USA v. Vacant land located in Forest Ranch, California, Butte County, APN: 063-010-067-000 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Vacant land located on Doe Mill Road, Forest Ranch, California, Butte County, APN: 063-010-061-000 and Vacant land located on Doe Mill Road, Forest Ranch, California, Butte County, APN: 063-300-144-000
Claimant: Ryan Cheal, C. Linda Barnes and Robb Harrison Cheal
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Vacant land located in Forest Ranch, California, Butte County, APN: 063-010-067-000
Case Number: 2:2012cv00477
Filed: February 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2014 Filing 44 FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/2/2014 ADOPTING the Stipulations for Final Judgment of Forfeiture; ENTERING JUDGMENT against Claimants Frances Toburen, aka Frances L. Rothwell, Robb Cheal, and the Butte County Treasurer-Tax Collector, and all other potential claimants who have not filed claims in this action; ORDERING each party to bear his or her own costs and attorney's fees. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G)
July 2, 2014 Filing 43 PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation for Final Judgment of Forfeiture (Stemple), #2 Stipulation for Final Judgment of Forfeiture (Butte Co Tax)) (Khasigian, Kevin) Modified on 7/3/2014 (Michel, G).
June 25, 2014 Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER: The court has been advised by Kevin C. Khasigian, Counsel for plaintiff, that this action has been settled, Therefore, it is not necessary that the action remain upon the court's active calendar. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED: 1. That counsel file settlement/dismissal documents, in accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 160, no later than July 25, 2014; and2. That any hearing dates previously set in this matter are vacated.(TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
June 25, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by United States of America. (Khasigian, Kevin)
June 4, 2014 Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER: On April 17, 2014, the United States moved to strike #36 Claimaint Robb Cheal (Claimant) claim #6 and answer #13 . Claimant did not oppose the motion. Accordingly, the Court grants the United States motion in its entirety. IT IS SO ORDERED. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
May 29, 2014 Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER: The hearing on the motion(s) now calendared for June 4, 2014 is/are ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (h).If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
May 28, 2014 Filing 38 REPLY by United States of America re #36 MOTION to STRIKE Claim of Robb Cheal. (Khasigian, Kevin)
May 14, 2014 Filing 37 STATEMENT of Mid-Litigation by Plaintiff United States of America. (Khasigian, Kevin)
April 17, 2014 Filing 36 MOTION to STRIKE Claim of Robb Cheal by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike the Claim of Robb Cheal, #2 Declaration of Kevin C. Khasigian in Support of Motion to Strike the Claim of Robb Cheal, #3 Proposed Order)(Khasigian, Kevin)
February 26, 2014 Filing 35 DESIGNATION/DISCLOSURE of EXPERT WITNESS by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Reports)(Khasigian, Kevin)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/22/13: Discovery due by 5/28/2014. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 2/26/2014. Dispositive Motions filed by 6/25/2014. Joint Pretrial Statement due no later than 7 days prior to Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. Jury Trial set for 10/27/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Manzer, C)
February 22, 2013 Filing 33 JOINT STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (Khasigian, Kevin)
January 29, 2013 Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a joint status report on or before February 22, 2013. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
January 28, 2013 Filing 31 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Request of Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference by United States of America. (Khasigian, Kevin)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/26/2012 STAYING CASE until 1/28/2013; ORDERING the parties to advise the court, by 1/28/2013, whether a further stay is necessary. (Michel, G)
October 26, 2012 Filing 29 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Stay of Further Proceedings by United States of America. (Khasigian, Kevin)
August 24, 2012 Filing 28 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Ryan Cheal* (Becknal, R)
August 22, 2012 Filing 27 REQUEST for Clerk's Default Against Ryan C. Cheal by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Khasigian, Kevin)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/26/12 ORDERING that this matter is STAYED pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 981(g)(1), 981(g)(2), and 21 U.S.C. 881(i) until 10/27/12. On or before 10/27/12, the parties will advise the court whether a further stay is necessary. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 26, 2012 Filing 25 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER extending stay of Further Proceedings by United States of America. (Khasigian, Kevin) Modified on 7/27/2012 (Marciel, M)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 06/08/12 ORDERING that the re #20 Request to Stay is GRANTED; this matter is STAYED for 60 days; by 07/28/12, the parties will advise the Court whether a further stay is necessary. The scheduling conference scheduled for 06/11/12 is VACATED. (Benson, A.)
May 31, 2012 Filing 23 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Page Limits, #3 VDRP Form) (Zignago, K.)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/30/2012 ORDERING that the action denominated 2:12-CV-00477-GEB-DAD be reassigned to Judge John A. Mendez for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set in this reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:12-CV-00477-JAM-DAD. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Zignago, K.)
