Back Shop Tiefkuhl GMBH v. GN Trade, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Back Shop Tiefkuhl GMBH
Defendant: Alex Almansky, GN Trade, Inc., Vladimir Demin and Vladimir Shevchenko
Case Number: 2:2012cv00540
Filed: February 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/16/14 ORDERING that, within 3 days after these findings and recommendations are filed, plaintiff shall serve a copy of the findings and recommendations on defend ants by mail at their last known addresses, and shall forthwith file proof of such service and RECOMMENDING that 68 MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT be granted in part along the terms contained within this order. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Meuleman, A)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/14/2014. (Michel, G)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/15/13 ORDERING that defendant Vladimir Shevchenko is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Defendant has waived costs pursuant to stipulation. (Manzer, C)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/11/2013 CONTINUING the Final Pretrial Conference to 3/31/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; CONTINUING the Jury Trial to 4/29/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Michel, G)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/28/13: The findings and recommendations 51 are ADOPTED. Defendants GN Trade, Inc. and Vladimir Demin's operative answers are STRICKEN. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter the default of defendants GN Trade, Inc. and Vladimir Demin. (Kaminski, H)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/1/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 48 motion to compel is GRANTED along the terms outlined in this order and findings and recommendations. Within 14 days, defendants GN Trade, Inc. and Vladimir Demin shall pay plaintiff $800 in monetary sanctions, for which they are jointly and severally liable. Plaintiff shall file a brief statement with the court indicating whether such sanctions had been paid upon expiration of that fourteen-day period. Any failure by these defendants to pay the ordered monetary sanctions will serve as additional grounds for the court's simultaneous recommendation that terminating sanctions be imposed. It is RECOMM ENDED that Defendants GN Trade, Inc., and Vladimir Demin's operative answers be STRICKEN. The Clerk be directed to enter the default of defendants GN Trade, Inc., and Vladimir Demin. Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Kastilahn, A)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/22/2013. (Michel, G)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 8/14/12, ORDERING that 20 the motion to withdraw as attorney is RESET for 9/10/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. Defendants Vladimir Demin and a representat ive of GN Trade, Inc., are ordered to appear in person for the hearing and SHOW CAUSE why they should not be held in contempt of court for their failure to appear at the 8/13/2012 hearing. Demin and GN Trade, Inc., may be adjudged in contempt of cour t, have sanctions levied against them, including the entry of their default, if they fail to appear at the 9/10/2012 hearing. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order via certified mail on Vladimir Demin and GN Trade, Inc. at the following address es: (1) 5051 College Oak Dr., Sacramento, CA 95841; (2) c/o Bcker Bck, 2601 Marconi Ave, Suite F6, Sacramento, CA 95821; and (3) 7441 Thalia Way, Citrus Heights, CA 95621. The Clerk shall also fax a copy of this Order to (916) 332-8574, which is the fax number provided on the GN Trade, Inc., website. Counsel for plaintiff shall also appear at the hearing. (Kastilahn, A)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 07/31/2012 CONTINUING hearing re 20 MOTION to WITHDRAW until August 13, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 5. (Streeter, J)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re Defendant Alex Almansky's Request for Telephonic Appearance at the June 11, 2012, 2:00 p.m. Status Conference 18 signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 6/4/2012. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call.(Kirksey Smith, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Back Shop Tiefkuhl GMBH v. GN Trade, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Almansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GN Trade, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vladimir Demin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vladimir Shevchenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Back Shop Tiefkuhl GMBH
Represented By: Glenn W. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?