Prasad et al v. County of Sutter et al
Plaintiff: Mary Prasad, T. P., A. P. and N. S.
Defendant: County of Sutter, J. Paul Parker, David Samson, Norman Bidwell, Doris Brown, Melody Young, Baljinder Rai, Shane Dickson, Fremont-Rideout Health Group, Michael Fraters, Lou Anne Cummings, Amerjit Bhattal, Brent Garbett, Kimberly Weiss, Gurkirat Bhangu, Christina Stohlman, Lester Eaton, Miguel Aguilar, Olga Tahara, Rosa Diaz and Eric Crawford
Case Number: 2:2012cv00592
Filed: March 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Colusa
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 244 SEALED EVENT (Benson, A.)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/06/21 APPROVING #242 Application and AUTHORIZING the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to N.D., P.B. (Benson, A.)
October 6, 2021 Filing 242 APPLICATION FOR ORDER re Disbursement of Blocked Account Funds and PROPOSED ORDER by N. S.. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 10/6/2021 (Streeter, J).
March 18, 2021 Filing 241 SEALED EVENT (Kastilahn, A)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/17/21 APPROVING #239 Application and AUTHORIZING the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to A.P..(Kastilahn, A)
March 17, 2021 Filing 239 APPLICATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account by A. P.. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 3/17/2021 (Reader, L).
October 21, 2019 Filing 238 SEALED EVENT. (York, M)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/21/2019 APPROVING #236 Application and AUTHORIZING the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to T.A.P.B. (York, M)
October 21, 2019 Filing 236 APPLICATION for BLOCKED ACCOUNT WITHDRAWAL and PROPOSED ORDER by T.A.P.B. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 10/23/2019 (Huang, H).
July 23, 2019 Filing 235 SEALED EVENT. (Huang, H)
July 23, 2019 Filing 234 SEALED EVENT. (Huang, H)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/23/2019 APPROVING #231 Application and AUTHORIZING the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to A.S.L.P.B. (Huang, H)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/23/2019 APPROVING #230 Application and AUTHORIZING the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to N.D.P.B. (Huang, H)
July 23, 2019 Filing 231 APPLICATION for BLOCKED ACCOUNT WITHDRAWAL and PROPOSED ORDER by A.S.L.P.B. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 7/24/2019 (Huang, H).
July 23, 2019 Filing 230 APPLICATION for BLOCKED ACCOUNT WITHDRAWAL and PROPOSED ORDER by N.D.P.B. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 7/24/2019 (Huang, H).
March 6, 2019 Filing 229 SEALED EVENT. (Becknal, R)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/6/19 AUTHORIZING the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to the payee identified above. (Becknal, R)
March 5, 2019 Filing 227 APPLICATION for Disbursement of Blocked Account Funds for ASLPB by A. P. (Galvan, Ernest)
November 6, 2018 Filing 226 SEALED EVENT (Benson, A.)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/06/18 APPROVING #224 Application and AUTHORIZING the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to T.A.P.B. (Benson, A.)
November 6, 2018 Filing 224 APPLICATION for BLOCKED ACCOUNT WITHDRAWAL and PROPOSED ORDER by T.A.P.B. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 11/6/2018 (Benson, A.).
April 27, 2018 Filing 218 SEALED EVENT (Hunt, G)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/26/2018; The Court approves request and authorizes the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to T.A.P.B.(Hunt, G)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/26/2018; The Court approves request and authorizes the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to N.D.P.B.(Hunt, G)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/26/2018; The Court approves request and authorizes the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to A.S.L.P.B. (Hunt, G)
April 26, 2018 Filing 220 SEALED EVENT (Hunt, G)
April 26, 2018 Filing 219 SEALED EVENT (Hunt, G)
April 24, 2018 Filing 217 APPLICATION for BLOCKED ACCOUNT WITHDRAWAL and PROPOSED ORDER by N. S. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 4/25/2018 (Benson, A.).
April 24, 2018 Filing 216 APPLICATION for BLOCKED ACCOUNT WITHDRAWAL and PROPOSED ORDER by T. P. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 4/25/2018 (Benson, A.).
April 24, 2018 Filing 215 APPLICATION for BLOCKED ACCOUNT WITHDRAWAL and PROPOSED ORDER by A. P. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 4/25/2018 (Benson, A.).
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/15/2017; The Court approves request and authorizes the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to A.S.L.P.B. (Zignago, K.)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/15/2017; The Court approves request and authorizes the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to N.D.P.B. (Zignago, K.)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/15/2017; The Court approves request and authorizes the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to T.A.P.B. (Zignago, K.)
November 16, 2017 Filing 211 SEALED EVENT (Zignago, K.)
November 16, 2017 Filing 210 SEALED EVENT (Zignago, K.)
November 16, 2017 Filing 209 SEALED EVENT (Zignago, K.)
November 14, 2017 Filing 208 PROPOSED ORDER re Disbursement from Blocked Account by T. P. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 11/16/2017 (Donati, J).
November 14, 2017 Filing 207 PROPOSED ORDER re Disbursement from Blocked Account by by N. S. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 11/16/2017 (Donati, J).
November 14, 2017 Filing 206 PROPOSED ORDER re Disbursement from Blocked Account by A. P. (Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 11/16/2017 (Donati, J).
September 5, 2017 Filing 205 SEALED EVENT (Benson, A.)
September 5, 2017 Filing 204 SEALED EVENT (Benson, A.)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/5/2017; The Court approves request and authorizes the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to A.S.L.P.B. (Benson, A.)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/5/2017; The Court approves request and authorizes the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to N.D.P.B. (Benson, A.)
September 1, 2017 Filing 201 PROPOSED ORDER re Withdrawal of Blocked Account Funds by A. P.. (Galvan, Ernest)
September 1, 2017 Filing 200 PROPOSED ORDER re Withdrawal of Blocked Account Funds by N. S.. (Galvan, Ernest)
June 5, 2017 Filing 199 SEALED EVENT (Zignago, K.)
June 5, 2017 Filing 198 SEALED EVENT (Zignago, K.)
