Hale et al v. World Savings Bank et al
Plaintiff: Robert H. Hale and Catherine S Hale
Defendant: World Savings Bank and Golden West Savings Association Service Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv01462
Filed: May 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 1/11/13 VACATING 18 Order setting an initial scheduling conference and RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Meuleman, A)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 11/6/2012 ADOPTING 15 Findings and Recommendations in full; GRANTING, in part, 6 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING 7 Motion to Strike; DISMISSING, without prejudice, Plaintiffs' State Law Claims; DISMISSING, with leave to amend, Plaintiffs' TILA Claim; ORDERING Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within 21 days. (Michel, G).
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 9/30/12 Recommending that Defendant's 6/25/12 MOTION to Dismiss 6 be partially granted. Defendants' 6/25/12 Motion to strike 7 be denied. Plaintiffs' state law claims be dismissed without prejudice; Plaintiffs' complaint be dismissed with leave to amend only their TILA claim as set forth in these Findings and Recommendations. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Objections to these F&R due within fourteen days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/20/2012 CONTINUING the Motion Hearing as to 6 Motion to Dismiss to 9/27/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (JFM) before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds; ORDERING Plaintiff to file an Opposition to 6 Motion to Dismiss, 7 Motion to Strike by 8/30/2012. (Michel, G)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hale et al v. World Savings Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings Bank
Represented By: Tim G. Ceperley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden West Savings Association Service Company
Represented By: Tim G. Ceperley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert H. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine S Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?