Brazill v. California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bradley Brazill
Defendant: California Northstate University, LLC and California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv01218
Filed: May 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 621
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR DISMISSAL signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/11/2015 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 160, with each side to bear his/its own costs and attorneys fees. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
May 11, 2015 Filing 131 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for DISMISSAL by Bradley Brazill. (Griffin, Johnny) Modified on 5/12/2015 (Manzer, C).
April 15, 2015 Filing 130 MINUTES for proceedings before Senior Judge William B. Shubb: JURY TRIAL (Day 2) completed on 4/15/2015. Counsel inform the Court that a settlement has been reached, and state the terms on the record. Court shall retain jurisdiction until the final stipulation of dismissal and payment of settlement have been completed. The parties shall execute the settlement agreement by 4/17/2015. Jury excused from this action. Plaintiffs Counsel Johnny Griffin, III, Manolo Olaso present. Defendants Counsel William Munoz, Heather Barnes present. Court Reporter: Cathie Bodene. (Kirksey Smith, K)
April 14, 2015 Filing 129 MINUTES for proceedings before Senior Judge William B. Shubb: JURY TRIAL (Day 1) held on 4/14/2015: Jury impaneled and sworn. Plaintiff and Defendant make opening statements. Witness is called and sworn to testify. Exhibits are identified and admitted into evidence. Court confers with counsel re motions in limine and states findings as noted on the record. Court DENIES in part Defendant's Motion in Limine #2 (docket #74) to exclude the "Separation Agreement and General Release." The ruling on remaining motions in limine shall be held in abeyance pending the introduction of evidence at time of trial (dockets #61 through #73). Jury Trial continued to 4/15/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (See document for further details.) Plaintiff's Counsel Johnny Griffin, III, Manolo Olaso present. Defendant's Counsel William Munoz, Heather Barnes present. Court Reporter: Cathie Bodene. (Kirksey Smith, K)
April 13, 2015 Filing 128 AMENDED [PROPOSED] JURY INSTRUCTIONS by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC.(Munoz, William) Modified on 4/14/2015 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 10, 2015 Filing 127 TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC.(Ng, Brittany) Modified on 4/13/2015 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 13, 2015 Filing 126 STATEMENT of PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by Defendant California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. (Ng, Brittany)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/30/2014 CONTINUING the Jury Trial to 4/14/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Michel, G)
July 29, 2014 Filing 124 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to continue the trial by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. (Munoz, William) Modified on 7/29/2014 (Becknal, R).
June 9, 2014 Filing 123 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge William B. Shubb: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/9/2014. Court confers with counsel re case status, motions in limine and trial briefs. Counsel inform the Court that the case did not settle. Court and counsel estimate trial to be seven (7) days. Court resets the Jury Trial date for 8/12/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Plaintiffs Counsel Manolo Olaso present. Defendants Counsel William Munoz present. Court Reporter: Cathie Bodene. (Kirksey Smith, K)
June 5, 2014 Filing 122 JOINT STATUS REPORT by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. (Ng, Brittany)
June 4, 2014 Filing 121 MINUTES for SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/4/2014: After settlement negotiations conducted, not settlement was reached. (Text Only) (Caspar, M)
May 30, 2014 Filing 120 MINUTE ORDER by Courtroom Deputy M. Caspar for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/30/2014: ORDERING that pursuant to the request of defense counsel, Kyle Dunton, defendant California Northstate College of Pharmacy's representative from insurance carrier RSUI Indemnity Company, is permitted to appear telephonically for the 6/4/2014 settlement conference. (TEXT ONLY) (Caspar, M)
May 28, 2014 Filing 119 NOTICE of Lodging of Second Supplemental Confidential Settlement Conference Statement by Bradley Brazill. (Olaso, Manolo)
