Jones v. Scottland et al
Plaintiff: Leslie James Jones
Defendant: A Z Scottland, T Wable, P. R. Chambers, M Ruiz, S. Ringler, T Doane, K McMaster, R M Blackwell, S. Cervantes, R W Fox, R W Cappel and B Clark
Case Number: 2:2012cv00633
Filed: March 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/20/17 ORDERING Defendants' evidentiary objections and motion to strike plaintiff's opposition 59 is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants' ; objections and motion to strike plaintiff's unauthorized surreply 61 is denied. Plaintiff's motion for clarification 62 is denied. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion for summary judgment 48 be granted; and summary judgment be granted on behalf of all defendants. MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 48 referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/21/2016 ORDERING, within 30 days, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to the motion for summary judgment. (Yin, K)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MODIFIED DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/7/2016: Discovery is extended to 4/29/2016; Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before 6/29/2016; and Pretrial conference and trial dates will be set, as appropriate. 38 Motion to modify the scheduling order terminated. (Yin, K)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/18/15 ORDERING that 27 the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS are adopted in full. Defendant CDCR's 21 Motion to Dismiss is granted. Defendant California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DISMISSED with prejudice. (Kastilahn, A)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/2/2015 RECOMMENDING that defendant CDCR's 21 motion to dismiss be granted; and that the dismissal of CDCR as a defendant in this action be with prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/15/2014 ORDERING that within 14 days, Deputy Attorney General Preeti Bajwa shall advise the court as to whether defendant CDCR will join in the answer that was filed 5/9/14, or whether defendant will request an extension of time to file a late answer.(Yin, K)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/3/2014 DIRECTING the Clerk to provide plaintiff with the ifp application by a non-prisoner; within 21 days, plaintiff shall file the ifp application or advise the court that he intends to use other means of serving process on defendants; and plaintiff's failure to comply will result in a recommendations that this action be dismissed without prejudice.(Yin, K)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/08/13 ordering plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint. The clerk of the court shall provide plaintiff with a copy of the court's form complaint for a 1983 action. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Scottland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie James Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Z Scottland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Wable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. R. Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Ringler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Doane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K McMaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R M Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Cervantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R W Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R W Cappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?