Wilson v. City of Vallejo et al
Plaintiff: Toby Wilson
Defendant: City of Vallejo, M. Thompson, D Joseph, M Nicol, J Jaksch, B. Clark and Robert Nichelini
Case Number: 2:2012cv00547
Filed: February 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 1(a)(2) signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/20/14. CASE CLOSED. (Manzer, C)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER RE SETTLEMENT AND DISPOSITION signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/20/2014 ORDERING dispositional documents are to be filed not later than 30 days from the date of this order; all hearing dates set in this matter, including the tri al date currently set for 2/24/2014, are VACATED, and all pending motions are DENIED as MOOT. Failure to comply with this order may be grounds for the imposition of sanctions on any and all counsel or parties who contributed to the violation of this order. (Waggoner, D)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/19/2014 ORDERING Settlement Conference set for 2/20/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Counsel for all parties shall personally attend; In addition, the court orders the personal appearance of the Vallejo City Attorney,Claudia Quintana; and the Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the City Attorney at cquintana@ci.vallejo.ca.us. (Waggoner, D)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION and ORDER 34 for continuance signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/2/2013. The Pretrial Conference is RE-SET for 11/1/2013 at 10:00 AM and Jury Trial is RE-SCHEDULED for 2/24/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM). A Joint Pretrial Conference Statement shall be filed no later than 7 days prior to Conference. (Marciel, M)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/5/2013 GRANTING 17 Motion for Summary Judgment as to remaining claims against Defendant Nichelini; GRANTING 17 Motion for Summary Judgment as to any claims arising from Defendant Officers' warrantless entry into Plaintiff's apartment and their seizure of Plaintiff; DENYING 17 Motion for Summary Judgment as to plaintiff's excessive force claim and his state law claims in the third, fourth and fifth causes of action. (Michel, G)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/5/13. (Kastilahn, A)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION TO PROTECTIVE ORDER and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/24/12; ORDERING that the above-described records relating to this matter, as more specifically described in Paragraph 1 of the Stipulation, be subject to a protective order fully incorporating the provisions set forth above. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. City of Vallejo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby Wilson
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vallejo
Represented By: Mark A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Nicol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Jaksch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Nichelini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?