May 28, 2014 Filing 118 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DEFENDANT'S CONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENTAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. (Ng, Brittany)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATION and ORDER #116 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/11/2014 resetting the Status Conference for 6/9/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report regarding the status of the settlement conference no later than 3:00 p.m. on 6/6/2014. (Kirksey Smith, K)
April 11, 2014 Filing 116 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for continuance of status conference by Bradley Brazill. (Olaso, Manolo)
April 10, 2014 Filing 115 MINUTE ORDER by Courtroom Deputy M. Caspar for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/10/2014: Pursuant to the parties request, Further Settlement Conference proceedings currently set for 4/11/2014 has been CONTINUED to 6/4/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Supplemental settlement conference statements are due seven days prior to the settlement conference date. (TEXT ONLY) (Caspar, M)
April 1, 2014 Filing 114 MINUTE ORDER by Courtroom Deputy M. Caspar for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/1/2014: Pursuant to defense counsel's request, defendant's insurance carrier's representative is permitted to appear by telephone for the 4/11/2014 settlement conference. (TEXT ONLY)(Caspar, M)
February 20, 2014 Filing 113 MINUTES for SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/20/2014: After settlement negotiations held, the case did not settle.Further Settlement Conference set for 4/11/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Plaintiffs Counsel Johnny Griffin, Monolo Oso, Jerry Glazer present. Defendants Counsel Bill Munoz, Brittany Ng present. (Text Only) (Caspar, M)
February 18, 2014 Filing 112 NOTICE OF LODGING by Bradley Brazill: First Supplemental Confidential Settlement Conference Statement. (Olaso, Manolo) Modified on 2/19/2014 (Reader, L).
February 18, 2014 Filing 111 MINUTE ORDER by Courtroom Deputy M. Caspar for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/18/2014: Informing the parties that Further Settlement Conference is scheduled for 2/20/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (TEXT ONLY)(Caspar, M)
February 18, 2014 Filing 110 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge William B. Shubb: STATUS CONFERENCE Re Trial Date held on 2/18/2014. Court confers with counsel re trial date and a possible further settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Newman. The Court ORDERS the Jury Trial date of 2/19/2014 VACATED, and sets a Further Status Conference for 4/14/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Court further ORDERS the parties to contact Magistrate Judge Newman's chambers at the conclusion of today's proceedings in order to schedule a further settlement conference. Plaintiffs Counsel Johnny Griffin, III, Manolo Olaso present. Defendants Counsel William Nunoz, Brittany Ng present. Court Reporter: Kimberly Bennett. cc: USMJ Newman. (Kirksey Smith, K)
February 14, 2014 Filing 109 OBJECTIONS to Trial Exhibits by Plaintiff Bradley Brazill. (Olaso, Manolo) Modified on 2/18/2014 (Reader, L).
February 14, 2014 Filing 108 WITNESS LIST by Bradley Brazill.(Olaso, Manolo)
February 14, 2014 Filing 107 EXHIBIT LIST by Bradley Brazill.(Olaso, Manolo)
February 14, 2014 Filing 106 OBJECTIONS to Trial Exhibits by Defendant California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. (Munoz, William) Modified on 2/18/2014 (Reader, L).
February 13, 2014 Filing 105 MINUTE ORDER(TEXT ONLY) issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 02/13/2014: On the Court's own motion, the parties are hereby notified that the Court has set a Status Conference regarding this matter for 2/18/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb.(Streeter, J)
February 12, 2014 Filing 104 OPPOSITION by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC to #61 MOTION IN LIMINE #7. (Munoz, William) Modified on 2/13/2014 (Meuleman, A).
February 12, 2014 Filing 103 OPPOSITION by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC to #61 MOTION IN LIMINE #s 4 and 5. (Ng, Brittany) Modified on 2/13/2014 (Meuleman, A).
February 12, 2014 Filing 102 OPPOSITION by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC to #61 MOTION IN LIMINE #9. (Ng, Brittany) Modified on 2/13/2014 (Meuleman, A).
February 12, 2014 Filing 101 OPPOSITION by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC to #61 MOTION IN LIMINE #6. (Ng, Brittany) Modified on 2/13/2014 (Meuleman, A).
