Barroga v. Board of Administration Cal Public Employees' Retirement System
Plaintiff: Lucio A. Barroga
Defendant: Board of Administration Cal Public Employees' Retirement System
Case Number: 2:2012cv01179
Filed: May 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/26/17. DENYING 52 Motion for New Judgment; this matter will remain closed. Any future motions filed in this court, related to this matter will be summarily dismissed. (Benson, A.)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/19/12 ORDERING Plaintiff's Motion to Judgment on the Pleadings 37 must be re-noticed before Judge Newman. Any notice of a hearing before Judge England is procedurally imp roper and will be vacated. By the same token, the hearing noticed by Plaintiff for December 27, 2012, 43 is VACATED. There will be no hearing on that date. Should Plaintiff wish to have his Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings heard, he must properly notice the motion before the Magistrate Judge assigned to the case, pursuant to the Eastern District of California's Local Rules as set forth above. (Matson, R)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/25/12 RECOMMENDING that the 21 Motion to Dismiss be granted in part and this case be dismissed, the 28 Motion for Judgment be denied as moot and the 29 "Request for Observance" be denied. Motions referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Manzer, C)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S RECENT FILINGS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/17/2012. (Zignago, K.)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/13/12 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION FOR DEFAULT 11 is DENIED without prejudice. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/3/2012 ORDERING 8 that Plaintiff's motion for entry of a default judgment by the Clerk of Court pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(b)(1) is DENIED; the Clerk of Court is directed to vacate # 7 the Clerk's Certificate of Entry of Default. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barroga v. Board of Administration Cal Public Employees' Retirement System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucio A. Barroga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Administration Cal Public Employees' Retirement System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?