Reynolds et al v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Cathy A. Reynolds, Rhys Hoskins, R. W. Reynolds, Meloria Hoskins and Estate of Cathy A. Reynolds
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv00417
Filed: February 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/9/2015 ORDERING that the 48 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. (Zignago, K.)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/13/2015. (Michel, G)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/5/2014. Plaintiffs' 34 Motion to Compel is GRANTED. Defendant's 36 Motion for Protective Order is DENIED. The Discovery at issue pursuant to the parties' Motions shall be STAYED for 30 days from date of this Order so that defendant may move for reconsideration. After expiration of 30 days, if defendant's Motion for Reconsideration is not granted, the stay shall be lifted and defendant shall respond to Discovery at issue within 14 days thereafter. (Marciel, M)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/26/2013 ORDERING that the parties shall have until 1/27/2014 to submit a further joint status statement. (Zignago, K.)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 08/16/2013 GRANTING Stipulation 19 . The parties have until 11/5/2013 to complete mediation; parties shall file an updated joint status report by 11/12/2013.(Streeter, J)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER 17 for continuance signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/10/2013. Parties shall have until 8/7/2013 to complete Mediation and are excused from filing updated Joint Status Report by 5/10/2013. Parties shall have until 8/14/2013 to submit updated Joint Status Report concerning outcome of Mediation. (Marciel, M)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/4/2013 ORDERING the parties to complete mediation by 5/6/2013; EXCUSING the parties from filing an updated Joint Status Report by 2/4/2013; ORDERING the parties to submit an updated Joint Status Report by 5/10/2013. (Michel, G)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/29/12 ORDERING as follows: The parties shall have until January 28, 2013 to complete mediation; The parties are excused from filing an updated joint status report by December 7, 2012; The parties shall have until February 4, 2013 to submit an updated joint status report concerning the outcome of the mediation. (Becknal, R)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/11/2012 ORDERING the parties to complete mediation by 11/27/2012; EXCUSING the parties from filing an updated Status Report by 10/12/2012; ORDERING the parties to submit an updated Status Report by 12/7/2012. (Michel, G)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds et al v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy A. Reynolds
Represented By: Steven M. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhys Hoskins
Represented By: Steven M. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. W. Reynolds
Represented By: Steven M. Heller
Represented By: Steven M. Heller
Represented By: Steven M. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meloria Hoskins
Represented By: Steven M. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Cathy A. Reynolds
Represented By: Steven M. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark James Hancock
Represented By: Rebecca A. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?