Datatel Solutions, Inc., v. Keane Telecom Consulting, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Datatel Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Keane Telecom Consulting, LLC and Outreach Telecom and Energy, LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv01306
Filed: May 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 02/25/16 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 73 Motion for Default Judgment be granted and the court enter judgment against defendants Keane Telecom Consulting, LLC and Outreach Telecom and Energy, LLC in the amount of $413,647.92. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to these F&Rs due within 14 days. (Benson, A)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 4/14/15 ORDERING Status Conference continued to commence at 9:00 a.m. on 6/22/15. Plaintiff shall file a status report no later than 14 days prior to the status conference, in which it shall explain the status of the default proceedings. (Meuleman, A) Modified on 4/14/2015 (Meuleman, A).
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 2/23/2015 ADOPTING IN FULL 70 Findings and Recommendations; DENYING 55 Motion for Default Judgment without prejudice. (Michel, G.)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/2/15 ORDERING that the Status Conference scheduled for hearing on 2/9/15, is CONTINUED to commence at 9:00 a.m. on 4/20/2015 in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. Plaintiff shall file a status report no later than fourteen (14) days prior to the status conference.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/30/2015 RECOMMENDING that the 55 Motion for Default Judgment be denied without prejudice. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.(Donati, J)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER and ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/20/2014 ORDERING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing by 12/1/2014 why sanctions should not imposed for failure to file a timely status report. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Status Conference is CONTINUED to 2/9/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. Status Report due 14 days prior to the status conference.(Donati, J)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, VACATING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL, AND SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/22/14 ORDERING Plaintiff to Show Cause ("OSC") in a writing to be filed no later than July 28, 2014, why sanctions should not be imposed against it and/or its counsel under Rule 16(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to file a timely final pretrial statement; the final pretrial conference scheduled for July 28, 2014, an d the trial scheduled to commence on October 21, 2014, are VACATED; A status conference is scheduled to commence at 9:00 a.m. on November 24, 2014. Plaintiff shall file a status report no later than fourteen (14) days prior to the status conference in which it explains the status of the default proceedings. (Becknal, R)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL MOTION; AND DISMISSING COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/28/14. Motion to Withdraw as Attorney 40 is GRANTED; Attorney Stephanie Quinn TERMINATED; Plaintiff is GRANTED fourteen (14) days from the date on which this Order is filed to file an amended complaint addressing the deficiency in its dismissed complaint.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 1/7/2014 ORDERING the plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, by 1/14/2014, as to the jurisdictional issues stated herein; ORDERING that any response to the plaintiff's filing be filed by 1/21/2014. (Michel, G)
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 12/30/2013 DENYING the 34 Stipulation expediting the briefing schedule and hearing date on defense counsel's Motion to Withdraw. (Michel, G)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATON and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 12/4/2012 WITHDRAWING 13 , 19 Motions for Default Judgment; VACATING the Motion Hearings as to 13 , 19 Motions for Default Judgment; VACATING 9 , 10 Clerk's Entries of Defa ult; REFERRING case to this Court's Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program; GRANTING 90 days leave of court to complete alternative dispute resolution; in the event alternative dispute resolution fails to resolve this case, ORDERING Defendant to r espond to Plaintiff's 2 Complaint 14 days after the conclusion of alternative dispute resolution; CONTINUING the Pretrial Scheduling Conference to 4/15/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (cc: VDRP) (Michel, G)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/27/2012 ORDERING that the 12/5/2012 hearing on plaintiff's 19 motion for default judgment is CONTINUED to 1/16/2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 8. On or before 12/19/2012, plaintiff shall either withdraw the motion for default judgment or shall file and serve on defendants a supplemental brief and/or declaration(s) demonstrating that service of the summons and complaint on defendants was proper under California Civil Procedure Code sections 415.40 and 417.20(a). Within seven days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order on defendants. (Zignago, K.)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 9/12/12 ORDERING that the the Pretrial Scheduling Conference is COTINUED from 9/17/12 to 3/18/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. A status report shall be filed fourteen (14) days prior to the status conference in which Plaintiff is required to explain the status of the default proceedings.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Datatel Solutions, Inc., v. Keane Telecom Consulting, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Datatel Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Glenn W. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keane Telecom Consulting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outreach Telecom and Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?