February 12, 2014 Filing 100 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Bradley Brazill to #77 Proposed Verdict. (Olaso, Manolo)
February 12, 2014 Filing 99 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Bradley Brazill to #78 Proposed Jury Instructions. (Olaso, Manolo)
February 12, 2014 Filing 98 RESPONSE by Bradley Brazill to #71 MOTION IN LIMINE Motion in Limine No. 14. (Olaso, Manolo)
February 12, 2014 Filing 97 RESPONSE by Bradley Brazill to #70 MOTION IN LIMINE Motion in Limine No. 13. (Olaso, Manolo)
February 12, 2014 Filing 96 RESPONSE by Bradley Brazill to #69 MOTION IN LIMINE Motion in Limine No. 12. (Olaso, Manolo)
February 12, 2014 Filing 95 RESPONSE by Bradley Brazill to #73 MOTION IN LIMINE No. 10 to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Peter Samuel. (Olaso, Manolo)
February 12, 2014 Filing 94 RESPONSE by Bradley Brazill to #72 MOTION IN LIMINE No. 9 to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Tosha Cherry. (Olaso, Manolo)
February 12, 2014 Filing 93 RESPONSE by Bradley Brazill to #68 MOTION IN LIMINE Motion in Limine No. 8. (Olaso, Manolo)
February 12, 2014 Filing 92 RESPONSE by Bradley Brazill to #67 MOTION IN LIMINE Motion in Limine No. 7. (Olaso, Manolo)
February 12, 2014 Filing 91 RESPONSE by Bradley Brazill to #66 MOTION IN LIMINE Motion in Limine No. 6. (Olaso, Manolo)
February 12, 2014 Filing 90 RESPONSE by Bradley Brazill to #65 MOTION IN LIMINE Motion in Limine No. 5. (Olaso, Manolo)
February 12, 2014 Filing 89 RESPONSE by Bradley Brazill to #64 MOTION IN LIMINE Motion in Limine No. 4. (Olaso, Manolo)
February 12, 2014 Filing 88 RESPONSE by Bradley Brazill to #63 MOTION IN LIMINE Motion in Limine No. 3. (Olaso, Manolo)
February 12, 2014 Filing 87 RESPONSE by Bradley Brazill to #74 MOTION IN LIMINE No. 2 To Exclude Confidential Settlement Communications Pursuant to Fed.R.Evid 408 and Cal. Evid. Code 1152. (Olaso, Manolo)
February 12, 2014 Filing 86 RESPONSE by Bradley Brazill to #62 MOTION IN LIMINE Motion in Limine No. 1. (Olaso, Manolo)
February 12, 2014 Filing 85 OPPOSITION by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC to #61 MOTION IN LIMINE #8. (Ng, Brittany) Modified on 2/13/2014 (Meuleman, A).
February 12, 2014 Filing 84 OBJECTIONS by Defendant California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC to #79 Objections. (Ng, Brittany)
February 12, 2014 Filing 83 OPPOSITION by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC to #61 MOTION IN LIMINE #3. (Ng, Brittany) Modified on 2/13/2014 (Meuleman, A).
February 12, 2014 Filing 82 OPPOSITION by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC to #61 MOTION IN LIMINE #2. (Ng, Brittany) Modified on 2/13/2014 (Meuleman, A).