May 29, 2012 Filing 20 JOINT STATUS REPORT and REQUEST FOR STAY by United States of America. (Khasigian, Kevin) Modified on 6/11/2012 (Benson, A.).
May 25, 2012 Filing 19 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:12-CR-00185 by United States of America. (Khasigian, Kevin)
May 17, 2012 Filing 18 DECLARATION of PUBLICATION filed by United States of America. Last publication date 4/27/2012. (Khasigian, Kevin) Modified on 5/19/2012 (Marciel, M)
May 8, 2012 Filing 17 NOTICE of LIS PENDENS by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Recording of Lis Pendens, #2 Notice of Recording of Lis Pendens)(Khasigian, Kevin)
May 4, 2012 Filing 16 NOTICE of Posting of the defendant real properties APNs: 063-010-067-000 and 063-300-144-000 on 4/16/2012 by United States of America. (Khasigian, Kevin)
May 3, 2012 Filing 15 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Robb Harrison Cheal. Attorney Fuery, John Joseph added.(Fuery, John)
April 20, 2012 Filing 14 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Vacant land located on Doe Mill Road, Forest Ranch, California, Butte County, APN: 063-300-144-000.(Fuery, John)
April 20, 2012 Filing 13 ANSWER to THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT by Vacant land located on Doe Mill Road, Forest Ranch, California, Butte County, APN: 063-300-144-000.(Fuery, John)
April 20, 2012 Filing 12 ANSWER with Jury Demand, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs by Vacant land located in Forest Ranch, California, Butte County, APN: 063-010-067-000.(Fuery, John)
April 19, 2012 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by C. Linda Barnes. Attorney Stephens, Brad J. added. (Stephens, Brad)
April 19, 2012 Filing 10 CLAIM in Civil Forfeiture Case (Stephens, Brad)
April 12, 2012 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint, #2 Civil New Case Documents for GEB. (Khasigian, Kevin)
April 12, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE of Posting of the defendant real property APN: 063-010-061-000 by United States of America. (Khasigian, Kevin)
April 11, 2012 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Vacant land located in Forest Ranch, California, Butte County, APN: 063-010-067-000, Vacant land located on Doe Mill Road, Forest Ranch, California, Butte County, APN: 063-010-061-000, Vacant land located on Doe Mill Road, Forest Ranch, California, Butte County, APN: 063-300-144-000.(Goodman, Karen)
April 4, 2012 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENT IN PAPER by Vacant land located in Forest Ranch, California, Butte County, APN: 063-010-067-000, Vacant land located on Doe Mill Road, Forest Ranch, California, Butte County, APN: 063-010-061-000, Vacant land located on Doe Mill Road, Forest Ranch, California, Butte County, APN: 063-300-144-000: NOTICE OF CLAIM AND CLAIM CONTESTING FORFEITURE. Attorney Fuery, John Joseph added. (Fuery, John)
March 28, 2012 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America. (Khasigian, Kevin)
March 28, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Claim by Frances Toburen re Vacant land located in Forest Ranch, California, Butte County, APN: 063-010-067-000, Vacant land located on Doe Mill Road, Forest Ranch, California, Butte County, APN: 063-010-061-000, Vacant land located on Doe Mill Road, Forest Ranch, California, Butte County, APN: 063-300-144-000. Attorney Goodman, Karen M. ADDED. (Goodman, Karen) Modified on 3/29/2012 (Michel, G).
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/24/2012 GRANTING governement's #1 Application for Publication. A Statement that answers Complaint or Motion under FRCP 12 must be filed and served within 21 days after filing claims. In the absence thereof, Default may be entered and condemnation ordered. (Marciel, M)
February 24, 2012 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP Form) (Becknal, R)
February 23, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against all defendants by United States of America. Attorney Khasigian, Kevin Christopher added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Verified Complaint, #3 Proposed Order for Publication) (Khasigian, Kevin) Modified on 2/27/2012 (Marciel, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Vacant land located in Forest Ranch, California, Butte County, APN: 063-010-067-000 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ryan Cheal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: C. Linda Barnes
Represented By: Brad J. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robb Harrison Cheal
Represented By: John Joseph Fuery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vacant land located on Doe Mill Road, Forest Ranch, California, Butte County, APN: 063-010-061-000
Represented By: Karen M. Goodman
Represented By: John Joseph Fuery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vacant land located on Doe Mill Road, Forest Ranch, California, Butte County, APN: 063-300-144-000
Represented By: Karen M. Goodman
Represented By: John Joseph Fuery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Vacant land located in Forest Ranch, California, Butte County, APN: 063-010-067-000
Represented By: Karen M. Goodman
Represented By: John Joseph Fuery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?