel for each party shall respond by filing a sworn declaration within seven days of the date of this order. All other provisions of the court's order of 2/20/2014, remain in effect. (Zignago, K.)
February 20, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/20/14 Confirming Schedule Outlined at Status Conference. (Meuleman, A)
August 1, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/31/13 ORDERING that the Court DECLINES to reassign Everett H under Local Rule 123(c).(Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 24, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/23/2013 ORDERING that Defendants shall have until 8/22/2013, to seek joinder of the U.S. Department of Education and local education agencies. A further status conference is set for 8/22/2013. The parties shall file a joint status report by close of business on 8/16/2013. (Zignago, K.)
March 29, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/29/2013 ORDERING 13 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. (Waggoner, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan Hill Concerned Parents Association v. California Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Hill Concerned Parents Association
Represented By: Rony Sagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?