February 12, 2014 Filing 81 OPPOSITION by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC to #61 MOTION IN LIMINE . (Ng, Brittany)
February 10, 2014 Filing 80 OBJECTIONS by Defendant California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC to #53 Statement. (Ng, Brittany)
February 9, 2014 Filing 79 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Bradley Brazill to #54 Statement. (Olaso, Manolo)
February 7, 2014 Filing 78 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC.(Munoz, William)
February 7, 2014 Filing 77 PROPOSED VERDICT submitted by Defendant California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC.(Munoz, William)
February 7, 2014 Filing 76 OBJECTIONS by Defendant California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC to #57 Proposed Jury Instructions, #56 Proposed Verdict. (Munoz, William)
February 5, 2014 Filing 75 PROPOSED VOIR DIRE by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC.(Munoz, William)
February 5, 2014 Filing 74 MOTION IN LIMINE No. 2 To Exclude Confidential Settlement Communications Pursuant to Fed.R.Evid 408 and Cal. Evid. Code 1152 by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Munoz, William)
February 5, 2014 Filing 73 MOTION IN LIMINE No. 10 to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Peter Samuel by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Munoz, William)
February 5, 2014 Filing 72 MOTION IN LIMINE No. 9 to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Tosha Cherry by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Munoz, William)
February 5, 2014 Filing 71 MOTION IN LIMINE Motion in Limine No. 14 by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Ng, Brittany)
February 5, 2014 Filing 70 MOTION IN LIMINE Motion in Limine No. 13 by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Ng, Brittany)
February 5, 2014 Filing 69 MOTION IN LIMINE Motion in Limine No. 12 by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Ng, Brittany)
February 5, 2014 Filing 68 MOTION IN LIMINE Motion in Limine No. 8 by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Ng, Brittany)
February 5, 2014 Filing 67 MOTION IN LIMINE Motion in Limine No. 7 by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Ng, Brittany)
February 5, 2014 Filing 66 MOTION IN LIMINE Motion in Limine No. 6 by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Ng, Brittany)
February 5, 2014 Filing 65 MOTION IN LIMINE Motion in Limine No. 5 by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Ng, Brittany)
February 5, 2014 Filing 64 MOTION IN LIMINE Motion in Limine No. 4 by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Ng, Brittany)
February 5, 2014 Filing 63 MOTION IN LIMINE Motion in Limine No. 3 by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Ng, Brittany)
February 5, 2014 Filing 62 MOTION IN LIMINE Motion in Limine No. 1 by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. (Ng, Brittany)
February 5, 2014 Filing 61 MOTION IN LIMINE #s 1 through 9 by Bradley Brazill. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2014 at 09:00 AM before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Olaso, Manolo) Modified on 2/13/2014 (Meuleman, A).
February 5, 2014 Filing 60 PROPOSED VOIR DIRE by Bradley Brazill.(Olaso, Manolo)
February 5, 2014 Filing 59 TRIAL BRIEF by Bradley Brazill.(Olaso, Manolo)
February 5, 2014 Filing 58 TRIAL BRIEF by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC.(Munoz, William)
February 5, 2014 Filing 57 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Bradley Brazill.(Olaso, Manolo)
February 4, 2014 Filing 56 PROPOSED VERDICT submitted by Plaintiff Bradley Brazill.(Olaso, Manolo)
February 4, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE of Lodging of Proposed Jury Instructions by Bradley Brazill. (Olaso, Manolo)
February 4, 2014 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of Proposed Jury Instructions pursuant to #43 Final Pretrial Order from Bradley Brazill. Routed to WBS Chambers. (Michel, G)
January 30, 2014 Filing 54 STATEMENT of Designation of Deposition Excerpts and Other Discovery to Be Used at Trial by Defendant California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. (Munoz, William)
January 30, 2014 Filing 53 STATEMENT of Designation by Plaintiff Bradley Brazill. (Olaso, Manolo)
January 17, 2014 Filing 52 California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC'S PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES. (Ng, Brittany) Modified on 1/22/2014 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/3/2014 VACATING the Jury Trial set for 2/4/2014; RESETTING the Jury Trial for 2/19/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Michel, G)
December 23, 2013 Filing 50 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuing Trial by Bradley Brazill. (Olaso, Manolo)
December 3, 2013 Filing 49 MINUTES for SETTLEMENT CONFERENC Eproceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/3/2013: After settlement negotiations held, no settlement was reached. Plaintiffs Counsel Johnny Griffin, Manolo Olaso, Jerry Blazer present. Defendants Counsel William Munoz present. (Text Only) (Caspar, M)
November 26, 2013 Filing 48 NOTICE OF LODGING Confidential Settlement Conference Statement by Bradley Brazill. (Olaso, Manolo) Modified on 11/27/2013 (Michel, G).
