Cornish v. MacDonald
Petitioner: Ammiel Cornish
Respondent: Jim MacDonald
Case Number: 2:2012cv01296
Filed: May 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/8/2013 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2). CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/5/12 ORDERING that within 14 days after service of this order, petitioner plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to respondents motion to dismiss; alternatively, petitioner may file a statement of non-opposition, or a request that this action be dismissed without prejudice.(Dillon, M)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/25/12 ORDERING that Petitioner's MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis 5 is GRANTED; Petitioner shall, within thirty days after the filing date of this order, file in this Court a copy of the California Supreme Court's subject denial of review. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/16/12 ORDERING that petitioner shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, submit the following: (a) An affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis, or the appropriate filing fee; and (b) An amended habeas corpus petition. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner copies of the in forma pauperis form, and habeas corpus petition, used by this district. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornish v. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jim MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ammiel Cornish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?