June 5, 2017 Filing 197 SEALED EVENT (Zignago, K.)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 APPLICATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/5/2017; The Court approves request and authorizes the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to A.S.L.P. (Zignago, K.)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 APPLICATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/5/2017; The Court approves request and authorizes the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to T.A.P. (Zignago, K.)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 APPLICATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/5/2017; The Court approves request and authorizes the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to N.D.S. (Zignago, K.)
April 28, 2017 Filing 193 SEALED EVENT (Zignago, K.)
April 28, 2017 Filing 192 SEALED EVENT (Zignago, K.)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/28/2017 GRANTING #190 Notice of Request to Seal Document(s). Accordingly, Plaintiffs' Request to File Under Seal the Declaration of Jackie Lee Brown in Support of Petition of Jackie Lee Brown and Mary Prasad for Substitution of Jackie Lee Brown as Guardian ad Litem for Minors T.P., A.P. and N.S. is GRANTED. (Zignago, K.)
April 26, 2017 Filing 190 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvan, Ernest)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/19/17 ORDERING that the petition for Substitution of Jackie Lee Brown as Guardian Ad Litem is hereby GRANTED, and Jackie Lee Brown is appointed guardian ad litem for minor plaintiffs T.P., A.P., and N.S.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 17, 2017 Filing 188 Petition to substitute Jackie Lee Brown as Guardian Ad Litem by A. P., T. P., N. S.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galvan, Ernest) Modified on 4/18/2017 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
February 14, 2017 Filing 187 SEALED EVENT (Benson, A)
February 14, 2017 Filing 186 SEALED EVENT (Benson, A)
February 13, 2017 Filing 185 PROPOSED ORDER re Blocked Account Disbursement for N.D.S. by Mary Prasad. (Galvan, Ernest)
February 13, 2017 Filing 184 PROPOSED ORDER re Blocked Account Disbursement for T.A.P. by Mary Prasad. (Galvan, Ernest)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 183 APPLICATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/26/2016; The Court approves request and authorizes the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to N.D.S. (Zignago, K.)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 182 APPLICATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/26/2016; The Court approves request and authorizes the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to A.S.L.P. (Zignago, K.)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 181 APPLICATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/26/2016; The Court approves request and authorizes the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to T.A.P. (Zignago, K.)
April 26, 2016 Filing 180 SEALED EVENT (Zignago, K.)
April 26, 2016 Filing 179 SEALED EVENT (Zignago, K.)
April 26, 2016 Filing 178 SEALED EVENT (Zignago, K.)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 177 APPLICATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 01/26/16: The Court approves request and authorizes the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to A.S.L.P. (Benson, A)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 176 APPLICATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 01/26/16: The Court approves request and authorizes the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to N.D.S. (Benson, A)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 APPLICATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 01/26/16: The Court approves request and authorizes the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to T.A.P.(Benson, A)
January 26, 2016 Filing 174 SEALED EVENT (Benson, A)
January 26, 2016 Filing 173 SEALED EVENT (Benson, A)
January 26, 2016 Filing 172 SEALED EVENT (Benson, A)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/22/2015 GRANTING Application authorizing an interim disbursement of blocked account funds to Mary Prassad, in the amount of $1,065.00 for Summer Day Camp as to A.S.L.P. (Reader, L)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/22/2015 GRANTING Application authorizing an interim disbursement of blocked account funds to Mary Prassad, in the amount of $1,065.00 for Summer Day Camp as to N.D.S. (Reader, L)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/22/2015 GRANTING Application authorizing an interim disbursement of blocked account funds to Mary Prassad, in the amount of $1,065.00 for Summer Day Camp as to T.A.P. (Reader, L)
April 22, 2015 Filing 168 SEALED EVENT (Reader, L)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 APPLICATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/27/14: The Court approves request and authorizes the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to A.S.L.P.(Kaminski, H)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 APPLICATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/27/14: The Court approves request and authorizes the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to N.D.S. (Kaminski, H)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 APPLICATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/27/14: The Court approves request and authorizes the withdrawal of the requested amount from the indicated blocked account for disbursement as to T.A.P. (Kaminski, H)
October 27, 2014 Filing 163 SEALED EVENT. (Kaminski, H)
July 31, 2014 Filing 161 SEALED EVENT (Donati, J)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/30/2014 APPROVING request for disbursement from blocked account. (Donati, J)
July 14, 2014 Filing 159 SEALED EVENT (Reader, L)
July 10, 2014 Filing 158 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by All Plaintiffs. (Fischer, Aaron)
June 11, 2014 Filing 157 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/11/2014: Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal #156 and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
June 11, 2014 Filing 156 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL of action, with prejudice, pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad, N. S. (Mantoan, Kathryn) Modified on 6/12/2014 (Michel, G).