November 26, 2013 Filing 47 CORRECTED REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the Settlement Conference set for 12/3/2013 at 9:00 AM by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. (Munoz, William) Modified on 11/27/2013 (Michel, G).
November 26, 2013 Filing 46 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the Settlement Conference set for 12/3/2013 at 9:00 AM by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. (Munoz, William) Modified on 11/27/2013 (Michel, G).
November 26, 2013 Filing 45 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION of Confidential Settlement Conference Statement by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. (Munoz, William) Modified on 11/27/2013 (Michel, G).
October 24, 2013 Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): The Court hereby orders the #43 Final Pretrial Order amended as follows: The parties shall file any motions in limine no later than fourteen (14) days before trial. Any responses shall be filed no later than seven (7) days before trial. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/15/13 ORDERING the Trial SET for 2/4/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. A Settlement Conference is SET for 12/3/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Kastilahn, A)
October 15, 2013 Filing 42 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge William B. Shubb: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/15/2013. Court confers with counsel re the parties' pretrial statements and remaining claims. Court orders the trial continued to 2/4/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. Court orders this action referred for the random selection of a settlement judge: The parties are hereby notified that a Settlement Conference is set before the Hon. Kendall J. Newman, Magistate Judge, on 12/3/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 25, 8th Floor. Each party is directed to have a principal capable of disposition at the Settlement Conference or to be fully authorized to settle the matter on any terms at the Settlement Conference. Each party is further directed to submit via email to KJNorders@caed.uscourts.gov a confidential settlement conference statement no later than 12:00 PM (Noon) on 11/26/2013. Such statements are not to be filed with the clerk, although the parties may agree, or not, to serve each other with the settlement statements. However, each party shall e-file a one page document entitled "Notice of Submission of Confidential Settlement Conference Statement." If the settlement judge is not the trial judge, the Confidential Settlement Conference Statement shall not be disclosed to the trial judge. Court to issue separate pretrial order. Plaintiffs Counsel Manolo Olaso present. Defendants Counsel William Munoz present. Court Reporter: Kimberly Bennett. cc: USMJ Kendall J. Newman. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 8, 2013 Filing 41 PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Defendant California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC.(Munoz, William)
October 1, 2013 Filing 40 PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Plaintiff Bradley Brazill.(Olaso, Manolo)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/22/2013 DENYING #38 California Northstate College Pharmacy, LLC's Second Motion for Summary Judgment. (Kirksey Smith, K)
August 1, 2013 Filing 38 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment by CA Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Master List of Exhibits, 1 of 2, #5 Master List of Exhibits, 2 of 2, #6 Declaration of David Carroll, #7 Declaration of Alvin Cheung, #8 Declaration of David Hawkins, #9 Declaration of William Munoz, #10 Declaration of Yasmin Vera)(Ng, Brittany) Modified on 8/2/2013 (Reader, L).
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/19/13 ORDERING it is hereby stipulated and agreed by all parties, by and through their counsel whose signatures appear below, that the date for expert disclosure shall be extended three weeks to July 8, 2013. (Becknal, R)
June 18, 2013 Filing 36 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Time for Expert Disclosure re #16 Scheduling Order by Bradley Brazill. (Olaso, Manolo) Modified on 6/19/2013 (Reader, L).
June 17, 2013 Filing 35 ***DISREGARD; SEE DOCKET #36 ***STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER Extending Expert Disclosure re #16 Scheduling Order by Bradley Brazill. (Olaso, Manolo) Modified on 6/18/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L). Modified on 6/18/2013 (Kirksey Smith, K).
