Thomas v. Voong
Plaintiff: Jason Latrell Thomas
Defendant: M. Voong
Case Number: 2:2012cv00471
Filed: February 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 02/02/17 denying 108 Motion to Appoint Counsel and denying 109 Motion for reassignment of this action. (Plummer, M)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/12/2016 STRIKING plaintiff's 71 "Motion for Court's Assistance to Get Legal Documents"; and DENYING as untimely plaintiff's 103 motion to compel. (Yin, K) Modified on 2/12/2016 (Yin, K).
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 09/23/15 ordering plaintiff's motion 70 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion 87 is denied. Plaintiffs' motion 98 is denied as unnecessary. (Plummer, M)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 03/20/15 ordering plaintiff's motion for leave to amend 56 is granted in part and denied in part. The clerk of the court is directed to file the proposed third amended complaint [56-1]. D efendants' motion 57 to vacate the court's 6/26/14 scheduling order is granted. The 6/26/14 scheduling order is vacated. Defendants' motions 59 and 61 for additional time to respond to plaintiff's discovery requests served on 6/30/14, 7/20/14 and 9/25/14 are granted. If they have not already done so, defendants shall serve responses to the 6/30/14 and 7/20/14, discovery requests within 30 days of the date of this order. By separate order, the court will set a date by which plaintiff may file a fourth amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ADOPTING 42 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/25/14. Plaintiff's 30 Motion for Injunctive Relief is DENIED. (Manzer, C)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 02/07/14 recommending that plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief 30 be denied. MOTION for injunction relief 30 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/15/2012 ORDERING the Clerk to terminate Doc. No. 17 as a pending motion; plaintiff's 20 motion for an extension of time is GRANTED; plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 30 days; and plaintiff's 20 requests for orders relating to discovery is DENIED as premature. (Yin, K)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/13/12 ORDERING that 14 Order to Show Cause is discharged; Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order.(Dillon, M)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/03/12 ordering plaintiff shall show cause in writing within 30 days of the date of this order, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to file an amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 06/27/12 ordering plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint within 30 days of the date of service of this order. (Plummer, M)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 03/05/12 ordering plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis 4 is granted. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. All fees shall be co llected in accordance with the court's CDC order. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed IFP affidavit to the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial) (Plummer, M)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Accordingly, this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. The Clerk shall terminate any pending motions and transfer the entire file to the Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/21/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012) [Transferred from cand on 2/23/2012.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Voong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Latrell Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Voong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?