June 9, 2014 Filing 155 STATEMENT of Receipt and Acknowledgement of Orders to Deposit Money Into Blocked Accounts by Plaintiffs A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad, N. S.. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
May 21, 2014 Filing 153 SEALED EVENT. (Kaminski, H)
May 21, 2014 Filing 152 SEALED EVENT. (Kaminski, H)
May 21, 2014 Filing 151 SEALED EVENT. (Kaminski, H)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/20/14: Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Minors' Compromise and for Orders to Deposit Money into Blocked Accounts is hereby GRANTED.(Kaminski, H)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/20/14: Plaintiffs' Request to File Under Seal the Orders to Deposit Money is GRANTED. (Kaminski, H)
May 21, 2014 Filing 148 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Melody Young to #140 Motion to Approve Minors' Compromise and for Orders to deposit money into blocked accounts. (Williams, Kathleen)
May 2, 2014 Filing 147 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/2/2014: On the Court's own motion, Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Minors' Compromise #140 is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 5/8/2014 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
April 28, 2014 Filing 146 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by County of Sutter to #140 Motion to Approve Minors' Compromise and for Orders to deposit money into blocked accounts. (Whitefleet, John)
April 17, 2014 Filing 145 SEALED EVENT. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 17, 2014 Filing 144 SEALED EVENT. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Request to File documents under seal signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/16/14. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 11, 2014 Filing 142 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad, N. S.. (Fischer, Aaron)
April 10, 2014 Filing 141 NOTICE of REQUEST to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by all plaintiffs. (Stark, Jennifer) Modified on 4/11/2014 (Marciel, M)
April 10, 2014 Filing 140 MOTION to APPROVE CONSENT JUDGMENT of Minors' Compromise and for Orders to deposit money into deposit money into blocked accounts by plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael W. Bien in support, #2 Declaration of Mary Prasad in support, #3 Proposed Order) (Bien, Michael) Modified on 4/11/2014 (Marciel, M)
March 25, 2014 Filing 139 MINUTE ORDER by Courtroom Deputy M. Caspar for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/25/2014: ORDERING that, in light of the Notice of Settlement #134 the 4/1/2014 settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman is hereby VACATED. (TEXT ONLY)(Caspar, M)
March 13, 2014 Filing 138 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/13/2014: Pursuant to the Notice of Settlement #134 filed on 2/28/2014, the Court determined this case has settled. Plaintiffs shall file the necessary documents to obtain Court approval of the Minors' Compromise on or before 4/14/2014. In accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 160, dispositional documents shall then be filed within 21 days after the Court's approval of the Minors' Compromise. Failure to comply with this order may be grounds for the imposition of sanctions on any and all counsel as well as any party or parties who cause non-compliance with this order. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
March 3, 2014 Filing 137 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants by N. S., T. P., Mary Prasad, A. P. (Michel, G)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/3/2014 GRANTING #132 Stipulation affording the plaintiffs leave to file a Third Amended Complaint; ORDERING that the attached Third Amended Complaint be deemed filed and served as of the date of the entry of this Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Michel, G)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/3/2014 GRANTING #133 Petition for Appointment as Guardian Ad Litem; APPOINTING Mary Prasad as guardian ad litem for the minor N.S. (Michel, G)
February 28, 2014 Filing 134 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
February 28, 2014 Filing 133 PETITION for Appointment as Guardian Ad Litem for Minor N.S. by Mary Prasad. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mantoan, Kathryn)
February 28, 2014 Filing 132 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Filing of Third Amended Complaint by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/26/2014: ORDERING that, due to the Court's own unavailability, the 3/4/2014 Settlement Conference is VACATED and RESET for 4/1/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (TEXT ONLY)(Caspar, M)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/4/14 ORDERING that the parties be allowed to preserve the issue of taking the minors' depositions. The parties are given until 3/31/14, to inform the Court as to whether a briefing and hearing schedule should be established regarding this issue.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 31, 2014 Filing 129 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER regarding Depositions of minor plaintiffs. (Stark, Jennifer) Modified on 2/3/2014 (Marciel, M)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/31/14 DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #127 Stipulation and Proposed Order. (Meuleman, A)
January 30, 2014 Filing 127 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Depositions of Minor Plaintiffs by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad. Attorney Stark, Jennifer added. (Stark, Jennifer)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/9/14: Discovery cut-off is extended until February 10, 2014 solely for the purpose of completing the deposition of defense expert Lawanna G. Farrell on that date. With respect to all other discovery, the discovery cut-off date remains February 7, 2014. (Kaminski, H)
January 9, 2014 Filing 125 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Limited Modification of Discovery Cut-Off re #36 Scheduling Order. (Mantoan, Kathryn) Modified on 1/13/2014 (Meuleman, A).
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/7/14 ORDERING that defendant shall comply with the 7/17/13 order within seven days of the date of this order.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 7, 2014 Filing 123 RESPONSE by Mary Prasad to #122 Request. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathryn G. Mantoan)(Mantoan, Kathryn)
January 6, 2014 Filing 122 REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION of #115 Order denying Request for Reconsideration by County of Sutter. (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 1/7/2014 (Michel, G).
January 3, 2014 Filing 121 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 01/04/2014 ORDERING a Settlement Conference set for 3/4/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Counsel are instructed to have a principal with full settlement authority present at the Settlement Conference or to be fully authorized to settle the matter on any terms. The parties are directed to exchange non-confidential settlement conference statements seven (7) days prior to this settlement conference. These statements shall simultaneously be delivered to the Court using the following email address: kjnorders@caed.uscourts.gov. If a party desires to share additional confidential information with the Court, they may do so pursuant to the provisions of Local Rule 270(d) and (e). (Streeter, J)
December 23, 2013 Filing 120 STIPULATION and Request for Settlement Conference by Melody Young. (Williams, Kathleen)