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/4/13 ORDERING that California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC's #29 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as to plaintiff's ADEA, FEHA and wrongful termination claims and GRANTED as to plaintiff's FCA claim. California Northstate University, LLC's #29 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. (Manzer, C)
May 21, 2013 Filing 33 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by William A. Munoz. (Munoz, William)
May 20, 2013 Filing 32 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge William B. Shubb: MOTION HEARING held on 5/20/2013 re #29 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, or alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment. Counsel argue. MOTION SUBMITTED. The Court shall prepare and issue a separate order. Plaintiffs Counsel Manolo Olaso present. Defendants Counsel William Munoz present. Court Reporter: Kathy Swinhart. (Kirksey Smith, K)
May 13, 2013 Filing 31 REPLY BRIEF by defendants to plaintiff's Opposition to #29 Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Objections to Evidence Offered in support, #2 Reply to plaintiff's Response to defendants' Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 Supplemental Declaration of William A. Munoz in support) (Munoz, William) Modified on 5/15/2013 (Marciel, M)
May 6, 2013 Filing 30 OPPOSITION by Bradley Brazill to #29 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Response, #2 Declaration of Bradley Brazill , #3 Declaration of Manolo Olaso)(Olaso, Manolo) Modified on 5/7/2013 (Kaminski, H).
April 4, 2013 Filing 29 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT or, in the alternative, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities Memorandum, #2 Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 Master List of Documents, #4 Exhibits 1-9, #6 Exhibits 13-14, #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Declaration of Dr. Alvin Cheung , #9 Declaration of William Snyder, #10 Declaration of Yasmin Vera, #11 Declaration of Paul Wagstaffe, #12 Declaration of Norman Fong, #13 Declaration of William A. Munoz) (Munoz, William) Modified on 4/5/2013 (Meuleman, A).
March 27, 2013 Filing 28 WITHDRAWAL of #26 Motion for leave to extend deposition of plaintiff by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. (Munoz, William) Modified on 3/29/2013 (Marciel, M)
March 18, 2013 Filing 27 Defendants' NOTICE of change of hadling attorney. (Munoz, William) Modified on 3/20/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 7, 2013 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to extend deposition of Plaintiff by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Declaration of William A. Munoz, #3 Declaration of Brittany Y. Ng)(Munoz, William) Modified on 3/12/2013 (Zignago, K.).
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: Due to the recalled appointment of Magistrate Judge * Gregory G. Hollows* to the bench of the Eastern District, this action is reassigned to *Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan* for all further proceedings. (Donati, J)
March 6, 2013 Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): The parties are hereby notified that #23 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Extend Deposition of Plaintiff Bradley J. Brazill has been improperly noticed before the District Judge, and therefore, the 4/8/2013 hearing date is VACATED. Pursuant to Local Rule 302(c)(1), this motion shall be heard before the assigned Magistrate Judge, Gregory G. Hollows. The filer is instructed to contact Magistrate Judge Hollows' courtroom clerk for an available hearing date. (Kirksey Smith, K)
March 6, 2013 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Extend Deposition of Plaintiff by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William A. Munoz, #2 Declaration of Brittany Y. Ng)(Munoz, William) Modified on 3/12/2013 (Zignago, K.).
