August 5, 2015 |
Filing
60
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/4/2015 DENYING 59 Motion to Reopen Case. (Michel, G.)
|
September 25, 2014 |
Filing
57
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/24/14: This action is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall close the file. (Kaminski, H)
|
May 20, 2014 |
Filing
53
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/19/2014 RECOMMENDING that defendant's 46 motion for summary judgment be granted in part and denied in part as to the claims stated in these findings and recommendations; and plaintiff's 50 cross-motion for summary judgment be denied. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 21 days. (Yin, K)
|
January 9, 2014 |
Filing
49
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/8/14 ORDERING that Plaintiffs Motion to Compel further production of documents from defendant CDCR 34 is granted in part and denied in part as follows: a) Denied as to RFP Nos. 1-6 based on mootness; b) Granted as to RFP No. 9. Defendant is ordered to provide a copy of plaintiffs medical records from July 2008 within 30 days from the date of this order. Plaintiffs time to file an opposition to defendants motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 46 ) is extended to thirty days from the date of receipt of his medical records from defendant. Defendants reply, if any, shall be filed within seven days thereafter.(Dillon, M)
|
October 29, 2013 |
Filing
38
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/28/13 ordering that defendant is granted 12 days, to and including, 11/06/13, to file a motion for summary judgment. (Plummer, M)
|
July 19, 2013 |
Filing
33
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/18/13 ORDERING that plaintiffs motion to extend discovery 18 is DENIED. The courts December 11, 2012 and February 28, 2013 orders to show cause (ECF Nos. 23 , 27 ) are DISCHARGED. Notwithsta nding the expired discovery deadline in this case, plaintiff is granted leave to serve one set of requests for admission on defendant within thirty days of the date of this order. No extensions of time will be granted. Under the circumstances presen ted, the Clerk of Court is ordered to serve plaintiff as a one-time courtesy with copies of the pertinent ocuments in this case, limited to the second amended complaint (ECF No. 9 ), the courts May 7, 2012 order and findings and recommendations (EC F No. 10 ), the answer (ECF No. 11 ), and the courts September 27, 2012 order and findings and recommendations (ECF No. 15 ). If plaintiff requires any additional copies, he must order and pay for them at the rate of $0.50 per page in accordance with the regular policy of the Clerks Office. The stay and abeyance entered December 11, 2012 is lifted. The deadline for dispositive motions is reset to October 25, 2013.(Dillon, M)
|
February 28, 2013 |
Filing
27
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/27/13 ORDERING defendant to respond to 23 Order to Show Cause within 5 business days of the filing date of this order. Defendant's failure to file a response shall result in sanctions. (Meuleman, A)
|
December 11, 2012 |
Filing
23
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/10/2012 ORDERING that within 30 days, defendant shall file a response to plaintiff's 21 response; plaintiff may file an optional reply to defendant's response within 30 days after service of defendant's response; and all pending deadlines, as well as plaintiff's 18 motion to extend discovery, are HELD IN ABEYANCE pending disposition of this order to show cause. (Yin, K)
|
September 27, 2012 |
Filing
15
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/27/12 ORDERING 10 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS are adopted except for the citation to Eason v Clark County School District; and all defendants are dismissed except for the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Matson, R)
|
May 7, 2012 |
Filing
10
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 05/07/12 ORDERING that defendant California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation file a responsive pleading within 28 days of service of this order. Also, RECOMMENDING that all defendants be dismissed except for the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
March 20, 2012 |
Filing
8
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/20/2012 ORDERING that the amended complaint is DISMISSED with leave to file a second amended complaint within 28 days.(Yin, K)
|
February 8, 2012 |
Filing
3
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/7/2012 ORDERING that the complaint is DISMISSED with leave to file an amended complaint within 28 days. (Yin, K)
|