December 10, 2013 Filing 119 NOTICE re Conflict on December 11, 2013 (Amended) by Miguel Aguilar, Gurkirat Bhangu, Amerjit Bhattal, Norman Bidwell, Doris Brown, County of Sutter, Eric Crawford, Lou Anne Cummings, Rosa Diaz, Shane Dickson, Lester Eaton, Brent Garbett, J. Paul Parker, Baljinder Rai, David Samson, Christina Stohlman, Olga Tahara, Kimberly Weiss re 117 Minute Order,,. (Whitefleet, John)
December 9, 2013 Filing 118 Defendants' NOTICE re Conflict on 12/11/13, Date Set for Deposition of Amerjit Bhattal re 117 Minute Order. (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 12/12/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 3, 2013 Filing 117 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) by Courtroom Deputy K. Owen for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/3/2013: Pursuant to an informal telephone scheduling conference on 12/2/2013 with attorneys Mantoan, Holley, Williams, and Whitefleet, the parties have agreed to the deposition of witness Bidwell on 12/5/2013 at 9:30 a.m. and witness Bhattal on 12/11/2013 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel for defendant Sutter County is directed to provide, no later than 12:00 p.m. on December 3, 2013, dates for the depositions of the other witnesses identified at the scheduling conference. So ordered. (Owen, K)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge * John F. Moulds* from the bench of the Eastern District, this action is reassigned to *Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney* for all further proceedings. (Waggoner, D)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/22/13 ORDERING Defendant's Request for Reconsideration #104 is Denied. (Becknal, R)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/9/2013 ORDERING that each party complete initial expert disclosure in compliance with F.R.Cv.P. Rule 26(a)(2)(B) and (C) by 9/13/2013; ORDERING that any contradictory and/or rebuttal experts be disclosed in compliance with F.R.Cv.P. Rule 26(a)(2)(D)(ii) by 10/14/2013. (Michel, G)
September 5, 2013 Filing 113 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Expert Deadines by Fremont-Rideout Health Group. (Zimmerman, Robert)
August 23, 2013 Filing 112 ANSWER to #50 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Melody Young.(Williams, Kathleen)
August 23, 2013 Filing 111 ANSWER to #50 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Fremont-Rideout Health Group.(Zimmerman, Robert)
August 22, 2013 Filing 110 ANSWER to #50 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Michael Fraters.(Kurlan, Jennifer)
August 21, 2013 Filing 109 ANSWER to #50 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Miguel Aguilar, Gurkirat Bhangu, Amerjit Bhattal, Norman Bidwell, Doris Brown, County of Sutter, Eric Crawford, Lou Anne Cummings, Rosa Diaz, Shane Dickson, Lester Eaton, Brent Garbett, J. Paul Parker, Baljinder Rai, David Samson, Christina Stohlman, Olga Tahara, Kimberly Weiss.(Whitefleet, John)
August 7, 2013 Filing 108 NOTICE of Non-Amendment by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
August 7, 2013 Filing 107 TRANSCRIPT of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Proceedings held on 06/12/2013, before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 8/29/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/9/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2013 filed by ECRO Jonathan Anderson, Phone number 916-930-4072 E-mail janderson@caed.uscourts.gov. (Anderson, J)
August 1, 2013 Filing 106 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Mary Prasad to #104 Request for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge's #103 Order. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathryn G. Mantoan)(Mantoan, Kathryn)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/29/2013. Defendant Fraters' and Rideout's #52 #56 Motions to Dismiss and #53 #57 to Strike are DENIED. Sutter defendants' #61 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED in all respects except to plaintiffs' failure to summon medical care against claim against Dickson, Rai, Crawford, Diaz, Aguilar, Tahara, Stohlman, Eaton, and Garbett is DISMISSED. Plaintiffs are GRANTED 15 days leave to amend their Complaint and address the deficiencies described. (Marciel, M)
July 26, 2013 Filing 104 REQUEST for RECONSIDERATION by District Court of Magistrate Judge's #103 Ruling by County of Sutter. (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 7/30/2013 (Marciel, M)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/17/13. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs are awarded reasonable expenses under FRCP 37(a) in the amount of $18,022.50 against defendants. (Meuleman, A)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/12/13 ORDERING that defendant's #96 Request for Reconsideration is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
July 5, 2013 Filing 101 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Mary Prasad to #96 Request. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/2/13 ORDERING that within 7 days defendants shall produce documents in accordance with this order; the remaining documents submitted for in camera review need not be produced. (Manzer, C)
June 28, 2013 Filing 99 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/28/2013: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Stay Order of Magistrate Judge Pending Ruling on Motion for Reconsideration. (ECF No. #95 .) Plaintiffs oppose the ex parte application. (ECF No. #98 .) The Court finds that Defendants have not demonstrated that they are without fault in creating the alleged crisis that requires ex parte relief, or that the crisis occurred as a result of excusable neglect. See Mission Power Engineering Co. v. Continental Cas. Co., 883 F. Supp. 488, 492 (C.D. Cal. 1995), cited approvingly in Manpower Inc. v. Slingshot Connections LLC, No. 2:12-cv-01069 JAM KJN, 2012 WL 3561974, at *2 (E.D. Cal. Aug. 17, 2012). Defendants have been on notice of the Magistrate Judge's order since June 14, 2013, and only bring their ex parte request at the eleventh hour prior to their deadline to comply. Defendants' ex parte application for a stay is DENIED. With respect to the request for reconsideration, Plaintiffs are to file their opposition to Defendants' request in accordance with Local Rule 303. No reply briefs are permitted. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
June 27, 2013 Filing 98 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Mary Prasad to #95 Ex Parte Application. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
June 27, 2013 Filing 97 LETTER BRIEF by Mary Prasad re #91 Order. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sanford Jay Rosen, #2 Declaration of Carter C. White, #3 Declaration of Mary Prasad)(Mantoan, Kathryn) Modified on 7/1/2013 (Becknal, R).
June 27, 2013 Filing 96 REQUEST for Reconsideration by the District Court of Magistrate Judge's Ruling by County of Sutter re #91 Order. (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 7/1/2013 (Becknal, R).
June 27, 2013 Filing 95 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Order of Magistrate Judge Pending Ruling on Motion for Reconsideration by County of Sutter. (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 7/1/2013 (Becknal, R).
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/25/2013. (Owen, K)
June 21, 2013 Filing 93 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order re #91 Order. (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 7/1/2013 (Becknal, R).
June 21, 2013 Filing 92 BRIEF re Plaintiffs' Request for Sanctions by County of Sutter. (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 7/1/2013 (Becknal, R).