November 7, 2012 Filing 22 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC.(Munoz, William)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 10/23/2012 DENYING defendants' #12 Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim. (Marciel, M)
October 22, 2012 Filing 20 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge William B. Shubb: MOTION HEARING held on 10/22/2012 re #12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Counsel argue. MOTION SUBMITTED. The Court shall prepare and issue a separate order. Plaintiffs Counsel Manolo Olaso present. Defendants Counsel William Munoz present. Court Reporter: Diane Shepard. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 12, 2012 Filing 19 REPLY BRIEF by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC re #18 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (Munoz, William) Modified on 10/15/2012 (Marciel, M)
October 5, 2012 Filing 18 OPPOSITION by Bradley Brazill to #12 MOTION to DISMISS. (Olaso, Manolo)
September 13, 2012 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): Pursuant to the Court's #16 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order issued 9/13/2012, the Scheduling Conference date of 11/26/2012 and the filing deadline of 11/13/2012 are VACATED. (Kirksey Smith, K)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/13/2012 ORDERING: The Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference date of 9/17/2012 is VACATED, and no appearance is required. Initial Disclosures due by 9/28/2012. Disclosure of Experts and Reports due by 6/17/2013. Expert Testimony on Rebuttal shall be disclosed and reports produced by 7/15/2013. All discovery shall be completed by 8/1/2013. All motions to compel discovery must be noticed so that they may be heard no later than 8/1/2013. All motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders, or other emergency applications, shall be filed by 8/1/2013. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/15/2013 at 02:00 PM and Jury Trial is set for 11/26/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Counsel shall refer to the attached order for more detailed information.)(Kirksey Smith, K)
September 11, 2012 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ERRATA RE #13 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by California Northstate College of Pharmacy. (Ruzicka, Kerri) Modified on 9/17/2012 (Becknal, R).
September 11, 2012 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): The parties are hereby notified that the Scheduling Conference is continued from 9/17/2012 to 11/26/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb, pending hearing on #12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss now set for hearing on 10/22/2012. An Amended Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 11/13/2012. (Kirksey Smith, K)
September 11, 2012 Filing 13 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC, California Northstate University, LLC in re #12 Motion to Dismiss. (Ruzicka, Kerri)
September 10, 2012 Filing 12 MOTION to DISMISS for failure to state a claim by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2012 at 2:00 PM before Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration) (Ruzicka, Kerri) Modified on 10/24/2012 (Marciel, M)
September 5, 2012 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC, California Northstate University, LLC. (Ruzicka, Kerri)
August 22, 2012 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Bradley Brazill.(Olaso, Manolo)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 08/02/2012 GRANTING #5 Motion to Dimiss Claims One, Two, Three, Four, and Six. Plaintiff has twenty days from the date of this Order to file an Amended Complaint, if he can do so consistent with this Order. (Streeter, J)
July 30, 2012 Filing 8 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge William B. Shubb: MOTION HEARING held on 7/30/2012 re #5 Defendants' MOTION to DISMISS. Counsel argue. MOTION SUBMITTED. The Court shall prepare and issue a final order. Plaintiffs Counsel Manolo Olaso present. Defendants Counsel William Munoz present. Court Reporter: Kathy Swinhart. (Kirksey Smith, K)
July 20, 2012 Filing 7 REPLY by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC, California Northstate University, LLC re #6 Opposition to Motion. Attorney Ruzicka, Kerri Lynn added. (Ruzicka, Kerri)
July 16, 2012 Filing 6 OPPOSITION by Bradley Brazill to #5 MOTION to DISMISS. Attorney Olaso, Manolo H. added. (Attachments: #1 Objection, #2 Declaration of Manolo Olaso)(Olaso, Manolo) Modified on 7/18/2012 (Reader, L).
June 11, 2012 Filing 5 MOTION to DISMISS by California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC. Attorney Munoz, William A. added. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration)(Munoz, William)
May 7, 2012 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP Form) (Becknal, R)
May 7, 2012 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC, California Northstate University, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Johnny L. Griffin, III* *Law Offices of Johnny L. Griffin III* *1010 F Street, Suite 200* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Becknal, R)
May 7, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Age Discrimination in Workplace against All Defendants by Bradley Brazill. Attorney Griffin, Johnny L. added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Griffin, Johnny)
May 7, 2012 RECEIPT number #CAE200044224 $350.00 fbo Manolo H. Olaso by Manolo H. Olaso on 5/7/2012. (Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brazill v. California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Northstate University, LLC
Represented By: Brittany Y Ng
Represented By: Kerri Lynn Ruzicka
Represented By: William Angelo Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Northstate College of Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Brittany Y Ng
Represented By: Kerri Lynn Ruzicka
Represented By: William Angelo Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Brazill
Represented By: Johnny L. Griffin, III
Represented By: Manolo H. Olaso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?