Massie v. Amaya et al
Plaintiff: Scott Massie
Defendant: Arik Amaya, John Zufall, Brian Walker, Matt Mitchelle and Douglas Van Buskirk
Case Number: 2:2012cv00525
Filed: February 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION and ORDER 56 DISMISSING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/7/2014. All claims against all defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice. (Marciel, M)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/24/14 ORDERING that Plaintiffs motion for extension 53 is denied; The December 8, 2014 jury trial date is vacated; and dispositional documents shall be filed on or before December 12, 2014.(Dillon, M)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/18/2014 DENYING plaintiff's 42 request for examination. (Yin, K)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/18/14 ordering that plaintiff's motion 42 is granted. (Plummer, M)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/27/14 ordering the custodian to produce Scott Massie via video conferencing at 08/13/14 at 10:00 a.m. at 2986 Bechelli Lane, Courtroom 304 in R edding, California before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: CMK and IT Dept, Sacramento)(Plummer, M)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/4/13 ORDERING that Plaintiffs motion for discovery 27 is DENIED; Plaintiffs motion for the appointment of counsel 30 is DENIED without prejudice; and Plaintiffs motion for extension of the pretrial motions deadline 29 is DENIED without prejudice to its renewal within twenty-one days from the date of this order, as set forth above. (Dillon, M)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 02/01/13 ordering within 14 days from the date of this order defendants Arik Amaya and John Zufall shall each pay to the United States Marshal the sum of $255.72, unless within that time defendant files a written statement showing good cause for his failure to waive service. The court does not intend to extend this 14 day period. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal. (Plummer, M)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/08/13 ordering defendants Amaya and Zufall show cause within 21 days from the date of this order, why default should not be entered. The clerk of the court shall forward a copy of this order t o the following defendants: John Zufall and Arik Maya at the Shasta County Jail, 1655 West Street, Redding, California, 96001. The clerk of the court shall serve a copy of this order on Monica Anderson, Supervising Deputy Attorney General. (cc: Monica Anderson, Attorney General)(Plummer, M)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/11/12 ORDERING the Sheriff of Shasta County to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Scott Massie to the clerk until the balance of $350 is paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Shasta County. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial). (Dillon, M)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/6/2012 ORDERING that within 30 days, plaintiff shall complete and return the attached Notice of Submission with the required documents; and the clerk to send plaintiff a new ifp application. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massie v. Amaya et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arik Amaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Zufall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Mitchelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Van Buskirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?