Darrin v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Jude Darrin
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2012cv00228
Filed: January 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STIPULATION and ORDER 138 for dismissal signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/16/2015. Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC is DISMISSED with prejudice and each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. This action is TERMINATED. (Marciel, M)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/17/2015 DISMISSING Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. with prejudice; ORDERING that the plaintiff and Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Michel, G.)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/8/15 ORDERING that pursuant to the parties' signed stipulation 131 , all claims of Plaintiff Jude Darrin, individually, and on behalf of the general public, against Defend ant Trans Union, LLC are DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff Jude Darri, individually, and on behalf of the general public, and Defendant Trans Union, LLC shall each bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Trans Union, LLC terminated. (Meuleman, A)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/20/2015 ORDERING that the Settlement Conference before Judge Claire is CONTINUED to 6/4/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC). (Zignago, K.)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on September 3, 2014 re 108 . The March 28, 2013 Scheduling Order 60 is set aside, and all deadlines set therein are vacated. A Rule 16 conference will be scheduled within 60 days of the filing of the CRAs responses to Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint. (Rivas, A)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/22/14. The Clerk is directed to reactivate this matter as an open file. Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint is deemed filed as of 6/3/14. Defendants shall file a responsive pleading to said Third Amended Complaint not later than twenty (20) days following the date this Order is electronically filed.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/13/2014 ORDERING 83 Plaintiff's Rule 60(b) Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED in PART and GRANTED in PART; Plaintiffs Sec 1681e(b) claims against the CRA Defendants is DENIED; these claims remain DISMISSED without leave to amend; Plaintiff's Sec 1681i claims against the CRA Defendants is GRANTED; these claims remain DISMISSED, but Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to amend these claims as to the CRA Defendants; an am ended complaint may be filed within 20 days from the date of this memorandum and order; If no amended complaint is filed within said 20 day period, these claims shall be dismissed without leave to amend without further notice to the parties. (Reader, L)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/17/14: Defendant Bank of America, N.A. terminated. CASE CLOSED. (Kaminski, H)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER 73 for extension of time signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/14/2013. Disclosure of Expert Witnesses is moved to 3/28/2014 and Discovery is now due by 1/31/2014. (Marciel, M)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER TO EXTEND THE DISCOVERY CUT OFF DATES signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/12/13. The last date for Non-Expert Discovery is 1/31/2014 and the last date for Disclosure of Expert Witnesses is 3/28/2014. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/3/13. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION and ORDER 66 extending number of permitted interrogatories signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/14/2013. The number of interrogatories permitted in this matter shall be increae to 50. (Marciel, M)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION and 64 PROTECTIVE ORDER between non-party Equifax Information Services, Jude Darrin, and Bank of America signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/9/2013 regarding confidential information produced by Equifax. (Marciel, M)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/11/2013. (Zignago, K.)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/6/2013 ORDERING 25 Bank of America's motion to dismiss is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART, without leave to amend; Bank of America's motion to dismiss plaintiff&# 039;s RFDCPA, CCLRA and Conversition actions is GRANTED with prejudice; Bank of America's motion to dismiss plaintiff's FRCA, CCRAA, UCL defamation actions is DENIED; the Court ORDERS Bank of America to answer plaintiff's complaint wit hin 21 days of this order; GRANTING 41 , 48 and 53 Trans Union, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC and Experian Information Solutions Inc., motions with prejudice, the Court need not rule on its Motion for Judgment as it is now MOOT; the Clerk of the Court is directed to CLOSE this case as to Trans Union, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC and Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Reader, L)(Reader, L)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 1/8/13 GRANTING defendant's 44 request to appear telephonically at the Motion to Dismiss hearing scheduled for January 10, 2013 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 7. (Kastilahn, A)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/19/2012 GRANTING 16 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's 15 First Amended Complaint WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; ORDERING Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within 20 days. (Michel, G)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/6/12 ORDERING that Bank of America's Motion to Dismiss 7 is GRANTED with leave to amend. Darrin shall file any amended complaint within twenty (20) days of the date this order is filed electronically. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darrin v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jude Darrin
Represented By: Linda Dianne Deos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Patricia Laurel Victory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?