Johnson v. Friedman et al
Plaintiff: Scott N. Johnson
Defendant: Mattingly Investments, Inc. and Daniel J. Friedman
Case Number: 2:2012cv00253
Filed: January 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/8/13 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Meuleman, A)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/16/12: Defendants are granted an extension until April 6, 2012 to respond or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint. (Kaminski, H)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER 7 for DISMISSAL of PARTY signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/13/2013. Defendant Mattingly Investments, Inc. is DISMISSED without prejudice and case shall remain open with respect to remaining defendant. (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Friedman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattingly Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott N. Johnson
Represented By: Scott N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?