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/14/2013 DENYING the defendants' request for the court to enter a protective order pending the outcome of defendants' Motions to Dismiss; CONFIRMING that dispute numbers 5, 6 and 11 have been resolved; ORDERING the parties to produce the documents responsive to plaintiffs' dispute numbers 1-4 and 12-14 by 6/17/2013 or to contact the court if a dispute arises regarding said documents; ORDERING the defendants to produce the identity of the inmates housed in cells MAX-2 and MAX-3 within 7 days; ORDERING the defendants to submit, for in camera review, those portions of the requested personnel files containing grievances against individual officers and Internal Affairs Reports, and any training attended bythe officers within 14 days; ORDERING the defendants to conduct a reasonable and diligent search for "[i]nternal or third-party audits, assessments, reports, or accreditation-related documents for the provision of health care at Sutter County Jail since 1/28/2008..." within 14 days; ORDERING defendants to conduct a reasonable and diligent search for "[d]ocuments reflecting attendance at and/or content of Sutter County Jail medical services continuous quality improvement (CQI) meetings from January 2008 through the present..." and "[a]ny plans of correction for Sutter County Jail medical services from January 2008 through the present..." within 14 days; ORDERING defendants to serve on plaintiffs a declaration describing the search conducted and produce any responsive documents within 14 days; ORDERING defendants to conduct a reasonable and diligent search for "[e]xcel spreadsheets or other documents created by Brent Garbett during his tenure as Sutter County Jail Nurse Manager reflecting his review of grievances" within 14 days; ORDERING defendants to serve on plaintiffs a declaration describing the search conducted and produce any responsive documents within 14 days; ORDERING defendants to conduct a reasonable and diligent search for "[a]ll morbidity or Death in Custody reports regarding deaths of inmates at Sutter County Jail (or inmates who died at outside providers to which they were directly transferred from Sutter County Jail) from January 2001 through thepresent" within 14 days; ORDERING defendants to serve on plaintiffs a declaration describing the search conducted and produce any responsive documents within 14 days; ALLOWING defendants to file a letter brief, within 7 days and not to exceed four pages, addressing plaintiffs request for expenses incurred in connection with the Motion to Compel; ALLOWING plaintiffs to file a reply letter brief, 7 days thereafter and not to exceed four pages; ORDERING that all discovery produced pursuant to this order shall be subject to a protective order. (Michel, G)
June 13, 2013 Filing 90 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/13/2013: In light of the parties' supplemental briefing #81 and #83 , the Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and to Strike #52 , #53 , #56 , #57 and #61 are hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 6/20/2013 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
June 12, 2013 Filing 89 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney: MOTION HEARING held on 6/12/2013: Court and counsel conferred re plaintiffs' #84 Motion to Compel. Arguments heard; motion taken under submission. Court to issue formal order. Plaintiffs Counsel Kathryn Mantoan present. Defendants Counsel John Whitefleet present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO. (Owen, K)
June 6, 2013 Filing 88 PROPOSED ORDER re Plaintiff's Motion to Compel re #84 AMENDED MOTION to COMPEL amending #80 MOTION to COMPEL Production Responsive to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production and First Set of Interrogatories to County of Sutter by Mary Prasad. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
June 5, 2013 Filing 87 DECLARATION of Kathryn G. Mantoan in SUPPORT OF #84 AMENDED MOTION to COMPEL amending #80 MOTION to COMPEL Production Responsive to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production and First Set of Interrogatories to County of Sutter . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-I, #2 Exhibit J-U)(Mantoan, Kathryn)
June 5, 2013 Filing 86 STATEMENT of Discovery Disagreement re: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Plaintiff Mary Prasad re #84 AMENDED MOTION to COMPEL amending #80 MOTION to COMPEL Production Responsive to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production and First Set of Interrogatories to County of Sutter . (Mantoan, Kathryn)
June 5, 2013 Filing 85 DECLARATION of John R. Whitefleet in OPPOSITION TO #84 AMENDED MOTION to COMPEL amending #80 MOTION to COMPEL Production Responsive to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production and First Set of Interrogatories to County of Sutter . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amerjit Bhatal in support of privlege)(Whitefleet, John)
May 22, 2013 Filing 84 AMENDED MOTION to COMPEL amending #80 MOTION to COMPEL Production Responsive to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production and First Set of Interrogatories to County of Sutter by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
May 17, 2013 Filing 83 RESPONSE by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad to 75 Minute Order. (Mantoan, Kathryn) Modified on 5/17/2013 (Krueger, M).
April 24, 2013 Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY) by CRD: Due to the Court's unavailability the #80 Motion to Compel currently set for 06/13/2013 at 11:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for 6/12/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Anderson, J)
April 23, 2013 Filing 81 Defendants' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING in Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 4/24/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 16, 2013 Filing 80 MOTION to COMPEL Production Responsive to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production and First Set of Interrogatories to County of Sutter by Mary Prasad. Attorney Rifkin, Lori added. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. (Rifkin, Lori)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/16/13. Added attorney Kathleen J. Williams for Melody Young, attorney John Robert Whitefleet terminated. (Meuleman, A)
April 12, 2013 Filing 78 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Melody Young. (Williams, Kathleen)
