Cooper v. Heatley et al
Plaintiff: Goldyn Cooper
Defendant: Scott Heatley, H. Walter Pepper and Terru Weinholdt
Case Number: 2:2012cv00602
Filed: March 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/11/2016 RECOMMENDING that defendants' 65 motion for summary judgment be granted. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/11/2015 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 60 are ADOPTED in FULL; Defendants' 50 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice to its re-filing in compliance with the new 4/15/2015 deadline for the filing of pretrial motions; this matter is REFERRED back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. (Reader, L)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/06/15 ORDERING defendants' motion for an order compelling plaintiff to participate in a video deposition is granted. Defendants shall re-notice plaintiff' s deposition so that it takes place no later than 02/28/15. Defendant' motion for discovery sanctions 43 is otherwise denied. The court's 08/21/13 discovery and scheduling order, as modified by subsequent order, is hereby amended as fol lows: The 04/25/14 deadline for discovery and to file any motions to compel discovery is vacated, and reset for 03/15/15, solely for the purposes of allowing defendants to take plaintiff's deposition. Neither party is granted leave to propound additional discovery requests. The 06/17/14 deadline to file pretrial motions (except motions to compel) is vacated and reset for 04/15/15. Defendants' motion to compel discovery responses 42 is denied. Plaintiff's motion for monetary sanctions 46 is denied. Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time in which to conduct discovery 52 is denied. Plaintiff's motion to compel discovery responses 53 is denied. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel 54 i s denied. Within 14 days of filing of this order, counsel for defendants shall file a status report informing the court whether plaintiff currently has access to his legal materials, and if not, what arrangements have been made to allow plaintiff ad equate access so that he can prepare for his deposition and file an opposition to any forthcoming motion for summary judgment. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion for summary judgment 50 be denied without prejudice to its re-filing in compliance with the new 04/15/15 deadline for the filing of pretrial motions. Motion for Summary Judgment 50 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days.(Plummer, M)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/29/14 ORDERING that within 21 days after the filing date of this order, plaintiff shall file and serve an opposition, or statement of no opposition, to the pending motion to dismiss.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/21/14 DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 37 Motion to Dismiss, to the filing of a motion for summary judgment in accordance with the decision in Albino within 30 days; and Plaintiff's opposition, whi ch may incorporate his previously filed opposition, shall be filed within 21 days after the date of service of the motion on plaintiff; defendants' reply, which may incorporate by reference his previously filed reply on his motion to dismiss, shall be filed 7 days thereafter. (Meuleman, A)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/15/14 AFFIRMING the 2/25/14 order of the magistrate judge. (Manzer, C)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/25/2014 DENYING plaintiff's 35 ex parte motion for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/10/14 ORDERING that The Findings and Recommendations filed 11/6/13, 32 are ADOPTED in full; Defendant H. Walter Pepper's unopposed 8/15/13, MOTION to DISMISS 22 is GRANTED; Defendant H. Walter Pepper is DISMISSED from this action; and This action shall proceed as to defendants Scott Heatley and Terry Weinholdt only. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/6/13 RECOMMENDING that Defendant H. Walter Pepper's 22 motion to dismiss be granted; Defendant H. Walter Pepper be dismissed from this action; and this action shall proceed against defendants Scott Heatley and Terry Weinholdt only. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/23/2013 ORDERING that, within 30 days, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any he has, to the 22 motion to dismiss or a statement of non-opposition. (Yin, K)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/26/2013 GRANTING defendants' 25 , 26 requests to modify the court's Discovery and Scheduling Order; the 8/21/2013 Discovery and Scheduling Order is modified as to (a) the discovery and any motions to compel discovery deadline is VACATED and RESET for 4/25/2014; (b) the pretrial motions deadline is VACATED and RESET for 6/17/2014; and (c) all other requirements and orders in the Discovery and Scheduling Order shall remain in effect. (Yin, K)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/20/2013 VACATING 8 findings and recommendations filed on 1/29/13; the Clerk shall provide plaintiff with 3 USM-285 Forms to be completed and returned within 30 days, along with the Notice of Submission. (Yin, K)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/28/13 ORDERING that this case be randomly assigned to a District Judge. It is RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/19/12 ORDERING the director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Goldyn Cooper to the clerk until the balance of $350 is pai d in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Director of the CDC. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial, CDC Prisoner Payment Orders ) (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Heatley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goldyn Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Heatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Walter Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terru Weinholdt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?