McCaffery et al v. Alternative Learning Center et al
Plaintiff: Beverly McCaffery
Defendant: Alternative Learning Center, Adult Educational Technologies, Inc., Alice Soard and Wendell James
Petitioner: Hirst Law Group, P.C.
Intervenor Plaintiff: United States of America and State of California
Case Number: 2:2012cv01156
Filed: April 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/16/2022: In light of the Satisfaction of Judgment, ECF No. #82 , the Motion to Appoint Receiver, ECF No. #70 , is DENIED as MOOT. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
August 16, 2022 Filing 82 SATISFACTION of JUDGMENT re #61 Judgment by Hirst Law Group, P.C.. (Serlin, Mark)
February 3, 2022 Filing 81 SATISFACTION of JUDGMENT as to Partial Satisfaction by Hirst Law Group, P.C.. (Serlin, Mark)
July 15, 2021 Filing 80 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Alternative Learning Center, Alice Soard : #76 Declaration of Alice Soard. (Goins, Vernon) Modified on 7/15/2021 (Reader, L).
July 15, 2021 Filing 79 AMENDED MEMORANDUM of Cost after Judgment by Hirst Law Group, P.C. re #78 Memorandum. (Serlin, Mark) Modified on 7/15/2021 (Reader, L).
July 15, 2021 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM of Cost after Judgment by Hirst Law Group, P.C. (Serlin, Mark) Modified on 7/15/2021 (Reader, L).
July 14, 2021 Filing 77 AMENDED BRIEF #75 Supporting Motion for Appointment of Receiver filed by Hirst Law Group, P.C. (Serlin, Mark) Modified on 7/14/2021 (Reader, L).
July 13, 2021 Filing 76 DECLARATION (Not Signed) of Alice Soard in opposition to #70 Motion to Appoint Receiver,. (Goins, Vernon) Modified on 7/13/2021 (Reader, L).
July 9, 2021 Filing 75 REPLY BRIEF to #70 Motion for appointment of receiver to enforce judgment filed by Hirst Law Group, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Serlin, Mark) Modified on 7/9/2021 (Reader, L).
July 7, 2021 Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/7/2021: On the court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the Motion for Appointment of Receiver to Enforce Judgment Pursuant to Written Agreement, ECF No. #70 , is SUBMITTED without oral argument. The motion is submitted on the briefs, including the reply brief, if any, as provided by Local Rule 230(d). Accordingly, the hearing date of 7/16/2021 is VACATED. If the court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
July 6, 2021 Filing 73 OPPOSITION by Alternative Learning Center, Alice Soard to #70 Motion to Appoint Receiver,. (Goins, Vernon)
July 6, 2021 Filing 72 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Vernon C. Goins, II on behalf of Alternative Learning Center, Alice Soard. Attorney Goins, Vernon C. added. (Goins, Vernon)
July 6, 2021 Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/6/2021: On the court's own motion, the hearing as to the Motion for Appointment of Reciver, ECF No. #70 , set for 7/16/2021 is ADVANCED on the same date to 10:00 AM before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
June 16, 2021 Filing 70 MOTION to APPOINT RECEIVER to Enforce Judgment Pursuant to Written Agreement by Hirst Law Group, P.C. Motion Hearing SET for 7/16/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Hearing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #4 Declaration of Mark A. Serlin, #5 Proof of Service )(Serlin, Mark) Modified on 6/17/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
October 20, 2020 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM of Costs After Judgment by Hirst Law Group, P.C. Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest. (Serlin, Mark)
March 31, 2020 Filing 68 WRIT of execution ISSUED. (Kaminski, H)
March 31, 2020 Filing 67 ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. (Kaminski, H)
March 31, 2020 Filing 66 APPLICATION for WRIT of EXECUTION by Hirst Law Group, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Serlin, Mark)
March 31, 2020 Filing 65 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT by Hirst Law Group, P.C. re #61 Judgment. (Serlin, Mark)
March 30, 2020 Filing 64 [DISREGARD atty to re-file] APPLICATION for WRIT of EXECUTION by Hirst Law Group, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 memorandum of costs after judgment)(Serlin, Mark) Modified on 3/31/2020 (Kaminski, H).
March 30, 2020 Filing 63 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT by Hirst Law Group, P.C. re #61 Judgment. (Serlin, Mark)
March 30, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Mark A. Serlin. (Serlin, Mark)
March 25, 2020 Filing 61 JUDGMENT dated *3/25/2020* pursuant to order signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/24/2020. (Zignago, K.)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/24/2020 GRANTING #58 Motion to Enter Judgment Pursuant to the Settlement Agreement. Judgment SHALL be entered for plaintiff in the amount of $114,728.65 as the accelerated amount presently due under the Settlement Agreement, plus $31.43 per diem interest for every day from 11/1/2019 to the date this judgment is entered on the court's docket, and an additional $1,317.50 for attorneys' fees associated with the instant motion. (Zignago, K.)
December 13, 2019 Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the Motion for Entry of Judgment (ECF No. #58 ) is SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing date of 12/20/2019 is VACATED. If the court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
November 19, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for JUDGMENT by Hirst Law Group, P.C. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Proposed Judgment, #7 Proof of Service)(Serlin, Mark) Modified on 11/20/2019 (Coll, A).
November 1, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Mark A. Serlin on behalf of Hirst Law Group, P.C. Attorney Serlin, Mark A. added. (Serlin, Mark)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/2/17 ORDERING that Government Parties' request to seal is DENIED; This order and all future filings are UNSEALED, but all other contents of the court's file in this action remain under TEMPORARY SEAL pending further order of this court following review of any redaction request filed as provided below; Within seven (7) days of the filed date of this order, any party may SHOW CAUSE, under Local Rules 140 and 141, why any document currently remaining under seal should be redacted. (Becknal, R)
April 12, 2017 Filing 55 RESPONSE to ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by United States of America. (Kennedy, Colleen)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/11/2017 ORDERING that the #1 complaint, the Government Entities' #46 notice, this order, and all future filings are UNSEALED, but all other contents of the court's file in this action remain under TEMPORARY SEAL pending further order of this court. Within fourteen days, any party may SHOW CAUSE why the previous filings in this action should remain under seal. Relator shall serve the complaint on the defendants. (Zignago, K.)
October 18, 2016 Filing 46 NOTICE of ELECTIONS to INTERVENE by State of California and United States of America against all defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donati, J)
April 30, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Beverly McCaffery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCaffery et al v. Alternative Learning Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly McCaffery
Represented By: Michael Andrew Hirst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Colleen M. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: David B. Zlotnick
Represented By: Steven Ulric Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alternative Learning Center
Represented By: Vernon C. Goins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adult Educational Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice Soard
Represented By: Vernon C. Goins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendell James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hirst Law Group, P.C.
Represented By: Mark A. Serlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?