April 5, 2013 Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/5/2013: Pursuant to the Order of Reassignment to District Judge Troy L. Nunley #76 , the Hearing for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss #52 , #56 , #61 , and Motions to Strike #53 and #57 , currently set for 4/22/2013 before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. is VACATED and RESET for 6/20/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. All other dates will remain the same at this time. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: Due to the appointment of *District Judge Troy L. Nunley* to the bench of the Eastern District, this action is reassigned from District Judge *Garland E. Burrell, Jr.* for all further proceedings. (Waggoner, D)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER: Defendants Cummings, Garbett, Brown, Young, Weiss, and Bhangu's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' prayer for punitive damages concerning Plaintiffs' state law claims is pending. (ECF Nos. 61, 73.) Since the parties have not briefed certain issues, counsel shall be prepared to address the following questions during oral argument, which is reset for 9:00 a.m. on April 22, 2013. The hearing scheduled for April 8, 2013 is vacated. Further, each party is granted leave to respond to the following questions in writing in advance of the hearing by filing a response on the docket at counsel's earliest convenience. Please explain each response. For Plaintiffs: 1. In Guaranty Trust Co. of New York v. York, 326 U.S. 99, 109 (1945), the Supreme Court states that it is "immaterial whether [state] statutes... are characterized either as 'substantive' or 'procedural.'" Instead, when deciding whether a state statute applies in federal court, what matters is whether the statute "significantly affect[s] the result of a litigation." Id. Does 425.13 "significantly affect the result of a litigation?" 2.California Civil Procedure Code 425.13 states that a motion under 425.13 must be made within two years after filing suit or nine months before the matter is first set for trial, whichever is earlier. Since a federal court deciding state claims "applies the substantive law of the state, including the state's statute of limitations," Albano v. Shea Homes Ltd. P'ship, 634 F.3d 524, 530 (9th Cir. 2011), why is 425.13's limitations period inapplicable in federal court? 3. Erie's "twin aims" are "'discouragement of forum-shopping and avoidance of inequitable administration of the laws.'" Goldberg v. Pac. Indem. Co., 627 F.3d 752, 755 (9th Cir. 2010). Would it encourage forum shopping and inequitable administration of the laws to waive 425.13's requirements for plaintiffs litigating in federal, but not state, court? For Defendants Cummings, Garbett, Brown, Young, Weiss, and Bhangu: 1. In College Hospital, Inc. v. Superior Court, 8 Cal. 4th 704, 718, 717 (1994), the California Supreme Court states that 425.13 is a "procedural protection" that was not "intended to change the substantive elements of punitive damages claims." How does this pronouncement affect your argument that 425.13 is a substantive provision? 2. What state substantive law is 425.13 so "'intimately bound up'" with so that it is "an integral component of California's substantive state policy?" Feldman v. Allstate Ins. Co., 322 F.3d 660, 66667 (9th Cir. 2003). 3. During a 425.13 hearing, the court cannot "weigh the merits of the claim or consider its likely outcome at trial." Coll. Hosp., Inc., 8 Cal. 4th at 719. Does the limited scope of review under 425.13 make the statute less like a substantive provision and more like a procedural regulation of the "manner and the means by which a [plaintiff may] recover"? See York, 326 U.S. at 109. Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 04/03/13. (Dankof, E)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' Cummings, Garbett, Brown, Young, Weiss, and Bhangu's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' prayer for punitive damages concerning Plaintiffs' state law claims, currently scheduled for hearing on 2/25/13, is rescheduled for hearing on 4/8/13, at 9:00 a.m. Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/22/13. (Furstenau, S)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER: All Motions to Strike are submitted without oral argument. All Motions to Dismiss are submitted without oral argument, except for Defendants Cummings, Garbett, Brown, Young, Weiss, and Bhangus motion to dismiss Plaintiffs prayer for punitive damages concerning Plaintiffs state law claims, on which oral argument is scheduled to commence at 9:00 a.m. on 2/25/13. re #53 Motion to Strike, #52 Motion to Dismiss, #57 Motion to Strike, #56 Motion to Dismiss, #61 Motion to Dismiss Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/20/13. (Furstenau, S)
February 15, 2013 Filing 72 REPLY by Fremont-Rideout Health Group re #64 Opposition to Motion. (Zimmerman, Robert)
February 15, 2013 Filing 71 REPLY by Fremont-Rideout Health Group re #65 Opposition to Motion. (Zimmerman, Robert)
February 14, 2013 Filing 70 REPLY by Miguel Aguilar, Gurkirat Bhangu, Amerjit Bhattal, Norman Bidwell, Doris Brown, County of Sutter, Eric Crawford, Lou Anne Cummings, Rosa Diaz, Shane Dickson, Lester Eaton, Brent Garbett, J. Paul Parker, Baljinder Rai, David Samson, Christina Stohlman, Olga Tahara, Kimberly Weiss, Melody Young re #63 Opposition to Motion. (Whitefleet, John)
February 13, 2013 Filing 69 REPLY by Michael Fraters to RESPONSE to #53 MOTION to STRIKE Punitive Damages and Claims for Relief. (Kurlan, Jennifer)
February 13, 2013 Filing 68 REPLY by Michael Fraters to RESPONSE to #52 MOTION to DISMISS. (Kurlan, Jennifer)
February 11, 2013 Filing 67 OPPOSITION by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad to #53 MOTION to STRIKE Punitive Damages and Claims for Relief. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
February 11, 2013 Filing 66 OPPOSITION by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad to #52 MOTION to DISMISS. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
February 11, 2013 Filing 65 OPPOSITION by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad to #57 MOTION to STRIKE . (Mantoan, Kathryn)
February 11, 2013 Filing 64 OPPOSITION by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad to #56 MOTION to DISMISS. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
February 11, 2013 Filing 63 OPPOSITION by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad to #61 MOTION to DISMISS. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
December 28, 2012 Filing 62 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #56 MOTION to DISMISS, #57 MOTION to STRIKE : Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Zimmerman, Robert)
December 26, 2012 Filing 61 MOTION to DISMISS #50 Second Amended Complaint by Miguel Aguilar, Gurkirat Bhangu, Amerjit Bhattal, Norman Bidwell, Doris Brown, County of Sutter, Eric Crawford, Lou Anne Cummings, Rosa Diaz, Shane Dickson, Lester Eaton, Brent Garbett, J. Paul Parker, Baljinder Rai, David Samson, Christina Stohlman, Olga Tahara, Kimberly Weiss, Melody Young. Attorney Whitefleet, John Robert ADDED. Motion Hearing SET for 2/25/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion to Dismiss) (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 12/27/2012 (Michel, G).
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 12/21/2012 DENYING #18 , #19 , #21 , #22 , & #24 Motions. (Donati, J)
December 20, 2012 Filing 59 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE Motion Hearings re: #52 and #53 Motions by Jennifer C. Kurlan on behalf of Michael Fraters. Hearings rescheduled to 2/25/13 at 9:00 a.m. before District Judge Garland E. Burrell. (Kurlan, Jennifer) Modified on 12/21/2012 (Meuleman, A).
December 19, 2012 Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY) by CRD: The Court is in receipt of Defendants #52 Motion to Dismiss, #53 Motion to Strike, #56 Motion to Dismiss and #57 Motion to Strike. Upon the Courts own motion these matters are VACATED from calendar due to being improperly noticed before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. Please contact District Judge Garland E. Burrells Courtroom Deputy, Shani Furstenau, at (916) 930-4114 for the next available hearing date.(Anderson, J)
December 18, 2012 Filing 57 MOTION to STRIKE by Fremont-Rideout Health Group. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2013 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. (Zimmerman, Robert) Modified on 12/19/2012 (Meuleman, A).
December 18, 2012 Filing 56 MOTION to DISMISS by Fremont-Rideout Health Group. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2013 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. (Zimmerman, Robert) Modified on 12/19/2012 (Meuleman, A).
December 13, 2012 Filing 55 STIPULATION re Acceptance of Service of Second Amended Complaint, Waiver of Service of Summons, Extension of Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
December 13, 2012 Filing 54 NOTICE of hearing by Michael Fraters on Motion to Strike #53 and Motion to Dismiss #52 . Motion hearing SET for 2/7/12 in courtroom 26 Before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. (Kurlan, Jennifer) Modified on 12/14/2012 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 10, 2012 Filing 53 MOTION to STRIKE Punitive Damages and Claims for Relief by Michael Fraters. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2013 at 10:00 AM in 8th floor courtroom (JFM) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Kurlan, Jennifer)
December 10, 2012 Filing 52 MOTION to DISMISS by Michael Fraters. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2013 at 10:00 AM in 8th floor courtroom (JFM) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Kurlan, Jennifer) Modified on 12/12/2012 (Kastilahn, A).
November 28, 2012 Filing 51 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Miguel Aguilar, Gurkirat Bhangu, Eric Crawford, Rosa Diaz, Lester Eaton, Christina Stohlman, Olga Tahara, Kimberly Weiss* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ernest Galvan* *Rosen Bien Galvan & Grunfeld LLP* *315 Montgomery Street, Tenth Floor* *San Francisco, CA 94104-1823*. (Zignago, K.)
November 26, 2012 Filing 50 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Galvan, Ernest)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/26/12 ORDERING the Clerk to refer this case to another Magistrate Judge for any further proceedings which may be appropriate or required. This Case has been REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds for all further proceedings. The New Case Number is 2:12-cv-00592 GEB JFM. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 11/19/2012 GRANTING #43 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint; Plaintiffs have 10 days leave from the date on which this Order is filed to file the second amended complaint. (Reader, L)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge *Allison Claire* to the bench of the Eastern District, this action is reassigned from *Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows* for all further proceedings. (Waggoner, D)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER: The Motion to Amend, scheduled for hearing on 11/19/12, is submitted without oral argument. There will not be a hearing on 11/19/12, and no appearance is necessary. re #43 Motion to Amend the Complaint/Petition, Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/14/12. (Furstenau, S)
November 9, 2012 Filing 45 REPLY by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad re #43 MOTION to AMEND the #14 Amended Complaint. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
November 5, 2012 Filing 44 OPPOSITION to #43 Motion to Amend the #14 Amended Complaint by Amerjit Bhattal, Norman Bidwell, Doris Brown, County of Sutter, Lou Anne Cummings, Shane Dickson, Brent Garbett, J. Paul Parker, Baljinder Rai, David Samson, Melody Young. (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 11/6/2012 (Michel, G).
October 15, 2012 Filing 43 MOTION to AMEND the #14 Amended Complaint by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathryn G. Mantoan and Exhibit A (Proposed Second Amended Complaint), #2 Proposed Order)(Mantoan, Kathryn)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER: The Motions to Dismiss and Motions to Strike, scheduled for hearing on 8/27/12, are submitted without oral argument. There will not be a hearing on 8/27/12, and no appearance is necessary. re #21 Motion to Strike, #19 Motion to Strike, #22 Motion to Dismiss, #24 Motion to Dismiss, #18 Motion to Dismiss Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/24/12. (Furstenau, S)
August 20, 2012 Filing 41 REPLY by Amerjit Bhattal, Norman Bidwell, Doris Brown, County of Sutter, Lou Anne Cummings, Shane Dickson, Brent Garbett, J. Paul Parker, Baljinder Rai, David Samson, Melody Young re #31 Opposition to Motion. (Whitefleet, John)
August 20, 2012 Filing 40 REPLY by Fremont-Rideout Health Group re #22 MOTION to DISMISS. (Zimmerman, Robert)
August 20, 2012 Filing 39 REPLY by Fremont-Rideout Health Group re #21 MOTION to STRIKE. (Zimmerman, Robert)
August 20, 2012 Filing 38 REPLY by Michael Fraters to RESPONSE to #19 MOTION to STRIKE Punitive Damages and Claims for Relief. (Kurlan, Jennifer)
August 20, 2012 Filing 37 REPLY by Michael Fraters to RESPONSE to #18 MOTION to DISMISS. (Kurlan, Jennifer)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 8/14/12 ORDERING that the 8/20/12 status conference is vacated; Discovery due by 2/7/2014; Motions filed by 4/7/2014; Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2014 at 01:30 PM and Trial set for 9/9/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Matson, R)
August 13, 2012 Filing 35 OPPOSITION by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad to #19 MOTION to STRIKE Punitive Damages and Claims for Relief. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
August 13, 2012 Filing 34 OPPOSITION by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad to #18 MOTION to DISMISS. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
August 13, 2012 Filing 33 OPPOSITION by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad to #21 MOTION to STRIKE. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
August 13, 2012 Filing 32 OPPOSITION by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad to #22 MOTION to DISMISS. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
August 13, 2012 Filing 31 OPPOSITION by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad to #24 Motion to Dismiss. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
August 6, 2012 Filing 30 FURTHER JOINT STATUS REPORT by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad. (Mantoan, Kathryn) Modified on 8/7/2012 (Reader, L).
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/31/12: Mary Prasad is appointed guardian ad litem for the minor A.P. in this action. (Kaminski, H)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/31/12. Mary Prasad is appointed guardian ad litem for the minor T.P. in this action. (Kaminski, H)
July 30, 2012 Filing 27 MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM for Minor T.P. by Mary Prasad. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mantoan, Kathryn) Modified on 7/31/2012 (Benson, A.).
July 30, 2012 Filing 26 MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM for Minor A.P. by Mary Prasad. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mantoan, Kathryn) Modified on 7/31/2012 (Benson, A.).
June 19, 2012 Filing 25 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Michael Fraters. (Kurlan, Jennifer)
June 15, 2012 Filing 24 MOTION to DISMISS by Amerjit Bhattal, Norman Bidwell, Doris Brown, County of Sutter, Lou Anne Cummings, Shane Dickson, Brent Garbett, J. Paul Parker, Baljinder Rai, David Samson, Melody Young. Motion Hearing set for 08/27/12 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(Whitefleet, John)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/5/12 ORDERING the Joint Status Report filed 5/25/12, reveals this case is not ready to be scheduled. Therefore, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for hearing on 6/11/12, continued to 8/20/12, at 9:00 a.m. A further joint status report shall be filed no later than fourteen (14) days prior to the Status Conference; Plaintiffs are notified that failure to serve Defendants LouAnne Cummings, Amerjit Bhattal, and Brent Garbett with process within the 120 day period may result in the unserved defendants being dismissed. To avoid dismissal, on or before 9/10/12, Plaintiffs shall file proof of service for these defendants or a sufficient explanation why service was not effected within Rule 4(m)'s prescribed service period. Lastly, no later than 8/6/12, counsel or the minor plaintiffs shall "present (1) appropriate evidence of the appointment of a representative for the minor... under state law[,] or (2) [file] a motion for the appointment of a guardian ad litem by the Court in accordance with Local Rule 202(a).(Becknal, R)
June 4, 2012 Filing 22 MOTION to DISMISS by Fremont-Rideout Health Group. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Zimmerman, Robert)
June 4, 2012 Filing 21 MOTION to STRIKE by Fremont-Rideout Health Group. Attorney Zimmerman, Robert Harry added. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Zimmerman, Robert) Modified on 6/5/2012 (Kastilahn, A).
June 4, 2012 Filing 20 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to #14 Amended Complaint by Amerjit Bhattal, Norman Bidwell, Doris Brown, County of Sutter, Lou Anne Cummings, Shane Dickson, Brent Garbett, J. Paul Parker, Baljinder Rai, David Samson, Melody Young. Attorney Whitefleet, John Robert added. (Whitefleet, John) Modified on 6/7/2012 (Kastilahn, A).
May 31, 2012 Filing 19 MOTION to STRIKE Punitive Damages and Claims for Relief by Michael Fraters. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Kurlan, Jennifer)
May 31, 2012 Filing 18 MOTION to DISMISS by Michael Fraters. Attorney Kurlan, Jennifer C. added. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Kurlan, Jennifer)
May 25, 2012 Filing 17 JOINT STATUS REPORT by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
May 18, 2012 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad re #14 Amended Complaint. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
May 10, 2012 Filing 15 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Amerjit Bhattal, Lou Anne Cummings, Brent Garbett* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ernest Galvan* *315 Montgomery St., 10th Floor* *San Francisco, CA 94104-1823*. (Meuleman, A)
May 9, 2012 Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad. Attorney Galvan, Ernest added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Galvan, Ernest)
May 3, 2012 Filing 13 STIPULATION to extend time to respond to the Complaint by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad. (Mantoan, Kathryn) Modified on 5/7/2012 (Reader, L).
April 27, 2012 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Michael Fraters served on 4/23/2012, answer due 5/14/2012. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
April 18, 2012 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Fremont-Rideout Health Group served on 4/12/2012, answer due 5/3/2012. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
April 17, 2012 Filing 10 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: (Whitefleet, John)
April 16, 2012 Filing 9 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: (Whitefleet, John)
April 5, 2012 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad. Attorney Mantoan, Kathryn Grzenczyk added. (Mantoan, Kathryn)
March 14, 2012 Filing 7 AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP Form) (Donati, J)
March 12, 2012 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/12/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP Form) (Donati, J)
March 12, 2012 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Norman Bidwell, Doris Brown, County of Sutter, Shane Dickson, Michael Fraters, Fremont-Rideout Health Group, J. Paul Parker, Baljinder Rai, David Samson, Melody Young* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Aaron Joseph Fischer* *Rosen, Bien & Galvan, LLP* *315 Montgomery Street, 10th Floor* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Donati, J)
March 7, 2012 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/9/2012 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Michel, G)
March 7, 2012 RECEIPT number #CAE200042760 $350.00 fbo Nathan Prasad, et. al. by Aaron J. Fischer on 3/7/2012. (Michel, G)
March 6, 2012 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad (Fischer, Aaron)
March 6, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants by A. P., T. P., Mary Prasad. Attorney Fischer, Aaron Joseph ADDED. (Fischer, Aaron) Modified on 3/7/2012 (Michel, G).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prasad et al v. County of Sutter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Prasad
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Fischer
Represented By: Ernest Galvan
Represented By: Jennifer L. Stark
Represented By: Kathryn Grzenczyk Mantoan
Represented By: Lori Rifkin
Represented By: Michael Bien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. P.
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Fischer
Represented By: Ernest Galvan
Represented By: Jennifer L. Stark
Represented By: Kathryn Grzenczyk Mantoan
Represented By: Michael Bien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. P.
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Fischer
Represented By: Ernest Galvan
Represented By: Jennifer L. Stark
Represented By: Kathryn Grzenczyk Mantoan
Represented By: Michael Bien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. S.
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Fischer
Represented By: Ernest Galvan
Represented By: Jennifer L. Stark
Represented By: Kathryn Grzenczyk Mantoan
Represented By: Michael Bien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sutter
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Paul Parker
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Samson
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Bidwell
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doris Brown
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melody Young
Represented By: Kathleen J. Williams
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baljinder Rai
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Dickson
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fremont-Rideout Health Group
Represented By: Robert Harry Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fraters
Represented By: Jennifer C. Kurlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lou Anne Cummings
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerjit Bhattal
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Garbett
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Weiss
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurkirat Bhangu
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Stohlman
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester Eaton
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Aguilar
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olga Tahara
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Diaz
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Crawford
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?